IN RE CAPACITORS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Michael Brooks, Mouser Electronics, Inc., Gossett Motor Cars, Inc., WE 3 Gossett, LLC, Beverly Hills Leasing LLC, BHRAC, LLC, Walker Component Group, Inc., Autorama, Inc., Dependable Component Supply Corp., Johnny Walker, Jamie Thaemert, Michael W. Davis, Fredrick P. Hege, Jr., Charles Rusher, Computing Solutions, Inc., David A Bennett, Timothy Duffy, Avnet, Inc., David C. Keller, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, TTI, Inc., Flextronics International USA, Inc., Chip-Tech, Ltd., CAE SOUND, Toy-Knowlogy Inc., In Home Tech Solutions, Inc., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Alfred H. Siegel, Liquidating Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc., Sean G. Tarjoto, Everett Ellis, Marta Michaud, eIQ Energy Inc., Scott Huffman, Jane Schmit, John E. McDowell, Mike Fisher, Jennifer Rusher, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Garth Russell, M.D., Cetacea Sound, Inc., David Standridge, Steve Wong, Plexus Corp., Scot Dunlap, Troy Gibson, Todd Stowater, WE 3 Gossett, LLC doing business as Gossett Volkswagen of Germantown, WE 3 Gossett, LLC doing business as Gossett Fiat, BHRAC, LLC doing business as Beverly Hills Rent-A-Car, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Hyundai, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Audi, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Volkswagen, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Porsche, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Mazda, Autorama, Inc. doing business as Mercedes Benz of Memphis, WE 3 Gossett, LLC doing business as Gossett Kia South, WE 3 Gossett, LLC doing business as Gossett Hyundai South, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Fiat of Memphis, Computing Solutions, Inc. doing business as Wired! By Computing Solutions, d/b/a Wired! Technology Partners, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Mitsubishi, Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Kia and Gossett Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Gossett Chrysler/Jeep/Dodge
Defendant: Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., Kemet Corporation, NEC Tokin America, Inc., Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., TDK U.S.A. Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Kemet Electronics Corporation, FPCAP Electronics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Okaya Electric America Inc., Sanyo Electronic Device (U.S.A.) Corporation, AVX Corporation, Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, Rohm Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Samsung Electro Mechanics America, Inc., Nichicon Corporation, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Fujitsu Semiconductor America, Inc., Rubycon Corporation, Taitsu America, Inc., Rubycon America Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc., EPCOS AG, Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Soshin Electronics of America Inc., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Taitsu Corporation, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd, Nichicon (America) Corporation, EPCOS Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., HolyStone International, TDK Corporation, Samsung Electro-Mechanics, Sanyo North America Corporation, Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., NEC Tokin Corporation, American Shizuki Corporation, Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd., Elna America Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., Holy Stone Polytech Co. Ltd., Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Panasonic Corporation, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., Sanyo Electric Group, Ltd., Shinyei Kaisha, TDK-EPC Corporation, Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., United Chemi-con Corporation and Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Petitioner: Digi-Key Corporation, Quathimatine Holdings, Inc. and Five Rivers Electronic Innovations, LLC
Respondent: Cambridge Capital Corporation
Intervenor: United States of America
Not Classified By Court: Satoshi Okubo
Interested Party: Schuten Electronics, Inc. and Top Floor Home Improvements
Case Number: 3:2014cv03264
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 2718 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2690 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS NOTICE OF EXCLUSIONS AS TO SETTLEMENTS WITH AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2717 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER WITHDRAWING CISCO AND APTIVS OBJECTIONS TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU; NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT FAIRNESS HEARING filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2716 ORDER granting (2474 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Taitsu Corporation and Taitsu America, Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/14/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2715 ORDER. The DPPs' final approval hearing on September 17, 2020, at 10 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party or party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by September 16, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: #https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/11/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2714 REPLY (re #2702 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #3 Proposed Order Granting Settlements, #4 Proposed Order AVX Proposed Final Judgment, #5 Proposed Order ELNA Proposed Final Judgment, #6 Proposed Order Holy Stone Proposed Final Judgment, #7 Proposed Order KEMET Prop Final Judgment, #8 Proposed Order Panasonic Proposed Final Judgment, #9 Proposed Order Shinyei Proposed Final Judgment, #10 Proposed Order Shizuki Prop Final Judgment, #11 Proposed Order Taitsu Proposed Final Judgment)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2713 REPLY (re #2704 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2712 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 7-9-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1378 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2711 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 8-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2710 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 8/11/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2709 ORDER. The concurrent expert proceeding in the DAP cases will be held on August 11, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to email Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark (jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. on August 10, 2020, the names of their lead counsel and experts who will be speaking during the proceeding. The experts and lead counsel are requested to call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2708 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER MONICA IP. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/29/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2707 ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 25, 2020 Filing 2706 Proposed Order re #2704 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 25, 2020 Filing 2705 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri Dec in Support of #2704 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 16 to Joseph R. Saveri Dec)(Related document(s) #2704 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2704 MOTION for Attorney Fees DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2703 Proposed Order re #2702 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2702 MOTION for Settlement DIRECT PURCHASER CLASSS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri Dec, #2 Exhibit A - J to Joseph R. Saveri Dec, #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2701 Proposed Order to Appoint Monica Ip as Special Master by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2700 MOTION to Appoint Monica Ip as Special Master filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Ip)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2699 ORDER. Despite multiple requests to the parties to remove all of their belongings from the courtroom, several laptops and other items are still there from the DPPs' trial. The parties are advised that all remaining items will be removed and repurposed on July 28, 2020, and will not be recoverable after that. This is the last opportunity to claim an item. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/20/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2698 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PANASONIC CORPORATION FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2697 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NICHICON DEFENDANTS FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2696 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MATSUO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2695 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ELNA DEFENDANTS FROM IPPS' ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2694 ORDER RE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2693 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH ELNA, MATSUO, NICHICON, AND PANASONIC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2692 ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. MDL Dkt. Nos. 821, 995. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2691 ORDER. All materials and equipment left in Courtroom 11 from the DPPs' trial must be removed by July 27, 2020. The parties are directed to reach out to Ms. Clark to coordinate a pick-up time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2690 ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS'S MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS, MDL Dkt. Nos. 1300, 1068. Fairness Hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2689 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2020 in case 3:17-md-02801-JD and 3:14-cv-03264-JD.Total Time in Court: 43 minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2688 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2687 Proposed Order re #2665 MOTION for Settlement PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU Revised Proposed Order by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 4, 2020 Filing 2686 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/11/2020; 03/12/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/4/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2685 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 3-12-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2684 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7, held on 3-11-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2683 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 6, held on 3-10-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2682 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 5, held on 3-9-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2681 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 4, held on 3-5-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2680 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 3, held on 3-4-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2679 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 3-3-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR and Belle Ball, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2678 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 3-2-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2532 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2677 ORDER. The Court sets a hearing for July 9, 2020, at 2 p.m., on all issues relating to DPP class members Cisco and Aptiv's distribution dispute with the DPPs' Class Counsel. The hearing will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by July 8, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2676 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri Requesting Entry of Preliminary Approval Order. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2675 ORDER. The Court finds the DPPs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlements, MDL Dkt. No. 1300, to be suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for June 25, 2020, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2674 ORDER. The jurors for the DPPs' trial have now been discharged. The Court orders that the parties may not contact the jurors for any reason. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2673 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference re DPPs' Trial held on 6/5/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2672 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Working Group Meeting with Judge re DPPs' Trial held on 6/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2671 Clerks Notice re: Cameras in the Courtroom. Due to the remote nature of proceedings during the Covid-19 emergency, Cameras in the Courtroom will not be used for the rest of the trial. There will be a Zoom link available to view the trial live when it resumes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2670 ORDER. A status conference regarding the DPPs' trial is set for June 4, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., to be held by Zoom Webinar. As with previous status conferences, Ms. Clark will circulate the panelist invitation to all lead counsel by email. The parties should email Ms. Clark by 4 p.m. on June 2, 2020, if there is a change in their lead counsel who will be speaking at the status conference. All lead counsel must call in ten minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/89706087591?pwd=b3JUMFlsdWlLdlVvelN3TCtmaUNjZz09 Webinar ID: 897 0608 7591 Password: 407064Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13462487799,,89706087591# or +16699006833,,89706087591# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799International numbers available: # https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kdVpAxgdWN PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, record ing, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2020. (This is a te xt-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2669 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 5/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2668 ORDER. The Court declines defendants' two proposed revisions to the supplemental juror questionnaire. MDL Dkt. No. 1303. As the Court has advised the parties, each side will present a recap of the evidence to refresh the jury's recollection of the prior testimony, and the jurors have been equipped to take notes. The memory question is unnecessary in these circumstances. The catch-all question at the end of the questionnaire is intended to ensure that the Court does not miss any concerns a juror might have. The parties will be advised of the specifics of any telephonic follow-up, in the manner typically used for communications from the jury. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2667 ORDER. The Court proposes to use the attached Supplemental Jury Questionnaire for the DPPs' trial. Any objections to the form or content should be filed by May 29, 2020, at 10 a.m. California time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2666 ORDER. A further status conference for the DPPs' trial will be held on May 28, 2020, at 1 p.m., by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 26, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for th e appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83041176638?pw d=V2hUYThNSUtmdU5IUmpJNTl4dElVZz09 Webinar ID: 830 4117 6638 Password: 152037 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16699006833,,83041176638# or +19292056099,,83041176638# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799International numbers available: #ht tps://us02web.zoom.us/u/keoOKl4yRC PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2665 MOTION for Settlement PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS AVX, ELNA, HOLY STONE, KEMET, PANASONIC, SHINYEI, SHIZUKI AND TAITSU filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/2/2020. Replies due by 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A-J to Saveri Dec., #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #4 Exhibit A-C to Zylstra Dec., #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2664 ORDER. The further status conference for the DPPs' trial will be set for May 28, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/14/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2663 Statement RE: REMAINING TRIAL WITNESSES by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2662 MOTION for Leave to File OVERSIZED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2661 ORDER granting (1046 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Supplemental Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2660 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 5/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2020)
May 4, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 11:00 AM via Zoom Webinar. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2659 ORDER. As previously stated, the status conference in the DPPs' case set for May 7, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 5, 2020, at 6:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.u s/j/87290818113?pwd=T1M5QUlMczRoV0VRUGw1OTVwK2Z1QT09 Webinar ID: 872 9081 8113 Password: 179022Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13462487799,,87290818113# or +16699006833,,87290818113# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kO2EeRqYN PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand .uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/4/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2658 ORDER. Pursuant to General Orders 72-2 and 73, a re-start of the DPP trial on May 11, 2020, is not possible. The Court would like to discuss a possible June trial re-start date at a status conference to be held by Zoom webinar on May 7, 2020, at 11 a.m. The webinar details will follow. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2656 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Ruthanne Gordon (Cramer, Eric) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2655 ORDER. In light of General Order 72, the IPPs' motion for final approval of settlements (MDL Dkt. No. 1063) and motion for attorney's fees (MDL Dkt. No. 1011) will be decided on the papers. The hearing that was set for April 16, 2020, is VACATED. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2654 STATUS REPORT (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Update on Claims Status in Support of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic) by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter Regarding Claims Status in Support of IPPs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/9/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2652 MOTION for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order [UNREDACTED Version of Dkt. Entry 2302 as Ordered by Dkt. Entry 2647] filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Replies due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit E, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit F, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit G, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit H)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2657 Received Document: PROOF OF CLAIM AND RELEASE FORM CONTACT INFORMATION. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2651 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference in the DPPs' case to discuss trial scheduling issues on April 9, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., using the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. The jury will be informed that they should not return to the courthouse on April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2650 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Elizabeth R. Odette (Odette, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2649 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/25/2020. Joint statement due 3/31/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2648 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Nichicon Corporation and Nichicon (America) Corporation. