ACER America Corporation v. Hitachi, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: ACER America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. and Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc.
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03349
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re: [9293-15] signed by Judge Illston on 11/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY AND LETTERS OF REQUEST 9293 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (9211) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY - Acer America, 13cv3349 9071 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: NEC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER 8882 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE NEC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY GATEWAY 8885 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS 8886 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDE #1 and AGENDAFOR JULY 10, 2007 STATUSCONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACER America Corporation v. Hitachi, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Ken K. Fung
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Jones
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Michael C. Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Ken K. Fung
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Jones
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Michael C. Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Ken K. Fung
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Jones
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Michael C. Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?