Gomez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gilbert Gomez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv06385
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 23 AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 26 . (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 24 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 21 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM THE COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Gomez
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?