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/24/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2647 ORDER. Flextronics' motion to seal, Dkt. No. #2301 , and the IPPs' motion to seal, Dkt No. #2443 , are denied for the lack of any responsive declaration filed by the designating parties as required by Civil Local Rule 79-5(e)(1). The motions filed by now-settled defendants, Dkt. Nos. #2337 , #2344 , #2358 , #2431 , are deemed withdrawn and are terminated on that basis. The motions relating to the IPPs', Flextronics' and DAPs' trials -- Dkt. Nos. #2342 , #2343 , #2345 , #2346 , #2348 , #2349 , #2371 , #2373 , #2375 , #2378 , #2380 , #2420 , #2429 , #2433 -- may be renewed closer to those trials and are administratively terminated for now. NCC, UCC and AVX's summary judgment motions, Dkt. No. #2350 , #2352 , #2354 , #2422 , were denied as to DPPs, and they may be renewed for Flextronics, DAPs and IPPs at a later date. Numerous motions to seal, Dkt. Nos. #2351 , #2353 , #2356 , #2382 , #2385 , #2400 , #2435 , #2451 , #2455 , #2462 , were provisionally filed pending the parties' meet and confer on a comprehensive stipulation or sealing motion. Those motions are administratively terminated, and the parties are directed to file their sealing stipulation or joint motion as soon as practicable. The DPPs' motion to remove an incorrectly filed document, Dkt. No. #2405 , is granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/23/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2646 ORDER. The Court sets a telephone conference for March 25, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss scheduling issues for the DPP trial. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by March 24, 2020, to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/20/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2645 Transcript of FTR Proceedings held on March 16, 2020, before Judge Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, telephone number sgoekler.csr@gmail.com; (530)941-2621. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1253 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (slgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2644 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/16/2020.FTR Time: 8:45-8:58. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2020) Modified on 3/17/2020: Matter transcribed by Sarah Goekler. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2020 Filing 2643 Brief re #2631 Brief, Defendant United Chemi-Cons Response to DPPS Proffer in Support of Admissibility of Adverse Inference Regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Anthony Olita filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #2631 ) (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2642 ORDER. The parties should be prepared to discuss at 8:45 a.m. on Monday, March 16, 2020, a suspension of the trial in light of the current public health situation. Pending further order, all parties are directed to keep non-essential personnel out of the courthouse and the courtroom gallery. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/14/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2641 Brief Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Shinobu Ishigamis Testimony about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2640 Brief Defendants Submission in Response to the Courts Request Regarding Dr. Singer filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse [Exhibits A-R])(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2639 Brief Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Tadaaki Nishizakas Testimony about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2638 DPP's Brief Regarding Curative Instruction For Dr. Singer's Testimony filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2637 Brief Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Adverse Inference Regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Ikuo Uchiyama filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2636 Brief Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Videotaped Deposition Testimony of Gordon Hoey about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2635 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/12/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 3 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2634 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/11/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 13 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2633 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/10/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 3 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2020: #3 Amended Trial Log) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2632 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Shinichi Torri's Testimony about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/10/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2631 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Adverse Inference Regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Anthony Olita filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/10/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2020 Filing 2630 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/9/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours & 44 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (Attachments: #1 Trial Log)(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2629 ORDER. DPPs may play the deposition testimony identified in proposed inference No. 2 from the Fifth Amendment proffer relating to Akitsugu Miyanishi. MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 1-2. DPPs did not show a substantial need to play the deposition questions and answers offered in support of proposed inference No. 1, MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 1, and so the testimony will not be allowed. The questions concern only the terms of Matsuo's guilty plea, which are stipulated to in detail. Miyanishi's Fifth Amendment invocations also did not prevent DPPs from discovering any information that substantive answers would have provided. In addition, DPPs did not demonstrate that proposed inference No. 3, MDL Dkt. No. 1234 at 3-4, is a permissible adverse inference. DPPs did not state a foundation for attributing Miyanishi's Fifth Amendment invocations to AVX. DPPs also fail to point to independent evidence supporting the proposed adverse inference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 7, 2020 Filing 2628 Brief Amended Proffer of Evidence in support of Adverse Inferences regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Akitsugu Miyanishi filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Filing 2627 Brief - Amended Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Noriaki Kakizakis Testimony about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020) Modified on 3/9/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2020 Filing 2626 Brief - Amended Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Testimony of Hideaki Sato about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2625 ORDER. The DPPs' Fifth Amendment proffer for witness Miyanishi, Dkt. No. 1229, does not provide the substance of the questions and answers from his deposition, or attach the independent evidence DPPs contend supports a possible inference. The Court cannot evaluate the proffer without that material. DPPs' articulation of the "substantial need" is also deficient -- for many items, DPPs are simply stating the adverse inference they are seeking, not the substantial need for the inference under the relevant case law. DPPs have also not attached the full documents containing the coconspirator statements they are seeking to admit through witnesses Hideaki Sato, Dkt. No. 1227, and Noriaki Kakizaki, Dkt. No. 1228. Again, the Court needs those documents in their entirety to evaluate these proffers. The Court will allow amended proffers in these instances, so long as that does not reduce the Court's time to evaluate them. DPPs should note in the proffers the trial day on which they intend to call the witness subject to the proffer, although DPPs are advised that the Court may not be able to rule on these proffers on their desired schedule unless the necessary documents are submitted in a timely manner. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2624 ORDER. The Court is advised that the video of proceedings on 3/3/2020 (opening statements) has been posted and may be accessed via this link: https://www.uscourts.gov/cameras-courts/re-capacitors-antitrust-litigation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/7/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2623 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Adverse Inference Regarding Fifth Amendment Deposition Testimony of Akitsugu Miyanishi filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2622 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Noriaki Kakizakis Testimony about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2621 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Testimony of Hideaki Sato about Coconspirator Statements Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2620 Brief - Proffer of Evidence in Support of Admissibility of Trial Exhibit 2813 Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 801(d)(2), 803(6), AND 804(b)(3) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2619 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/5/2020.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours 58 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas/Belle Ball. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2618 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/4/2020.Total Time in Court: 5 Hours. Court Reporter: Debra Pas/Belle Ball. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #2 Trial Log) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #2611 Proposed Order filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is nec essary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2617 Brief PROFFER OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF NORIO KASUGAS TESTIMONY ABOUT COCONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2616 ORDER. The DPPs' Rule 801(d)(2)(E) proffer for witness Norio Kasuga does not contain a list of the co-conspirator statements DPPs will seek to admit through him. Dkt. No. 1212. DPPs are directed to re-file his proffer with that list and in a revised form that is consistent with the discussion with the Court on the record today. DPPs should not plan on admitting any co-conspirator statements through Kasuga on the March 4, 2020 trial day, should they call him to the stand. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/3/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2615 Brief Proffer of Satoshi Okubo's Coconspirator Statement Testimony Pursuant to Rule 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2614 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2613 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial held on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trial Sheet) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2612 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- REVISED FINAL SET FOR JURY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/3/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2611 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Bring Demonstratives Into The Courthouse For Trial by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/4/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2020 Filing 2610 Brief Re: Plaintiffs Opening Statement Slides filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2609 ORDER re (1207 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2608 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2607 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801(d)(2)(E) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2606 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Jury Trial began on 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trial Sheet) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2605 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri . (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreeement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2604 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 1, 2020 Filing 2603 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1193 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1188 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1192 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1190 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1196 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1189 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1191 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1197 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2020)
March 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2602 ORDER. In light of the multiple settlement agreements submitted in the last several days, the trial hours are changed to 33 hours per side. The Shinyei defendants are excused from trial. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/1/2020)
February 29, 2020 Filing 2601 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri . (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/29/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2600 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS -- FINAL SET. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2599 ORDER EXCUSING ELNA CO. LTD. AND ELNA AMERICA INC. FROM MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2598 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2597 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2596 Letter from Steven N. Williams . (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2595 Letter to Court re verdict form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2594 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (2582) Administrative Motion to Bring Equipment into Courthouse for Trial ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2593 REQUEST AND ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/27/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2591 RESPONSE re #2500 Pretrial Conference Statement Joint Notice of Deposition Designations by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2590 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Settlement Agreement with Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc. d/b/a HolyStone International, and Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2589 ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/26/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2588 ORDER. The final pretrial conference is continued to 2:00 p.m. on February 27, 2020. No proceedings will be heard at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 02/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2587 Witness List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Potential Witness List and Attorney List. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2586 Proposed Order REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR MARCH 2, 2020 TRIAL by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2585 MOTION to Strike DPP Proffer filed by AVX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/10/2020. Replies due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 2/25/2020) Modified on 2/26/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2020 Filing 2584 PROPOSED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2583 REPLY in Support (re #2577 MOTION to (I) Allow Uchiyama to Testify Substantively and (II) Preclude Evidence of his Prior Invocation of Fifth Amendment Right ) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2582 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE FOR TRIAL filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2581 ORDER RE TRIAL EXPERTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/25/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2580 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2577 MOTION to (I) Allow Uchiyama to Testify Substantively and (II) Preclude Evidence of his Prior Invocation of Fifth Amendment Right) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2579 Brief PROFFER PURSUANT TO RULE 801 filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit Part 1, #4 Exhibit Part 2, #5 Exhibit Part 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2578 STIPULATION re #2559 Pretrial Order, Terminate Motions Joint Master Stipulation List filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2577 MOTION to (I) Allow Uchiyama to Testify Substantively and (II) Preclude Evidence of his Prior Invocation of Fifth Amendment Right filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 3/9/2020. Replies due by 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2576 Letter from J. Bial (NCC) re: Testimony of Dr. Stiroh and Dr. Williams. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2575 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials [Dkt No. 2574] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Reply ISO Petition of Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials [REDACTED], #3 Jury Materials [UNREDACTED]], #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2574 REPLY (re #2560 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits) [REDACTED] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2573 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS NICHICON CORPORATION AND NICHICON (AMERICA) CORPORATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2572 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS RUBYCON CORPORATION AND RUBYCON AMERICA INC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2571 ORDER GRANTING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH NICHICON AND RUBYCON DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2570 OMNIBUS ORDER RE DAUBERT MOTIONS AND MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/21/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2569 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Settlement Agreement with Panasonic and SANYO. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2567 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard J. Parker, #2 Proposed Order, #3 United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure [REDACTED], #4 United States' Opposition to United Chemi-Con Inc.'s Petition for Disclosure [UNREDACTED])(Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2566 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2560 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] ) filed byUnited States of America. (Parker, Howard) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2565 REPLY in Support (re #2540 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order ) filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2564 NOTICE by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs And Nichicon And Rubycon Defendants Local Rule 7-13 Notice Regarding Submitted Proposed Orders For Final Approval Of Settlement And Final Judgment Of Dismissal (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2563 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2560 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 15, 2020 Filing 2562 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 13, 2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1136 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1133 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1141 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1135 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1134 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1139 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1131 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2561 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Petition to Disclose Grand Jury Testimony [Dkt 2560] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farrah Berse, #2 Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony [UNREDACTED], #3 Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony [REDACTED], #4 Proposed Order Granting Petition [UNREDACTED], #5 Proposed Order Granting Petition [REDACTED], #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2560 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony and Exhibits [REDACTED] filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [REDACTED])(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2559 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/14/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2558 Letter from Steven N. Williams re: Disputed Jury Instruction No. 43A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2557 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Pretrial Conference No. 3 held on 2/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 11:00 AM. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2556 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/13/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2555 Request for Judicial Notice re #2547 Request for Judicial Notice,, Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams)(Related document(s) #2547 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2554 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa (Gaa, Reid) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2553 REPLY (re #2530 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joshua P. Davis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2552 Exhibit List Amended Joint Trial Exhibit List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Admissible Trial Exhibit List, #2 Disputed Trial Exhibit List)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2551 Response re #2523 Trial Brief byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2550 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs FINAL. