United States of America, et al. v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: The State of California, Protransport-1, LLC and United States of America
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03896
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Protransport-1, LLC. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PROTRANSPORT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY TWO WEEKS by Judge William H. Orrick. The Court will not grant the extension requested by #44 Stipulation. The Court will allow an additional fourteen days for ProTransport to amend its Complaint, which is now due on or before October 1, 2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #41 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PROTRANSPORT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Protransport-1, LLC. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 2, 2013 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE - Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Time changed from 2:00 p.m.) This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation adopting #37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/28/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick re #18 Motion to Dismiss and #19 MOTION to Strike. Plaintiff's second through fifth and eighth through tenth claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's first claim is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND within twenty days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's sixth claim for violation of California Health and Safety Code section 1278.5 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's UCL Claim is DISMISSED, in part, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Defendant's Motion to Strike is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian John Keats (Keats, Brian) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re #18 MOTION to Dismiss and #19 MOTION to Strike Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2013 before William H. Orrick. Deadline to amend/add parties: 10/24/2013. Discovery deadline: 4/24/2014. Motions to be heard by 8/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2014 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Court Reporter FTR 2:47-3:12) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Tate, John) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Tate, John) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE AS TO CHANGE OF COURTROOM - The Case Management Conference and hearing on motion set for August 21, 2013 at 2:00 p.m., will be held in Courtroom 2 on the 17th Floor (not Courtroom 12 as indicated by the Case Management Conference Notice). This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #34 Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Order (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 33 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Tate, John) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 32 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Strike ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Tate, John) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Consent to Dismissal Without Prejudice to the United States and the State of California (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hitchings, Erica) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Friday (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Nos. 2-5 Subject to Consent of Attorney General by Protransport-1, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service re: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Nos. 2-5 Subject to Consent of Attorney General)(Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Strike , #18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byProtransport-1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service re: Plaintiff's Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike)(Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Protransport-1, LLC re #24 Order, Set Hearings (Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT Partially Redacted per Court's July 12, 2013 Order against All Defendants. Filed byProtransport-1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Partially Redacted Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service re Partially Redacted Complaint)(Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Blachman Hitchings (Hitchings, Erica) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #19 MOTION to Strike , #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PROTRANSPORT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part #14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Court ORDERS ProTransport to electronically file partially redacted versions of the Complaint and Exhibits B through H, with only PHI redacted, within five days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/26/2013. Replies due by 8/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion to Strike)(Tate, John) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/26/2013. Replies due by 8/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lorilyn M. Rosales-Menzel, #2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Relator's Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Tate, John) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 17 Statement of Non-Opposition re #14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint - Defendant's Support for Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint [Local Rule 79-5)] filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/10/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Protransport-1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles T. Mathews in support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order in support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order in support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #12 Notice (Other), #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. - Corporate Disclosure Statement (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc... (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George Stephen Azadian (Azadian, George) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Theodore Mathews (Mathews, Charles) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER UNITED STATES' AND STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION: ORDER TO UNSEAL. Amended Order reflects the correct filed date which is April 2, 2013. This is the only amendment to the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/2/2013. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION; [Proposed] ORDER to Unseal by United States of America. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 9/28/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).This is a Text Only Docket Entry
March 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION; ORDER TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/2/13. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2013)
July 25, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) (farS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076788). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byUnited States of America, State of California, Protransport-1, LLC. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2013: #1 part 2, #2 part 3) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2015: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2015: #4 Receipt) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, et al. v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of California
Represented By: Brian John Keats
Represented By: George Stephen Azadian
Represented By: Charles Theodore Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protransport-1, LLC
Represented By: George Stephen Azadian
Represented By: Charles Theodore Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: George Stephen Azadian
Represented By: Erica Blachman Hitchings
Represented By: Charles Theodore Mathews
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Coopersmith
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?