Skeels v. Pilegaard et al
Plaintiff: Rhiannin Skeels
Defendant: Robert T. Doyle, Sutter Health, Novato Community Hospital, County of Marin, Marin County Sheriff's Office, Kendrick Pilegaard, City of Novato, Novato Police Department, Joseph Kreins and Veronique L. Au
Case Number: 3:2012cv02175
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/07/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Discovery Deadline. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Sutter West Bay Hospital dba Novato Community Hospital. Sutter West Bay Hospitals terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Veronique L. Au, M.D. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PARTIES: County of Marin (California), Marin County Sheriff's Office and Sherriff Robert T. Doyle terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re 92 Notice of Conditional Settlement Between Plaintiff and Def. County of Marin filed by Rhiannin Skeels. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/06/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 83 Defendant County of Marin's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Allowing Plaintiff Leave to File Motion to Modify Case Management Order filed by. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/16/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 71 Letter filed by Kendrick Pilegaard, City of Novato, Novato Police Department. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Sheriff Robert T. Doyle without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/13/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Chief Joseph Kreins without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/13/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing without Prejudice Defendants Robert T. Doyle and Joseph Kreins (individually and in his official capacity as Novato Police Department Chief.) Parties Terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding punitive damages and ninth claim for relief re 23 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/12/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skeels v. Pilegaard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novato Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Represented By: Stephen Robert Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick Pilegaard
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Novato
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novato Police Department
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kreins
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronique L. Au
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannin Skeels
Represented By: Jonathan M Shugart
Represented By: David Carl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?