Liu v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Lan T. Liu
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2011cv06120
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COURT'S ORDER RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 6, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, re: 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISCOVERY filed by Lan T. Liu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 25, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 22, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 6/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco befor e Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2013 to 6/21/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lan T. Liu
Represented By: Mary M. Dryovage
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Musell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?