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2549 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs PRELIMINARY. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2548 Joinder re #2540 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2547 Request for Judicial Notice of Plea Agreements and Associated Judgments filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2546 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (2520 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto, (1085 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto. Motion Hearing moved to 2/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2545 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2530 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric R. Sega ISO Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Preclude, #2 Exhibit 1 to Sega Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Sega Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Sega Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Sega Declaration)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2544 ORDER. The proposed jury instructions for the DPP trial are not in a form suitable for discussion at the final pretrial conference. The parties are directed to jointly file a revised set that separates preliminary and final instructions, and that follows the Ninth Circuit model instructions as closely as possible. Please consult the Court's prior instructions for guidance. The parties may propose a custom instruction only if there is no circuit model. To the greatest extent possible, any custom instruction should draw on an established source, such as the ABA antitrust model instructions. Do not put any entries re "given" etc., or a signature line for the Court, on the proposed instructions. The revised instructions should be filed by 12:00 pm on February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 02/03/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2543 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2537 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark R Suter. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2542 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2536 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Kane. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2541 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2539 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel C. Simons. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2540 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Dr. Darrell Williams and for Protective Order, filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly M. Donovan, #2 Exhibit A to Donovan Decl. - Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2539 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Simons ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14123952.) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Simons, Daniel) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2538 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-23-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2532 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2020. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2537 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Suter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14117750.) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Suter, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2536 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Kane ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14117614.) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Kane, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2535 Proposed Order re 2534 Order,,, Terminate Hearings,, by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2534 ORDER. The Court finds the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class's Supplemental Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses, MDL Dkt. No. 1046, to be suitable for decision without oral argument under Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), and vacates the hearing that was set for January 30, 2020. DPPs' counsel are directed to file a proposed order and email a copy to jdpo@cand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2532 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2533 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing & Pretrial Conference No. 2 held on 1/23/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2531 Letter from Defendants re DPPs' Pretrial Filings. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2530 MOTION for Hearing TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS INTRODUCTION OF UNDISCLOSED, DUPLICATIVE AND NEEDLESSLY CUMULATIVE EXPERT EVIDENCE AT TRIAL filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Capacitors Examples of Overlap in Defense Expert Opinions, #2 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 ORDER. The Court continues the hearing on the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion for final approval of settlements, MDL Dkt. No. 1063, and motion for attorneys' fees, expenses, and service awards, MDL Dkt. No. 1011, to April 16, 2020, at 10 a.m., after the claims period has closed. IPPs' counsel are directed to file an update by April 9, 2020, with the information requested in the "Class Members' Response" section of the N.D. Cal. Procedural Guidance for Class Action Settlements. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2528 Exhibit List Joint Trial Exhibit List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2527 Proposed Jury Instructions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2526 TRIAL BRIEF by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2525 Pretrial Conference Statement by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2524 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal on behalf of Defendants' filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Omnibus DPP MILs, #4 Unredacted Omnibus DPP MILs, #5 Redacted Version of Defendants' Exhibits ISO Opp to MIL 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Exhibits ISO Opp to MIL 2, #7 Redacted Version of Defendants' Exhibit ISO Opp to MIL 7, #8 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Exhibit ISO Opp to MIL 7)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2523 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Joint and Individual Supplemental Trial Briefs by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2522 Witness List by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Trial Witness List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2521 Proposed Voir Dire by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd. Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2520 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine and DPPs' Responses Thereto filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration Ex. 1 - Nyong'o Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2, #3 Declaration Ex. 2 - Enson Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5, #4 Declaration Ex. 3 - Tatoy Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9, #5 Declaration Ex. 4 - Hasskamp Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 10, #6 Declaration Ex. 5 - Enson Declaration ISO Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 11)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2519 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Class's Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Settlement Administration Fees and Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Stinehart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2518 ORDER. Witness Kakizaki's deposition will go forward on January 27, 2020. Counsel has established good cause for that in this circumstance, MDL Dkt. No. 1082, but the Court expects that similar delays will not be encountered for other witnesses. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2517 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2491 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2516 Letter from Joseph J. Bial to Judge James Donato. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2515 ORDER. In response to the deposition letter, MDL Dkt. No. 1079, the Court expects the parties will work together to the fullest extent possible on scheduling issues. The Court believes that seven to eight calendar days of notice for a deposition should accommodate the needs of both sides. Defendants are reminded that any witness not made available pursuant to the terms of the Court's order, MDL Dkt. No. 1076, will not be allowed to withdraw the assertion of the privilege or testify at trial. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2514 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding the Court's Order re Fifth Amendment Assertions. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2513 ORDER RE FIFTH AMENDMENT ASSERTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/15/2020. (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2512 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-16-2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2511 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/7/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2509 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2497 MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF HIS FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS AT AN EARLIER DEPOSITION ) Direct Purchaser Class's Opposition to Defendants Nippon Chemi-Con Corp.'s and United Chemi-Con, Inc.'s Motion for an Order (I) Allowing Noriaki Kakizaki to Testify Substantively at Trial and (II) Precluding Plaintiffs From Offering Evidence of Mr. Kakizaki's Prior Invocation of His Fifth Amendment Rights at an Earlier Deposition filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher K.L. Young, #2 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2508 MOTION for Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS KEMET AND SHIZUKI filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R.Saveri, #2 Exhibit A - E to Saveri Dec, #3 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #4 Exhibit A - C to Zylstra Dec, #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2507 Proposed Order re #2503 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Panasonic Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2506 Proposed Order re #2503 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Nichicon Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2505 Proposed Order re #2503 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd. by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2504 Proposed Order re #2503 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2503 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements With Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Declaration Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Elna, Matsuo, Nichicon, and Panasonic)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2502 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2497 MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF HIS FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS AT AN EARLIER DEPOSITION ) on Behalf of DAPs filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2510 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Pretrial Conference No. 1 held on 1/2/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2501 Statement In Advance of Pretrial Conference by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2500 Pretrial Conference Statement by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Initial Pretrial Conference Statement. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2499 REPLY (re #2489 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo ) filed byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2498 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2020. Replies due by 1/16/2020. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2497 MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) ALLOWING NORIAKI KAKIZAKI TO TESTIFY SUBSTANTIVELY AT TRIAL AND (II) PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF MR. KAKIZAKIS PRIOR INVOCATION OF HIS FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS AT AN EARLIER DEPOSITION filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to Berse Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Berse Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Berse Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Berse Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Berse Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Berse Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Berse Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Berse Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Berse Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Berse Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Berse Decl., #14 Exhibit 12 to Berse Decl.)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2496 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2489 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2495 NOTICE by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd. of Withdrawal of Appearance for Margaret E. O'Grady (O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2494 ORDER. The original trial date was continued shortly before the pretrial filings were due, and the continuance has been of a brief duration. Consequently, the Court is confident the parties can pick up trial preparation where they left off, with ample time to be fully prepared for trial in March 2020. There are a variety of ways to handle a witness with a genuine scheduling conflict, so that will not be a problem. An initial pretrial conference is set for January 2, 2020, at 1:30 pm to help focus and streamline trial preparation. The parties may file by December 30, 2019, a joint statement identifying any issues they would like to discuss at the conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/18/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2493 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Reset Trial Date filed by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Enson, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Proposed Order)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2492 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/17/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2491 ORDER. In light of an opening in the Court's docket, the DPP trial is restored to roughly the previous date. Jury selection and trial will begin on 03/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11. The pretrial conference is set for 02/13/2020 at 01:30 PM. All pretrial filings must be completed no later than 01/20/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/17/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2490 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF SPECIAL MASTER IP ON THE DPP COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/16/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2489 MOTION to (1) Admit Trial Testimony and (2) Preclude Evidence of Prior Invocations of the Fifth Amendment of Messrs. Inoue, Kinoshita, Imai, and Okubo filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Ceremonial Courtroom, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Nyong'o, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2488 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants KEMET Corporation and KEMET Electronics Corporation's #2359 Motion for Summary Judgment (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2486 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2484 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re (307 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2487 Letter dated 11/22/19 from Jacob Swary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2485 MOTION re #2483 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re (498 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Adopt the Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsel's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/9/2019. Replies due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2484 Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsels Request for Reimbursement of Expenses. Objections due by 12/6/2019. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2483 Report and Recommendations of Special Master on the Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class Counsels Request for Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Objections due by 12/6/2019. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2482 RESPONSE re #2473 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2481 REPLY (re #2472 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2480 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/29/2019. Replies due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs Motion for Attorneys Fees. Expenses, and Service Awards, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ben Barenz, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Gilvan Angelini, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of John Schneider, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jorge Valdes, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Mark McClure, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Mark Williams, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Matt Schwamb, #10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Michael Brooks, #11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Peter Miller, #12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Steve Wong)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2479 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2478 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kar-Lun Young on behalf of DPPs' (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2477 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding KEMET Settlement Agreement.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2476 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2472 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2475 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2474 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Taitsu Corporation and Taitsu America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2473 Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation. Signed by Special Master Jeffrey L. Bleich on 10/28/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2472 MOTION for Decertification of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Class filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2471 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri to Judge James Donato regarding Shizuki Settlement Agreement. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2470 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2468 ORDER re (984 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Motion to Appoint Expert Pursuant to FRE 706. Defendants' expert appointment request is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/4/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2467 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion)(Related document(s) #1681 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2466 MOTION to Appoint Expert Pursuant to FRE 706 filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/17/2019. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Sega, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2469 Letter from William B. Higinbotham. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2465 ORDER RE CISCO AND APTIV'S OBJECTION TO SECTION D OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND DPPS' RESPONSE. The Court would like the Special Master to address the discussion in MDL Docket Nos. 902 and 930, and submit a supplemental report within 30 days if his schedule permits. