United States Of America v. Bazaarvoice, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Bazaarvoice, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00133
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 8/28/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 THIRD AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT re 283 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/02/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER REGARDING REMEDY PHASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 CORRECTED ORDER REGARDING EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AT TRIAL AND CONFIDENTIALITY OF THIRD PARTY MATERIALS (This order replaces 242 Order.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OPINION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION). The government has prevailed in the liability phase of this case. The parties shall file a Joint Statement Regarding Remedy Phase on January 17, 2014, and attend a Case Management Conference on January 22, 2014, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 2, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, to discuss the remedy phase of this case. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A REDACTED VERSIONS OF THEIR POST-TRIAL BRIEFS FINAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/29/2013. The parties shall file redacted versions of their post-trial briefs, final proposed findings of fact and final proposed conclusions of law on the Courts electronic filing system as soon as they are able to do so. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY AND USE OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF RATING-SYSTEM AT TRIAL re 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER REGARDING SEALING OF THIRD PARTY DOCUMENTS AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AT TRIAL. The courtroom will not be closed to the public during the trial. However, material designated as confidential will not be discussed during trial and it will not be published absent Court approval. The United States has indicated that it wishes the Court to review the videotaped depositions of the representatives of Reevoo, Demand Media, and AutoZone during the first week of trial. If Reevoo, Demand Media or Au toZone wish to supplement their motions to seal with respect to those depositions, they should do so no later than the close of business on Tuesday, September 24, 2013. To the extent either party has decreased the number of exhibits and/or transcript s containing confidential information that will be introduced from a particular company, the United States and Bazaarvoice, Inc. shall notify the affected third party on or before September 26, 2013, of their reduced, current exhibit list. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2013.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REQUEST AND ORDER TO PERMIT EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM re 117 REQUEST filed by Bazaarvoice, Inc. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/10/2013. (Counsel and/or Counsel's representative should be prepared to present a hard copy of this order to security personnel when attempting to enter the courthouse with the designated equipment.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RE: REMOTE REALTIME TRANSCRIPT FEED (as to Defendant). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RE: REMOTE REALTIME TRANSCRIPT FEED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY AND USE OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AT TRIAL re 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/01/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order re discovery dispute re 85 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/18/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PRETRIAL ORDER - Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 8/26/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2013 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 9/23/2013 08:30 AM, both before Hon. William H. Orrick in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PART BAZAARVOICES REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL HOURS FOR THIRD-PARTY DEPOSITIONS (Re: ECF No. 66) by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler:Granting in part 66 Discovery Letter Brief. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Exchange of Preliminary and Final Witness Lists filed by Bazaarvoice, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 ORDER MOVING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Bazaarvoice, Inc. Status Report due by 5/2/2013. Status Conference set for 5/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order re 55 discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/22/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order re Protective Order and other discovery issues raised in joint case management conference statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/4/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Asset Preservation filed by United States Of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Bazaarvoice, Inc. CMC set for 2/14/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Bazaarvoice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Michael Domenic Bonanno
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bazaarvoice, Inc.
Represented By: Dominique Chantale Alepin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Dylan James Liddiard
Represented By: Chul Pak
Represented By: Scott Andrew Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?