October 21, 2015 |
Filing
163
NOTICE RE PROVISION VACATING PRIOR ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/21/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
161
ORDER VACATING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/20/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
159
ORDER RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
153
ORDER DENYING REQUEST OF THE UNITED STATES FOR AN ADVISORY OPINION by Hon. William Alsup denying 126 Motion Finding that Easement Would Be Substitute Facility.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
136
ORDER SHORTENING SCHEDULE FOR SUBSTITUTE FACILITY MOTION re 131 MOTION Clarification of Order re 129 Order,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by United States of America, 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 131 MOTION Clarification of Order re 129 Order,,,,, Set Motion and D eadlines/Hearings,,,, , 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility . Responses due by 9/21/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/16/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
132
ORDER RE REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 131 Motion Clarification.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
|
September 13, 2015 |
Filing
129
ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND STIPULATION REQUESTING SHORTENED TIME FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parkin g Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility to shorten time filed by United States of America, 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility to shorten time< /i>, 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment , 126 MOTION for a Finding That the Conveyance of a Street Use and Parking Easement is the Reasonably Necessary Substitute Facility . Responses due by 9/21/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/11/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2015)
|
August 14, 2015 |
Filing
114
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT re 112 Letter filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/14/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
100
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing
95
ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup re 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
94
ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARING AND RE BRIEFING. Replies due by 5/15/2015 at noon. Responses due by 5/8/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
78
ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AND HEARING re 77 Emergency MOTION to Continue. Reply due by 4/30/2015 at noon. Response due by 4/24/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
74
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS AND VACATING HEARING. re 71 Protective Order.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
|
March 11, 2015 |
Filing
72
ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 71 Motion for Protective Order and to Vacate Hearing. Responses due by 3/16/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 11, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing
70
REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION. Response due by 3/24/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
|
February 25, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 25 DISCOVERY HEARING AND ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES. re 54 Discovery Letter, 52 Discovery Letter, 60 Emergency Motion to Continue. Discovery Motion due by 3/11/2015 at noon. Response due by 3/19/ 2015 at noon. Reply due by 3/26/2015 at noon. Discovery Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. MSJ Opposition due by 4/10/2015 at noon. MSJ Reply due by 4/16/2015 at noon. MSJ Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 at 08:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
|
February 17, 2015 |
Filing
55
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT EAST BAY REGIONAL LPARK DISTRICT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 54 Discovery Letter Brief filed by East Bay Regional Park District]. Response due by NOON on 2/19/2015. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Attorney's Lounge on 18th Floor of San Francisco federal courthouse beginning from 9:00 AM and continuing to 11:00 AM on 2/25/2015. Please buzz chambers at 9:00 AM on 2/25/2015 to check in. Discovery Hearing set for 2/25/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/17/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by The State of California]. Response due by NOON on 2/19/2015. Two-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room starting from 9:00 AM and continuing to 11:00 AM on 2/25/2015. Discovery Hearing set for 2/25/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/13/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
|
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [re 35 MOTION to Strike 34 Answer to Complaint, 33 Answer to Complaint filed by United States of America, 38 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by East Bay Regional Parks District]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/10/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
41
REQUEST RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
27
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 26 Notice (Other) filed by The State of California]. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
|
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
25
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 24 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
|