Cassano v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Gary Cassano
Defendant: M. Johnson, Rogers, Hill and Bohannon
Case Number: 3:2012cv05144
Filed: October 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 97 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/25/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 80 89 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/15/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO ANSWER QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/9/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE 73 DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLARIFY CLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 57 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING; AND REQUESTING STATUS REPORT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014).
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE SERVICE ON M. JOHNSON AND DEFENDANTS' DEADLINES FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 48 Letter filed by Gary Cassano. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/7/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassano v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cassano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?