United States of America v. 1.41 Acres of Land et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 1.41 Acres of Land, East Bay Regional Parks District and The State of California
Case Number: 3:2014cv01781
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:946
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE RE PROVISION VACATING PRIOR ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/21/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER VACATING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/20/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING REQUEST OF THE UNITED STATES FOR AN ADVISORY OPINION by Hon. William Alsup denying 126 Motion Finding that Easement Would Be Substitute Facility.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER SHORTENING SCHEDULE FOR SUBSTITUTE FACILITY MOTION re 131 MOTION Clarification of Order re 129 Order,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by United States of America, 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 131 MOTION Clarification of Order re 129 Order,,,,, Set Motion and D eadlines/Hearings,,,, , 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility . Responses due by 9/21/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/16/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 131 Motion Clarification.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND STIPULATION REQUESTING SHORTENED TIME FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parkin g Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility to shorten time filed by United States of America, 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility to shorten time< /i>, 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment , 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility . Responses due by 9/21/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/11/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT re 112 Letter filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/14/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup re 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARING AND RE BRIEFING. Replies due by 5/15/2015 at noon. Responses due by 5/8/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AND HEARING re 77 Emergency MOTION to Continue. Reply due by 4/30/2015 at noon. Response due by 4/24/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS AND VACATING HEARING. re 71 Protective Order.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 71 Motion for Protective Order and to Vacate Hearing. Responses due by 3/16/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 11, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION. Response due by 3/24/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 25 DISCOVERY HEARING AND ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES. re 54 Discovery Letter, 52 Discovery Letter, 60 Emergency Motion to Continue. Discovery Motion due by 3/11/2015 at noon. Response due by 3/19/ 2015 at noon. Reply due by 3/26/2015 at noon. Discovery Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. MSJ Opposition due by 4/10/2015 at noon. MSJ Reply due by 4/16/2015 at noon. MSJ Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 at 08:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT EAST BAY REGIONAL LPARK DISTRICT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 54 Discovery Letter Brief filed by East Bay Regional Park District]. Response due by NOON on 2/19/2015. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Attorney's Lounge on 18th Floor of San Francisco federal courthouse beginning from 9:00 AM and continuing to 11:00 AM on 2/25/2015. Please buzz chambers at 9:00 AM on 2/25/2015 to check in. Discovery Hearing set for 2/25/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/17/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by The State of California]. Response due by NOON on 2/19/2015. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room starting from 9:00 AM and continuing to 11:00 AM on 2/25/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 2/25/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/13/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [re 35 MOTION to Strike 34 Answer to Complaint, 33 Answer to Complaint filed by United States of America, 38 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by East Bay Regional Parks District]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/10/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REQUEST RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 26 Notice (Other) filed by The State of California]. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 24 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 1.41 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.41 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Regional Parks District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Douglas K. Chang
Represented By: Marc E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?