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2464 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2463 Appendix re #2352 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs filed byAVX Corporation. (Related document(s) #2352 ) (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's and Direct Action Plaintiffs' Joint Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Factual Statement Chart (Redacted), #5 Factual Statement Chart (Sealed))(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2461 Appendix re #2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Facts Chart], #2 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Facts Chart])(Related document(s) #2350 , #2354 ) (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2460 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 17, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (945 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2459 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding held on 9/17/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2458 Order by Judge James Donato granting #2218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. For good cause, the Court grants IPPs' request to seal Exhibits 2 through 34 to the Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Report in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2457 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Submission of Demonstratives Used During Concurrent Expert Witness Proceeding Held on September 17, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2456 Appendix re #2359 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Related document(s) #2359 ) (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2455 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura C. Hurtado in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Granting KEMET's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Filing of Factual Statement Chart Regarding KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2454 Appendix re #2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Fact Charts filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [NCC SJ Fact Charts], #2 Exhibit 2 [UCC SJ Fact Charts])(Related document(s) #2350 , #2354 ) (Vu, Quynh) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2453 CLERK'S NOTICE. The concurrent expert witness proceeding is re-set for 10:00 a.m. on September 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2452 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AVX Corporation re #2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of AVX Corporation's Statement of Fact Chart Related to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 AVX summary judgment chart with DPP insertions (Under Seal), #4 AVX summary judgment chart with DPP insertions (Redacted))(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2450 ORDER granting IPPs' Administrative Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2449 ORDER granting (923 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulation Between DAPs and Certain Defendants Regarding Case Schedule. The jointly requested one-week extension is granted, and the DAP-specific charts are due by September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/12/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2448 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Between DAPs and Certain Defendants Regarding Case Schedule filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2447 Supplemental Brief re #2446 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Supplemental Report and Materials to the Special Master (Monica Ip) in Support of Their Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Supplemental Report and Materials to the Special Master (Monica Ip) ISO Their Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - 57)(Related document(s) #2446 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2446 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45, #15 Exhibit 46, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50, #20 Exhibit 51, #21 Exhibit 52, #22 Exhibit 53, #23 Exhibit 54, #24 Exhibit 55, #25 Exhibit 56, #26 Exhibit 57)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO IPPs' Admin Motion to Submit Detailed Expense Records for In Camera Review, #2 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2444 Supplemental Brief re #1681 MOTION to Certify Class [REDACTED] filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1681 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2443 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Redacted Version, #4 Submitted Under Seal, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2442 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/29/2019 before Judge James Donato by United States of America, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Parker, Howard) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2441 ORDER granting (907 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulation to Withdraw Panasonic's Motion for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants Have Satisfied ACPERA to Date (re: MDL ECF No. 643). Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/26/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2440 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Withdrawing Panasonic's Motion for a Determination that the Panasonic Defendants Have Satisfied ACPERA to Date (re: MDL ECF No. 643), filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2439 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER MONICA IP. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/23/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2438 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Claims, filed byPANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2437 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Direct Purchaser Class and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, in Part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2436 REPLY (re #2357 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Dallal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Direct Purchaser Class and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, in Part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of James Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Simons Reply Brief, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Dallal, James) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2434 REPLY (re #2343 MOTION to Strike (IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #2 Errata 1)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil and Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton - Redacted, #4 Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2432 REPLY (re #2344 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byShizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaley L. Fendall, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaley L. Fendall, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Fendall, Kaley) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2430 REPLY (re #2349 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Exhibits 1-5 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 6 to Tompkins Declaration, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Janusz A. Ordover, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Janusz A. Ordover, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 5)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2428 REPLY (re #2359 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2427 REPLY (re #2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2426 REPLY (re #2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byUnited Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2425 REPLY (re #2333 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello) ) filed byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2424 REPLY (re #2347 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2423 REPLY (re #2352 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs ) filed byAVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2422 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell in Support of AVX's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Defendant AVX Corporation's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted], #5 Defendant AVX Corporation's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment [Sealed], #6 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky [Sealed])(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2421 REPLY (re #2346 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Spencer L. Simons, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Spencer L. Simons)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2419 REPLY (re #2355 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2418 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam J. Zapala (Removal of Mark F. Ram) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2417 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Notice of Submission of Declaration of Monica IP (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2416 ORDER granting (617 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Joint Administrative Motion for Permission for HP to Enlarge Time to Opt Out of the Litigation Class. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2415 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM. Fairness Hearing set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2414 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF IPPS' SETTLEMENTS WITH PANASONIC, NICHICON, ELNA, AND MATSUO DEFENDANTS, AND APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/12/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2413 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07-25-2019 before Judge James Donato by United States of America, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lem, Jacklin) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2412 ORDER granting Stipulation re Schedule for Supplemental Class Certification Briefing for IPP Actions, MDL Dkt. No. 824. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/6/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2411 ORDER RE CONCURRENT EXPERT WITNESS PROCEEDING. Set for 9/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/5/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2410 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 25, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (775 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (767 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (766 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (762 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (776 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (823 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (764 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (774 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (771 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (817 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (770 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (820 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (777 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2409 Letter from Certain Defendants and DPPs regarding September 17, 2019 expert proceeding . (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2408 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Recent Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2407 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2404 Motion Hearing,, Status Conference,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2406 Special Master's Report and Recommendation (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2405 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 7/25/2019. Motion hearing on MDL Dkt. Nos. 407 & 643 set for 8/29/2019 at 10 a.m. Status conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10 a.m. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2393 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2395 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2399 Request for Judicial Notice, #2387 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #2398 Declaration in Support, #2390 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment, #2402 Declaration in Support,,, #2389 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #2391 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2394 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2397 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2396 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2388 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #2392 Opposition/Response to Motion (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2402 Declaration in Support of #2393 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2394 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2397 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2396 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2395 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2391 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2392 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-30, #2 Exhibit 31-60, #3 Exhibit 61-80, #4 Exhibit 81-115, #5 Exhibit 116-145, #6 Exhibit 146-173, #7 Exhibit 174-178, #8 Exhibit 179, #9 Exhibit 180-209, #10 Exhibit 210-232, #11 Exhibit 233-252, #12 Exhibit 253-295, #13 Exhibit 296-300, #14 Exhibit 301, #15 Exhibit 302-310)(Related document(s) #2393 , #2394 , #2397 , #2396 , #2395 , #2391 , #2392 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2401 Proposed Order re #2393 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2395 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2391 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2394 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2397 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2396 Opposition/Response to Motion, #2392 Opposition/Response to Motion by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Holy Stone Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted version Opposition to Holy Stone MSJ)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2399 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Direct Purchaser Class's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-29, #3 Exhibit 30-45, #4 Exhibit 46-59, #5 Exhibit 60-71, #6 Exhibit 72-74, 76-82, #7 Exhibit 75)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2398 Declaration in Support of Direct Purchaser Class's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX1-TX76)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2397 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2333 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello) ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2396 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2347 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2395 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2394 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2352 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2393 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2392 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2344 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2391 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2359 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2390 EXHIBITS re #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted TX1-TX76, #2 Exhibit Unredacted TX1-TX17, #3 Exhibit Unredacted TX18-TX35, #4 Exhibit Unredacted TX36-TX60, #5 Exhibit Unredacted TX61-TX76, #6 Exhibit Redacted RJN 62, #7 Exhibit Unredacted RJN 62)(Related document(s) #2385 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2389 EXHIBITS re #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 233-252, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 233-252, #3 Exhibit Redacted 253-295, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 253-295, #5 Exhibit Redacted 296-300, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 296-300, #7 Exhibit Redacted 302-310, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 302-310)(Related document(s) #2385 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2388 EXHIBITS re #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 146-173, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 146-173, #3 Exhibit Redacted 174-178, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 174-178, #5 Exhibit Redacted 179, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 179, #7 Exhibit Redacted 180-209, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 180-209, #9 Exhibit Redacted 210-232, #10 Exhibit Unredacted 210-232)(Related document(s) #2385 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2387 EXHIBITS re #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 1-30, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 1-30, #3 Exhibit Redacted 31-60, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 31-60, #5 Exhibit Redacted 61-80, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 61-80, #7 Exhibit Redacted 81-115, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 81-115, #9 Exhibit Redacted 115-145, #10 Exhibit Unredacted 115-145)(Related document(s) #2385 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 27, 2019 Filing 2386 EXHIBITS re #2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 1-30, #2 Exhibit Unredacted 1-30, #3 Exhibit Redacted 31-60, #4 Exhibit Unredacted 31-60, #5 Exhibit Redacted 61-80, #6 Exhibit Unedacted 61-80, #7 Exhibit Redacted 81-115, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 81-115, #9 Exhibit Redacted 116-145, #10 Exhibit Unredacted 116-145)(Related document(s) #2385 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). ***Locked per filer's request.***
July 27, 2019 Filing 2385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Opp to Certain Ds' MSJ, #5 Unredacted Opp to Certain Ds' MSJ, #6 Redacted Opp to Kemet MSJ, #7 Unredacted Opp to KEMET MSJ, #8 Redacted Opp to Film Ds' MSJ, #9 Unredacted Opp to Film Ds' MSJ, #10 Redacted Opp to NCC MSJ, #11 Unredacted Opp to NCC MSJ, #12 Redacted Opp to AVX MSJ, #13 Unredacted Opp to AVX MSJ, #14 Redacted Opp to UCC MSJ, #15 Unredacted Opp to UCC MSJ)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/27/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2384 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2357 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #2346 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons ) filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Brand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit D (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit E (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit F)(Brand, Lee) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2383 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2382 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Certain Defendants' Opposition to Motions to Exclude Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #4 Unredacted Version of Certain Defendants' Opposition to Motions to Exclude Testimony of Spencer L. Simons, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Brand, Lee) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2381 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 - 75, #8 Exhibit 76 - 163, #9 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #4 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Film-Only Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 6 - 75, #16 Exhibit 6 - 75 - Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 76 - 163, #18 Exhibit 76 - 163 - Under Seal, #19 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2379 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb Redacted, #4 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Certain Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 6 - Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit 7 - Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit 8 - Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 9, #22 Exhibit 9 - Under Seal, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2377 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2355 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover, #2349 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover ) filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2376 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2352 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs ) by AVX Corporation filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Exhibits 1-22 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 23 to Tompkins Declaration, #4 Exhibits 24-68 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 69 to Tompkins Declaration, #6 Exhibit 70 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 71 to Tompkins Declaration, #8 Exhibit 72 to Tompkins Declaration, #9 Exhibits 73-74 to Tompkins Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #10 Proposed Order, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Direct Action Plaintiffs' Opposition to AVX's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to AVX Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to AVX Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 6, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 7, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 8, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 9, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 10, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 11, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 12, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 13, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 14, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 15, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 16, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 17, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 18, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 19, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 20, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 21, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 22, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 24, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 25, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 26, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 27, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 28, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 29, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 30, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 31, #35 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 32, #36 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 33, #37 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 34, #38 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 35, #39 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 36, #40 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 37, #41 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 38, #42 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 39, #43 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 40, #44 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 41, #45 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 42, #46 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 43, #47 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 44, #48 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 45, #49 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 46, #50 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 47, #51 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 48, #52 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 49, #53 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 50, #54 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 51, #55 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 52, #56 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 53, #57 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 54, #58 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 55, #59 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 56, #60 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 57, #61 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 58, #62 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 59, #63 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 60, #64 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 61, #65 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 62, #66 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 63, #67 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 64, #68 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 65, #69 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 66, #70 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 67, #71 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 68, #72 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 70, #73 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 73, #74 Unsealed Version of Exhibit 74)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2374 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by United Chemi-Con Corporation filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to UCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Robert Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Robert Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Robert Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Robert Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Robert Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Robert Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Robert Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Robert Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Robert Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Robert Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Robert Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Robert Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Robert Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Robert Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Robert Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Robert Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Robert Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Robert Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Robert Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Robert Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Robert Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Robert Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Robert Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Robert Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Robert Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Robert Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Robert Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Robert Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Robert Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Robert Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Robert Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Robert Turken Declaration)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to United Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to UCC Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to UCC Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit I, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit J, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit K, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #31 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #32 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD, #33 Unsealed Version of Exhibit EE, #34 Unsealed Version of Exhibit FF)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2372 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) by Nippon Chemi-Con filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Turken, #2 Exhibit A to Robert Turken Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Robert Turken Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Robert Turken Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Robert Turken Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Robert Turken Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Robert Turken Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Robert Turken Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Robert Turken Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Robert Turken Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Robert Turken Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Robert Turken Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Robert Turken Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Robert Turken Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Robert Turken Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Robert Turken Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Robert Turken Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Robert Turken Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Robert Turken Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Robert Turken Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Robert Turken Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Robert Turken Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Robert Turken Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Robert Turken Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Robert Turken Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Robert Turken Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Robert Turken Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Robert Turken Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Robert Turken Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Robert Turken Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Robert Turken Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Robert Turken Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Robert Turken Declaration, #34 Exhibit GG to Robert Turken Declaration)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2371 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Nippon Chemi-Con's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to NCC's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unsealed Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unsealed Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unsealed Version of Exhibit D, #8 Unsealed Version of Exhibit E, #9 Unsealed Version of Exhibit F, #10 Unsealed Version of Exhibit G, #11 Unsealed Version of Exhibit H, #12 Unsealed Version of Exhibit L, #13 Unsealed Version of Exhibit M, #14 Unsealed Version of Exhibit N, #15 Unsealed Version of Exhibit O, #16 Unsealed Version of Exhibit P, #17 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Q, #18 Unsealed Version of Exhibit R, #19 Unsealed Version of Exhibit S, #20 Unsealed Version of Exhibit T, #21 Unsealed Version of Exhibit U, #22 Unsealed Version of Exhibit V, #23 Unsealed Version of Exhibit W, #24 Unsealed Version of Exhibit X, #25 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Y, #26 Unsealed Version of Exhibit Z, #27 Unsealed Version of Exhibit AA, #28 Unsealed Version of Exhibit BB, #29 Unsealed Version of Exhibit CC, #30 Unsealed Version of Exhibit DD)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2370 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Nichicon Corporation and Nichicon (America) Corporation filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2369 ORDER, Motions terminated: (2367 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc., (718 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc... Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2368 ORDER re (704 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Direct Purchaser Class and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Omnibus Order re Attorney's Fees and Costs. The Court intends to appoint M. Monica Ip, CPA/CFF, CVA, CMA. The DPPs and IPPs are directed to request Ms. Ip to appear at the 7/25/2019 status conference to discuss her assignment. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/8/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2367 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd. Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., and Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2366 RESPONSE to Omnibus Order re Attorney's Fees and Costs by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2365 OMNIBUS ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2364 ORDER re (307 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2363 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Class Notice Program of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Motion for Approval of Class Notice Program, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2362 MOTION for Settlement (Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Panasonic, Nichicon, Elna, and Matsuo Defendants and Approval of the Plan of Allocation, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2361 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Richard Lifvendahl and Notice of Change in Firm Affiliation (Lifvendahl, Eric) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2360 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Crump (Crump, Daniel) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 2359 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-39, #3 Exhibit 40-77)(Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 2358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by KEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of KEMET's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47)(Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2357 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class and IPPs' Motion to Exclude, in part, the Proposed Expert Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Dallal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Motion, #5 Unredacted Motion, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exh B, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exh E, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exh E)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2355 MOTION to Exclude Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2354 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Proposed Order, #46 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class's Motion to Partially Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Janusz A. Ordover filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Daubert Motion, #4 Unredacted Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exh A, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exh B, #9 Exhibit Redacted Exh C, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Exh C, #11 Exhibit Redacted Exh D, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Exh D)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2352 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs filed by AVX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 (Part 1 of 4), #12 Exhibit 9 (Part 2 of 4), #13 Exhibit 9 (Part 3 of 4), #14 Exhibit 9 (Part 4 of 4), #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell in Support of AVX's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Relating to AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted - Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #5 Sealed - Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #6 Declaration of Shawn N. Skolky in Support of Defendant AVX Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Plaintiffs, #7 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 4, #15 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 5, #16 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 5, #17 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 7, #20 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 7, #21 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 8, #22 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 8, #23 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 10, #24 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 10, #25 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 11, #26 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 11, #27 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 12, #28 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 12, #29 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 13, #30 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 13, #31 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 14, #32 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 14, #33 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 15, #34 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 15, #35 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 16, #36 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 16, #37 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 17, #38 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 17, #39 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 18, #40 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 18, #41 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 19, #42 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 19, #43 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 20, #44 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 20, #45 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 21, #46 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 21, #47 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 22, #48 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 22, #49 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 23, #50 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 23, #51 Exhibit Redacted - Exhibit 24, #52 Exhibit Sealed - Exhibit 24)(Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2350 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2349 MOTION TO EXCLUDE the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Proposed Order, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2348 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Janusz A. Ordover filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2347 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal J. Singer filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johan Tatoy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2346 MOTION TO EXCLUDE Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2345 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Portions of the Proposed Expert Report and Testimony of Spencer L. Simons filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Motion to Exclude)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2344 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 7/19/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Yoshio Koyama, #2 Declaration Kaley L. Fendall, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36 (Under Seal), #39 Exhibit 37 (Under Seal), #40 Exhibit 38 (Under Seal), #41 Exhibit 39 (Under Seal), #42 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2343 MOTION to Strike (IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala ISO IPPs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of IPPs' Admin Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Redacted, #4 IPPs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Frederick R. Warren-Boulton; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2341 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SOSHIN DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2340 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO RUBYCON DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2339 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NCC/UCC DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2338 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HOLY STONE DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monder Khoury, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 39)(Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2336 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HITACHI CHEMICAL DEFENDANTS (FOR IPPS' CLAIMS). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2335 Proposed Order re #2333 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello) by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2334 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL of IPPs' Class Action Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon, and Approving the Plan of Allocation (MDL Dkt. No. 320). Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/14/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2333 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Joseph P. Russoniello) filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Organizational Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript)(Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2332 NOTICE of Appearance by Monder Khoury (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2331 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR HP TO ENLARGE TIME TO OPT OUT OF THE LITIGATION CLASS (CIV. L. R. 7-11) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2330 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/29/19, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (603 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2329 Supplemental Brief filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2328 Letter from Joseph Saveri Law Firm re Status Conference. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2019. Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2326 ORDER GRANTING (575 in 3:17-md-02801-JD), (2316 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION RE FLEX'S MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2325 CLERK'S NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (537 in 3:17-md-02801-JD), (2302 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Motion for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order. Motion Hearing re-set for 5/29/2019 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2323 STATUS REPORT Concerning Pendency of Claims Against Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2322 Supplemental Brief re #2285 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 1 of 12, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 2 of 12, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 3 of 12, #5 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 4 of 12, #6 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 5 of 12, #7 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 6 of 12, #8 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 7 of 12, #9 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 8 of 12, #10 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 9 of 12, #11 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 10 of 12, #12 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 11 of 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 12 of 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 2, #15 Exhibit Ex. 3, #16 Exhibit Ex. 4, #17 Exhibit Ex. 5, #18 Exhibit Ex. 6, #19 Exhibit Ex. 7, #20 Exhibit Ex. 8, #21 Exhibit Ex. 9, #22 Exhibit Ex. 10, #23 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 1 of 3, #24 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 2 of 3, #25 Exhibit Ex. 11, Part 3 of 3, #26 Exhibit Ex. 12, #27 Exhibit Ex. 13, #28 Exhibit Ex. 14, #29 Exhibit Ex. 15, #30 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #2285 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2321 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTERS, MDL Dkt. Nos. 580 & 584. The parties are requested to advise the Court whether this is still a live issue. