Hill v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Hill
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv04482
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have an extension of 45 days up through and including March 28, 2013 in which to e-file his motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall file any opposition, including cross-motions, on or before April 25, 2013. All deadlines are extended accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to and including Monday, February 11, 2013, to file his motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Hill
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?