Sandoval et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Mateos Sandoval and Simeon Avendano Ruiz
Defendant: County of Sonoma, Sonoma County Sheriff's Department, Steve Freitas, City of Santa Rosa, Santa Rosa Police Department and Tom Schwedhelm
Case Number: 3:2011cv05817
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 295 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 297 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, and Vacating Case Management Conference. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2015. Defendants' Opposition/Cros s-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment due by 1/11/2016. Plaintiffs' Replies/Opposition on Motions for Partial Summary Judgment due by 1/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/01/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Order Referring the Case to a Settlement Magistrate and Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/29/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 265 Motion to Certify Class; granting 266 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 272 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER vacating hearing re 272 Opposition/Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/19/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER continuing case management conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 249 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 216 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 220 Motion to Certify Class. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing as to 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 225 motion for leave to file documents in the public record; denying 226 administrative motion to file under seal. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing with Prejudice Defendant Tom Schwedhelm. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/18/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 211 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 185 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 194 Response and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 197 Response and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re: hearing on cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/2014. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER vacating 179 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Set Briefing Schedule on Motions for Summary Adjudication, and Reschedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on August 13, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Granting 154 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/12/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting 159 Stipulated Request to Reschedule Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 07/21/14 is CONTINUED to 09/08/14 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/17/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 15, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE TO COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 3, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 139 141 144 146 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/1/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on June 20, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; DENYING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on May 23, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/14/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney for Defendant County of Sonoma. Attorney Anne L. Keck terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/10/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 110 Defendant Freitas's Motion to Dismiss Portion of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/31/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue October 21, 2013 Case Management Conference and Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 110 MOTION to Dismiss Portion of Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/17/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Establish Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Reschedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Dismiss; denying 95 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER to (1) Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss, and (2) Reschedule Hearings on Motions to Dismiss and Case Management Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 93 and 95 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike. Rep lies due by 7/15/2013. Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/13/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 73 motion to certify County Defendants' appeal as frivolous. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER to expedite briefing and hearing schedule on County Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion for Reconsideration. Motion due by 01/15/2013. Responses due by 1/21/2013. Replies due by 1/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/14/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO (1) EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; (2) EXTEND TIME FOR COUNTY DEFENDANTS TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL PER FRAP 4(a)(5), and (3) CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/02/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 County Defendants' motion for leave to file a motion to reconsider portions of December 6, 2012 order and clarifying that claims dismissed in December 6, 2012 order were dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/02/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER to 1) Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss, and 2) Continue Case Management Conference. Responses due by 5/17/2012. Replies due by 6/25/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17 th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER (1) Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss, and (2) Continue Case Management Conference Date. Responses due by 5/14/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/30/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 2403(b) and instructions to Clerk to serve this order on the Office of the California Attorney General by certified U.S. mail. If the State of California chooses to intervene, it must do so by 03/30/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/30/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: (1) EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, (2) CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE, AND (3) DEFERRING FRCP 26(a) & (f) COMPLIANCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval et al v. County of Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Mateos Sandoval
Represented By: Cynthia Morrison Anderson-Barker
Represented By: Donald Webster Cook
Represented By: Robert Frederick Mann
Represented By: Alicia Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon Avendano Ruiz
Represented By: Cynthia Morrison Anderson-Barker
Represented By: Donald Webster Cook
Represented By: Robert Frederick Mann
Represented By: Alicia Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schwedhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?