Lloyd et al v. Sjoblom et al
Plaintiff: Ventor Progress AB and Peter Lloyd
Defendant: Mikael Sjoblom and Euro Office Americas Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv00234
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FIRST AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/21/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Stipulation TO VACATE ALL DATES & SET FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Peter Lloyd, Ventor Progress AB. Status Conference set for 11/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/27/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOURE DATES re 40 Stipulation filed by Peter Lloyd, Ventor Progress AB. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/27/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley Re: 35 Discovery Letter Brief. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss.(jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd et al v. Sjoblom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikael Sjoblom
Represented By: Timothy Thomas O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Office Americas Inc
Represented By: Timothy Thomas O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ventor Progress AB
Represented By: Stephen Zachary Boren
Represented By: Ayesha A. Mahapatra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lloyd
Represented By: Ayesha Attoh Mahapatra
Represented By: Ayesha A. Mahapatra
Represented By: Stephen Zachary Boren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?