Guidiville Rancheria of California et al v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Guidiville Rancheria of California and Upstream Point Molate, LLC
Defendant: United States Of America, Ken Salazar, Larry Echohawk and City of Richmond
Case Number: 3:2012cv01326
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/21/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATED AND RECALLED re 364 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Ryan Zinke, John Tahsuda, III, United States of America. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 310 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/29/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 255 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Plaintiff Supplemental Brief due by 4/21/2015. City's Supplemental Reply due by 4/28/2015. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2015 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 5/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE CITY OF RICHMOND. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The 11/10/14 Case Management Conference date is VACATED. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 12/12/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 237 Motion to Amend and Certify Orders for Interlocutory Review and Denying Request for Stay without Prejudice. The Court VACATES the hearing set for October 7, 2014. Case Management Conference is set for November 10, 2014 at 2:00pm. Joint Statement filed by 11/3/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. Joint Supplemental brief to be filed no later than 9/16/2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/26/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 219 Motion for Leave to File; denying 221 Motion for Leave to File. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION re 221 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Upstream Point Molate, LLC. The hearing set for 4/1/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 218 Motion to Stay Federal Claims Pending Potential "Revival" of Claims against City of Richmond. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 188 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge and Granting Motion to Compel the Return of an Inadvertently Released Document and Dissolving Stay. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 113 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2013 is CONTINUED to 1/27/14 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER re 164 Letter Brief, filed by Upstream Point Molate, LLC, City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 20, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 188 MOTION Relief from Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 184 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal . Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/17/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re 185 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at September 5 hearing filed by Ken Salazar, Larry Echohawk, United States Of America. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 3, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 105 Motion to Compel; denying 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 104 Joint Stipulation to Stay Briefing and Modify Briefing Schedule [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. The Case Management Conference currently set for 6/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, October 7, 2013 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The hearing on the Motion set for April 30, 2013 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time for Federal Defendants to File Administrative Record and for Plaintiffs to Move to Supplement is GRANTED. Federal Defendants shall have up to and including 12/21/2012 to file Administrative Record and Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 3/21/2013 to move to supplement the Administrative Record re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time for Federal Defendants to File AR and for Plaintiffs to move to supplement filed by Ken Salazar, Larry Echohawk, Upstream Point Molate, LLC, United States Of America, City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/14/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidiville Rancheria of California et al v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guidiville Rancheria of California
Represented By: Scott Crowell
Represented By: Michael Patrick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upstream Point Molate, LLC
Represented By: Shona L. Armstrong
Represented By: Garet Damon O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Echohawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?