United States Of America v. Andre
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Steve J. Andre
Case Number: 3:2011cv04175
Filed: August 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PAYMENT OF JURY COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL AND JURY COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NOTICE REGARDING JURY TRIAL (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (2/11/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (2/4/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARINGby Judge William Alsup [denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONFIRMING FEBRUARY 9 HEARING DATE re 29 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Michael Cosentino
Represented By: Steven J. Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?