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2320 ORDER. The Special Master assigned to address DPP class counsel's request for approval of settlement allocation and related objections will conduct a hearing on Friday, May 31, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. at 77 Beale Street, 32nd Floor, Lombard Conference Room. The Special Master will circulate in advance questions on which he would like counsel to be prepared to respond. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2319 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2318 Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions of experts Singer and McClave ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2318 Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions of experts Singer and McClave filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2317 REPLY (re #2302 MOTION [REDACTED] for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order re #563 Order on Stipulation granting #554 Stipulated Protective Order ) filed byFlextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Revised)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2316 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FLEX'S MOTION FOR LIMITED MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2315 ORDER re DPPs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Nichicon and Rubycon and Motion for Fees and Expenses (MDL Dkt. Nos. 497, 498). The hearing on these motions is advanced to 10:00 a.m. on May 16, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/10/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2314 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2302 MOTION [REDACTED] for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order re #563 Order on Stipulation granting #554 Stipulated Protective Order ) Defendants' Opposition to Flextronics's Motion to Modify Protective Order filed byKEMET Corporation, Kemet Electronics Corporation, NEC Tokin America, Inc., NEC Tokin Corporation. (Hurtado, Laura) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2313 Statement of Non-Opposition re #2302 MOTION [REDACTED] for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order re #563 Order on Stipulation granting #554 Stipulated Protective Order filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #2302 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2312 REPLY (re #2285 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2311 REPLY (re #2284 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Nichicon and Rubycon ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Proposed Order for Final Approval of Settlements with Rubycon and Nichicon, #3 Proposed Final Judgment as to Rubycon, #4 Proposed Final Judgment as to Nichicon)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2310 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (539) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING OBJECTION in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2309 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (538) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MDL SCHEDULING ORDER in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2308 NOTICE by Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc., Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. Notice of Withdrawal of Christopher J. Cox as Counsel for Defendants Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. and Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2307 NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama K Reddy (Reddy, Anupama) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2306 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (2294) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendants Elna Co., Ltd. and Elna America, Inc. in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (516) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendants Elna Co., Ltd. and Elna America, Inc. in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2305 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (2259) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to ROHM Co., Ltd. and ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (439) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to ROHM Co., Ltd. and ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2304 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (434) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd. and Milestone Global Technology, Inc. (d/b/a HolyStone International) in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2303 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:14-cv-03264-JD; granting (413) Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America Inc. in case 3:17-md-02801-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2302 MOTION [REDACTED] for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order re #563 Order on Stipulation granting #554 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Replies due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Flextronics International USA, Inc.'s Motion for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Limited Modification of the February 17, 2015 Protective Order, #5 Declaration of Charles R. Tompkins in Support of Motion for Limited Modification, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #19 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2300 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Hsiang Liu FOR DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD., AND HITACHI AIC INC. (Liu, Jacqueline) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2299 ORDER. The Special Master will hold an initial conference with counsel for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs ("DPPs"), Cisco and Aptiv on Thursday, April 25, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Judge Donato's courtroom. In advance of that proceeding, counsel should meet and confer to identify any documents filed in this proceeding that they feel would be beneficial for the Special Master to review, including the Court's order authorizing the distribution of funds (MDL Dkt. No. 381), the motions of Cisco and Aptiv challenging the payout of their claims (MDL Dkt. No. 391), the arguments presented on behalf of that motion (MDL Dkt. No. 473), the DPPs' responses (MDL Dkt. No. 396 and 489), and Cisco and Aptiv's reply (MDL Dkt. No. 496). Counsel should be prepared to provide printed copies of all designated documents to the Special Master at the initial conference, and to discuss a framework for ensuring fair resolution of this dispute in the timeframe set forth by the Court in Paragraph 6 of its April 10, 2019, order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2298 AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL MASTER JEFFREY L. BLEICH. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2297 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/10/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2296 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2295 NOTICE of Change of Address by Whitney E. Street (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2294 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Elna Co., Ltd. and Elna America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2293 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS. The DPPs' motion to remove incorrectly filed documents, Dkt. No. 2078, is granted; Dkt. Nos. 2076-1 and 2076-2 will be deemed stricken from the docket. AVX Corporation's motion to seal, Dkt. No. 2089, and the DPPs' motion to seal, Dkt. No. 2095, are both denied for lack of a responsive declaration from the party that designed the underlying materials as confidential. Flextronics' motions to seal, Dkt. Nos. 2104 and 2113, are denied for lack of good cause. That Flextronics previously designated its own materials as confidential is insufficient by itself to meet the sealing standard. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2292 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 21, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2291 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2290 ORDER. DPPs' motion for an order deferring ruling on Aptiv and Cisco's sealing motion is denied as moot. Aptiv and Cisco's motion for leave to file a reply in support of their sealing motion is denied. Aptiv and Cisco's motions to seal, MDL Dkt. Nos. 472, 495, are granted for good cause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/20/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2289 ORDER. The Court intends to refer the distribution dispute, MDL Dkt. Nos. 391, 473, to a Special Master at the parties' expense. At the March 21, 2019, conference, the Court will consider the parties' candidates as well as its own. No further argument on the dispute will be taken at this time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/20/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 2288 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2283 Order, Terminate Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 9 [1745-10], #2 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 11 [1745-12], #3 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 12 [1745-13], #4 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 15 [1745-16], #5 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 16 [1745-17], #6 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 21 [1745-22], #7 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 22 [1745-23], #8 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 23 [1745-24], #9 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 24 [1745-25], #10 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 25 [1745-26], #11 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 26 [1745-27], #12 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 28 [1745-29], #13 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 29 [1745-30], #14 Exhibit Film Only Defs Class Cert Opp Unredacted #1747 , #15 Exhibit Gott Decl. ISO Film Defs Consol. Opp to Class Cert_Unredaced Version [1747-1], #16 Exhibit Reply ISO Certain Ds Mtns to Exclude Prop Exp Testimony of James T McClave and J Douglas Zona Unredacted #1774 , #17 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 1--Excerpts of James T McClave Depo Tr Unredacted [1774-2], #18 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 2--Excerpts of J Douglas Zona Depo Tr Unredacted [1774-3], #19 Exhibit Redacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 2 [1745-3], #20 Exhibit Redacted Ex 154.Johnson Report [1781-3])(Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 2287 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2283 Order, Terminate Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certain Ds Joint Mtn to Exclude Prop Exp Testimony of James McClave Unredacted #1679 , #2 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 1 Unredacted [1679-2], #3 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 2 Unredacted [1679-3], #4 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 3 Unredacted [1679-4], #5 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 4 Unredacted[1679-5], #6 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 5 Unredacted [1679-6], #7 Exhibit Dalsanto Decl Exh 6 Unredacted [1679-7], #8 Exhibit Certain Ds Mtn to Exclude Prop Exp Testimony of J Douglas Zona Unredacted #1685 , #9 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 1 Unredacted [1685-2], #10 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 2 Unredacted [1685-3], #11 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 3 Unredacted [1685-4], #12 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 4 Unredacted [1685-5], #13 Exhibit Cooper Decl Exh 5 Unredacted [1685-6], #14 Exhibit Unredacted Opposition to DPPs Motion to Certify Class #1745 , #15 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 1 [1745-2], #16 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 3 [1745-4], #17 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 4 [1745-5], #18 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 5 [1745-6], #19 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 6 [1745-7], #20 Exhibit Unredacted Papendick Decl. Ex. 8 [1745-9])(Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2286 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Scott Hartley Notice of Change in Firm Address (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2285 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2284 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Nichicon and Rubycon filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2283 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' PROPOSED ORDER UNSEALING RECORD ON DIRECT PURCHASERPLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2282 ORDER GRANTING DPPS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PLAN FOR NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2281 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF DPPS' CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS NICHICON AND RUBYCON. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2280 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2231 Order, Terminate Motions Notice of Orders Denying Petition to Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2279 NOTICE by Flextronics International USA, Inc. re #2243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America, Inc. Flextronics International USA, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Opposition to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America Inc. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2278 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 24, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (466 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2277 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2276 ORDER AUTHORIZING FURTHER DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS BY DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2275 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2019. Fairness Hearing set for 5/16/2019 at 3:00 PM. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2274 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Paul Quackenbush (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2273 Proposed Order Unsealing Record on DPPs' Motion for Class Certification by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2272 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2239 MOTION to Unseal Document DPPs' Motion to Unseal the Record on DPPs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law in Support (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2271 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 166 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 167 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 168 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 169 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 170 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 171 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 172 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 173 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 174 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 175 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 176 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 177 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 178 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 179 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 180 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 181 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 182 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 183 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 186 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 187 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 188 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 189 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 190 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2270 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) DPPs' Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of Drs. McClave & Zona - Unredacted filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 2 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 3 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 4 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 5 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 6 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 7 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 8 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 9 to Saveri Decl. [1743-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit Corrected DPPs' Motion for Class Cert - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit Corrected Saveri Decl. in support of DPPs' Motion for Class Cert - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit DPPs' Reply in support of Motion for Class Cert - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 151 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 152 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 153 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 155 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 156 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 157 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 158 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 159 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 160 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 161 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 162 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 163 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 164 to Saveri Decl. [1781-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2269 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 118 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 119 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 120 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 121 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 122 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 123 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 124 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 125 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 126 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 127 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 128 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 129 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 130 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 131 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 132 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 133 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 134 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 135 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 136 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 137 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 139 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 140 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 141 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 142 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2268 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 93 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 94 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 95 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 96 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 97 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 98 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 99 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 100 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 101 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 102 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 103 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 104 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 105 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 106 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 107 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 108 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 109 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 110 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 111 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 112 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 113 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 114 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 115 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 116 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2267 