Mendez et al v. Becher et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Mendez
Defendant: Teresa Becher, Montour and JW Anderson
Case Number: 3:2012cv04170
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/20/2014. (All hearings and deadlines are VACATED.)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW. The hearing date on plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw is reset to Wednesday May 21, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE HEARING ON 64 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Mr. Mendez shall appear in person at the hearing set for Wednesday May 28, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve this Order on Mr. Mendez and advise Mr. Mendez of the need to appear at the May 28, 2014 hearing. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is GRANTED to defendant Anderson on all claims asserted against him. Partial summary judgment is also GRANTED to defendant Montour on the federal and state false arrest claims. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The parties should advise the court by 2:00 p.m. if they are going to ask the district court to vacate the settlement conference and must file their request with the district court simultaneously. See ECF Nos. 48, 49. The undersigned wil l not vacate a settlement conference referred by the district court but will consider a brief continuance to accommodate the schedules of counsel and the clients. Absent a further order of the court, Defendant's settlement conference statement is due by 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, January 15, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., must respond to Plaintiff's demand, and may be emailed to the court's orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov. The court denies the motions to excuse the personal appearance of the parties for the reasons stated in the telephonic settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/14/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/11/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 18 Defendant Chief Becher's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez et al v. Becher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Mendez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Becher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JW Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?