Moore v. City of Berkeley et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Moore
Defendant: City of Berkeley, Gwendolwyn Brown, Kenneth Tu, Brandon Smith, Brian Mathis, Timothy Gardner, Nikos Kastmiler, Amber Philips and Benjamin Cardoza
Case Number: 3:2014cv00669
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING EARLIER SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER IN PART. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2018. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Plaintiff to file opposition brief by November 18, 2017. Defendant to file reply brief within 7 days of receiving opposition brief. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 73 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO DISCLOSE COMPLETE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2016. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re: 52 . Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/24/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER RE FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO PAY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/13/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/7/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 STIPULATION RE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS/STRIKE filed by City of Berkeley. Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(B)(6) and (2)STRIKE IMPROPER ALLEGATIONS IN 2nd AND 3rd CAUSES OF ACTION UNDER FRCP (12)(F), Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/11/2014. Replies due by 8/22/2014(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. City of Berkeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Moore
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolwyn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikos Kastmiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?