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 57 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 58 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 59 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 60 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 61 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 62 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 63 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 64 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 65 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 66 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 71 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 72 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 75 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 76 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 77 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 78 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 79 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 80 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 81 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 82 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 83 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 84 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 85 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 87 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 90 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2266 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 32 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 33 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 34 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 35 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 36 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 37 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 38 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 39 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 40 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 41 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 42 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 43 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 44 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 45 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 46 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 47 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 48 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 49 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 50 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 51 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 52 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 53 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 54 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 55 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2265 EXHIBITS re #2264 Notice (Other) DPPs' Unredacted Motion for Class Certification filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 6 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 7 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 8 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 9 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 10 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 11 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 12 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 13 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 14 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 15 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 16 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 17 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 18 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 19 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 20 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 21 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 22 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 23 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 24 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 25 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 26 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 27 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 28 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 29 to Saveri Decl. [1693-1] Unredacted)(Related document(s) #2264 ) (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2264 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Filing Previously Sealed Documents in the Public Record (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2263 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 15, 2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (243 in 3:17-cv-03472-JD) Transcript Order, (442 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2262 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2244 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendants Nichicon and Rubycon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2261 Statement Regarding Status of Settlements and Impact on The Pending Class Certification Motion by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2260 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2242 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Notice of Pendency of Class Action Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-opposition to Motion for Approval of Plan for Notice of Pendency of Class Action (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Rohm Co., Ltd. and Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2258 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2242 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Notice of Pendency of Class Action , #2244 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2257 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2256 REPLY in Support (re #2239 MOTION to Unseal Document DPPs' Motion to Unseal the Record on DPPs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law in Support ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2255 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Holy Stone Enterprise, Co., Ltd. and Milestone Global Technology, Inc. (D/B/A Holystone International) filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2252 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2239 MOTION to Unseal Document DPPs' Motion to Unseal the Record on DPPs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law in Support ) filed byPANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2251 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2250 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Arguello, Sofia) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Arguello, Sofia) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2248 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (423 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Arguello, Sofia) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2245 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 13, 2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2240 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2019. (Related documents(s) #2240 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2244 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/2/2019. Replies due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Saveri, #2 Declaration of Kendall Zylstra, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2242 MOTION for Approval of Plan for Notice of Pendency of Class Action filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/31/2018. Replies due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2240 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2239 MOTION to Unseal Document DPPs' Motion to Unseal the Record on DPPs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2238 REPLY (re #2228 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Second Round Settlements with Hitachi Chemical and Soshin ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Declaration of Nicomedes Sy Herrera, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2237 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2229 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Panasonic Defendants and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation (Notice of Non Opposition) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2236 Order by Judge James Donato granting #2232 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Shizuki Electric Co., Inc. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2235 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2224 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Nichicon and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Notice of Non-Opposition) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2234 ORDER. The Court denies IPPs' request to shorten time and hold their settlement approval hearing (for defendant Panasonic) on December 6, 2018, to coincide with another settlement approval hearing they had previously noticed for that date (for defendant Nichicon). The Court will instead take up both settlement approval motions (MDL Dkt. Nos. 369 & 382) on December 20, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2233 ORDER granting (2225 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY PLEXUS CORPORATION AND NITSUKO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2232 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Shizuki Electric Co., Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2231 ORDER RE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AND DEFENDANTS' DAUBERT MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2230 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Panasonic Defendants and Approval of the Plan of Allocation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2229 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Panasonic Defendants and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/23/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2228 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Second Round Settlements with Hitachi Chemical and Soshin filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/23/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicomedes Sy Herrera, #2 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2227 NOTICE of Change of Address by Solomon B. Cera (Cera, Solomon) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2226 STATUS REPORT Concerning Pendency of Claims Against Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY PLEXUS CORPORATION AND NITSUKO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION filed by Plexus Corp.. (Esau, David) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2224 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Nichicon and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Exhibit 1)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2223 Proposed Order Authorizing Further Distribution of Settlement Funds by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2222 ORDER. The Court grants Flextronics' and DPPs' motions to shorten time, MDL Dkt. Nos. 360 & 365, and will take up on November 15, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. those parties' motions for an entry of default against defendant Nissei Electric. MDL Dkt. Nos. 358 & 364. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2221 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. (Dkt. 2220) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2220 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/8/2018. Replies due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2219 Supplemental Brief re #2218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #2176 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2-34 Redacted)(Related document(s) #2218 , #2176 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2-34 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2217 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nissei Electric Co., Inc. (Dkt. 2215) filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2216 ORDER. At the hearing on October 25, 2018, DPPs and Aptiv should be prepared to discuss the appointment of a special master for the settlement distribution dispute, and to propose names of candidates. FRCP 53. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2215 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/17/2018 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2211 Statement of Non-Opposition re #2197 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #2197 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/17/2018 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2209 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles E. Tompkins (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2208 MDL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2207 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2087 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sofia Arguello. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2206 Proposed Order re #2203 Status Report and Request to Set Scheduling Conference by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2205 NOTICE by Walker Component Group, Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2204 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2176 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation. Motion Hearing moved to 10/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2203 STATUS REPORT Update to July Joint Status Report and Request to Set Scheduling Conference by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2202 Letter from DPPs to Court re Case Schedule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to DPPs' Letter to Court re Case Schedule)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 Order by Judge James Donato granting #2042 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The motion to seal is granted. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2200 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. (Related documents(s) #2198 )(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2199 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2197 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nissei Electric Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing moved to 11/15/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2198 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Toshin Kogyo, Ltd. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2197 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Nissei Electric Co., Ltd. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/10/2018. Replies due by 10/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #2 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2196 ORDER granting DPP Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, Dkt. No. 173 in 3:17-md-02801-JD & Dkt. No. 2108 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/21/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2195 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HITACHI CHEMICAL DEFENDANTS FOR DPP ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2194 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SOSHIN DEFENDANTS FOR DPP ACTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2193 SECOND ORDER RE FTAIA. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/20/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2192 Proposed Order re #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2191 Proposed Order re #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2190 Proposed Order re #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2189 Proposed Order re #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2188 Proposed Order re #2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2187 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical, Soshin, Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and Approval of Plan of Allocation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/26/2018. Replies due by 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Eric Schachter, #3 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2186 ORDER granting (317 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Stipulated Request to Extend Time to Resolve Disputed Claims to Direct Purchaser Settlement Fund filed by Certain Members of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Settlement Class. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/10/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2185 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs of Requests for Exclusion from Settlement Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2184 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2176 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Non-Opposition (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2183 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2182 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adrian K. Felix. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2182 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12625222.) filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Felix, Adrian) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2181 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2179 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marc E. Foto. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2180 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Concerning Pendency of Claims Against Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2179 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice MARC E. FOTO ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12589046.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/13/18 filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Foto, Marc) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2178 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric L. Cramer (Cramer, Eric) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2177 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ruthanne Gordon (Gordon, Ruthanne) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2176 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/28/2018. Replies due by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2175 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice MARC E. FOTO ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12589046.) filed by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd.. (Foto, Marc) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2174 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Theodore Serra FOR DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD., AND HITACHI AIC INC. (Serra, G. Theodore) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2173 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Daniel C. Hedlund Regarding Withdrawal of Joseph C. Bourne (Hedlund, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2172 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY FLEXTRONICS INTERNATIONAL USA, INC. AND HITACHI CHEMICAL, Dkt. No. 287 in 3:17-md-02801-JD & Dkt. No. 2171 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/6/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi AIC Inc., and Hitachi Chemical Co. America, Ltd. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2170 STATUS REPORT and REQUEST TO SET TRIAL DATE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Scheduling Proposal, #2 Defendants' Scheduling Proposal)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2169 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Plexus Corp.. (Gore, Kristin) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2168 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2148 Motion to Relate Case. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 2167 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam J. Zapala re: withdrawal of Ana Gardea (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2166 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF DPPS' CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH HITACHI CHEMICAL AND SOSHIN DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2165 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS FOR DPPS' SETTLEMENTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/27/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2164 Proposed Order re #2094 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2018. Total Time in Court: 32 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/07/2018 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 2161 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/7/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (233 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2018. