Williams v. Supershuttle International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Williams, Timothy Sheard, Tyrone A. Plunkett, Carlos Leonardo Rea, Lenise Gordon and Quintin Clark
Defendant: Supershuttle International, Inc., Compass Transportation, Inc. and Veolia Transportation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06493
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' (1) MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT; AND (2) MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, INCENTIVE AWARD, AND REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/12/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 47 Motion for Settlement. The final approval hearing is set for February 11, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE 30 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE - Mediation shall be completed by 12/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting leave to file second amended complaint and extension of time to respond to it.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/7/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER : Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/13 is continued to 4/19/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/7/13., Motions terminated: 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Supershuttle International, Inc., Compass Transportation, Inc., Veolia Transportation Services, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Supershuttle International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sheard
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone A. Plunkett
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Leonardo Rea
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenise Gordon
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintin Clark
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supershuttle International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Transportation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?