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/07/2018 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/30/2018 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2158 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2157 Notice (Other) Corrected Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation for Jason Hartley (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2157 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Change in Firm Affiliation for Jason S. Hartley (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2156 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Gardea (Gardea, Ana) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2155 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2154 REPLY (re #2108 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2153 REPLY (re #2107 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicomedes Sy Herrera, #2 Proposed Order Final Approval, #3 Proposed Order Final Judgment (Soshin), #4 Proposed Order Final Judgment (Hitachi))(Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2152 ORDER GRANTING IPPS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2151 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH HOLYSTONE, NCC/UCC, AND RUBYCON AND FOR APPROVAL OF THE PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Fairness Hearing set for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/25/2018. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2150 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Mouser Electronics, Inc., TTI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Borden, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew Borden, #3 Proposed Order)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2149 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2147 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Evan Patrick Boyle. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 2148 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Plexus Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Gore, Kristin) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2147 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice By Evan Patrick Boyle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12374072.) filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boyle, Evan) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2146 ORDER. For the convenience of the Court and the parties, the Court will take up all of the following motions on June 7, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. (all docket references are to the MDL docket): Dkt. Nos. 149 (Motion for Disbursement of Funds); 154 (Motion for Sanctions), 155 (Motion to Dismiss), 156 (Motion to Dismiss); 193 (Motion to Withdraw as Attorney); and 172 (Motion for Settlement) and 173 (Motion for Attorney Fees). Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/21/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2145 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2018 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ige, Lauren) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 2144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 2143 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2141 Motion Hearing, #2100 MOTION Approval of Class Notice Program for Round 2 Settlements re #2099 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and fo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2142 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 9, 2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2128 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order, (2132 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order, (2130 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order, (2137 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order, (2131 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order, (2129 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2018. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 5/9/2018. Total Time in Court: 1:35. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2139 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Plaintiff Flextronics international USA, Inc.'s Withdrawal of Its Motion to Compel Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation to Produce Witnesses For Deposition re #2121 Letter Brief (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/18 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge James Donato by Rohm Co., Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Havstad, Megan) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2135 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/10/2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2133 Transcript Order, #2134 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2018. (Related documents(s) #2133 , #2134 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2133 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2018 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2018 before Judge James Donato by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2018 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 2130 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2018 before Judge James Donato by Schuten Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Braun, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/9/18 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/09/2018 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2127 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Their Motion to Compel Mr. Abiru's Documents (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2126 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashish Sudhakaran (Sudhakaran, Ashish) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2125 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley Hyun-Jeong Kim. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2124 Declaration of Margaret O'Grady in Support of #2123 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed byNissei Electronic Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #2123 ) (O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2123 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nissei Electronic Co. LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/22/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2122 STATUS REPORT Concerning Pendency of Claims Against Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2121 Discovery Letter Brief Requesting an Order to Compel Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation to Produce Witnesses for Deposition filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (redacted version))(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Discovery Letter Brief filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Flextronics's Discovery Letter Brief Requesting an Order to Compel Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation to Produce Witnesses for Deposition (redacted version), #4 Flextronics's Discovery Letter Brief Requesting an Order to Compel Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation to Produce Witnesses for Deposition (unredacted version), #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C (redacted version), #8 Exhibit C (unredacted version))(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2119 Discovery Letter Brief Motion to Compel Production of Panasonic's April 2018 Clawbacks filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2118 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File a Letter Brief in Opposition to DPPs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 2096) filed by Panasonic Corporation. Responses due by 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2117 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2116 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME, Dkt. No. 2101 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD & Dkt. No. 160 in 3:17-md-02801-JD. The Court will hold a hearing on the IPPs' Motions for Preliminary Approval, Approval of the Plan of Allocation, and Approval of Class Notice Program on May 10, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/7/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2115 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Hyun-Jeong Kim ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12329505.) filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of good standing)(Kim, Ashley Hyun-Jeong) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2114 Discovery Letter Briefconcerning ECF 2086/122 filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (redacted version))(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Tompkins, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Discovery Letter Brief concerning ECF 2086/122, #4 Exhibit A (redacted version), #5 Exhibit A (unredacted version))(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2112 Proposed Order re #2108 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2111 Proposed Order re #2107 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2110 Proposed Order re #2107 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2109 Proposed Order re #2107 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2108 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/18/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2107 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Proposed Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2106 Statement re 2090 Order Non-Argumentative Joint Statement Regarding Pending Discovery and Administrative Issues by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2018 Filing 2105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Depositions filed by Avnet, Inc., The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Response to ECF 2089 filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2103 Discovery Letter Briefin response to AVX Corporation's Request for an Order to Compel Discovery from Flextronics filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2102 Discovery Letter Brief in response to DPPs' Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Claw-back Documents (Dkt. No. 2076) filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2101 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motions for Preliminary Approval; Approval of the Plan of Allocation; and Approval of Class Notice Program filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2100 MOTION Approval of Class Notice Program for Round 2 Settlements re #2099 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in S filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/1/2018. Replies due by 5/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Linda V. Young, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2099 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Holystone, NCC/UCC, and Rubycon and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/1/2018. Replies due by 5/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 2098 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Response to Sanyo's Motion for Protective Order and Second Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Dates filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2097 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2095 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Custodial Files of Takuya Abiru (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2096 Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Custodial Files of Takuya Abiru (Provisionally Redacted) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2095 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Custodial Files of Takuya Abiru filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 2094 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2093 Discovery Letter Brief in response to DPPs' Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce a Properly Educated Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on Conduct Topics (Dkt. No. 2092) filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2092 Letter Brief filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2091 NOTICE by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2090 ORDER. For the pending discovery dispute letters and related administrative requests, the Court grants the requests to file oversized letter briefs and to file responses. Responses to all pending letters (that were not previously responded to) should be filed by 6 pm on Wednesday, April 25, 2018. The Court specially sets a hearing for Wednesday, May 9, 2018, at 2 pm, at which the Court will resolve the pending issues from the bench. The parties are directed to file a joint, non-argumentative statement by May 2, 2018, that comprehensively lists all of the pending discovery and administrative issues to be resolved, with specific docket number references to all relevant filings for each issue. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/17/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 and 79-5 filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Kidwell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Letter Brief [Redacted], #4 Letter Brief [Sealed], #5 Exhibit A [Redacted], #6 Exhibit A [Sealed], #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C [Redacted], #9 Exhibit C [Sealed], #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E [Redacted], #12 Exhibit E [Sealed], #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H Redacted], #16 Exhibit H [Sealed])(Kidwell, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2088 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting Administrative Motions to File Under Seal, Dkt. Nos. 1652, 1677, 1678, 1680, 1684, 1686, 1722, 1739, 1742, 1744, 1748, 1750, 1773, 1776, 1777, 1782, 1785, 1806, and Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, Dkt. No. 1786. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 2087 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Sofia Arguello, ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12231581.) filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Arguello, Sofia) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 2086 Discovery Letter Brief Requesting an Order to Compel Discovery from Flextronics filed by AVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kidwell, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2085 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Toshin Kogyo Co. LTD. (Related documents(s) #2082 )(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2084 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2082 MOTION for Entry of Default As To Defendant Toshin Kogyo Co., LTD., #2083 Declaration in Support (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2083 Declaration of James G. Dallal in Support of #2082 MOTION for Entry of Default As To Defendant Toshin Kogyo Co., LTD. filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #2082 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2082 MOTION for Entry of Default As To Defendant Toshin Kogyo Co., LTD. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2081 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2080 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File an Oversized Letter Brief in Opposition to DPPs' Motion to Compel filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation. Responses due by 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2079 Statement of Recent Decision Relevant to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Class Certification by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 2078 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 2077 EXHIBITS re #2076 Discovery Letter Brief DPPs Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Clawback Documents Corrected Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to Motion to Compel, Dkt. 2076 filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #2076 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2076 Discovery Letter Brief DPPs Motion to Compel Panasonic to Produce Clawback Documents filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/1/2019) (rcsS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/1/2019) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2075 ORDER GRANTING DPPS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH HITACHI CHEMICAL AND SOSHIN. Final Approval Hearing set for 6/7/2018 AT 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2074 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Civ. L.R. 6-2 Stipulated Request to Extend Submission and Hearing Dates for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements to June 7, 2018 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 2073 Discovery Letter Brief Seeking Protective Order Temporarily Postponing Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Of Sanyo Defendants filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2072 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Letter Brief filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Letter Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2071 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2067 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byDependable Component Supply Corp.. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2070 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2067 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byCambridge Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2069 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2067 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byPANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA. (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 2068 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2067 MOTION to Relate Case ) Capacitors Defendants' Opposition To Five Rivers Electronic Innovations LLC's Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, filed byPANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 2067 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Five Rivers Electronic Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2066 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2018. Final Approval Hearing set for 4/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2065 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2058 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Crystal Marissa Johnson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 2064 STIPULATION as to Deposition of Satoshi Okubo filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2063 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2006 Motion to Relate Case. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 ORDER re telephone appearances. While DPPs did not properly post the notice on ECF, the date and time were stated on the motion papers. Dkt. No. 1997 (14-3264). The Court has also advised parties in prior orders that each party need not appear when other parties are fully capable of representing their interests, as the parties requesting a telephone appearance acknowledge. Consequently, the requests are denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 02/07/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2061 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at February 8, 2018 Hearing filed by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation. (Shores, Ryan) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2060 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at February 8, 2018 Hearing filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 ORDER re (1997 in 3:14-cv-03264-JD) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Court is advised that DPPs did not properly notice this motion in the ECF system, but in the interest of efficiency, the Court will have the parties in for a hearing on February 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., and will rule on the motion from the bench. No other issues will be taken up. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/6/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 2058 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12083339.) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Crystal) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2057 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2056 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Ige. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2056 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lauren M. Ige ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12081564.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/02/2018 filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing- District of Columbia)(Ige, Lauren) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2055 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #2052 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret O'Grady. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2054 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 25, 2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2053 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on Jan. 25, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Schuten Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Braun, Robert) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2052 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Margaret O' Grady ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12056020.) Filing fee previously paid on 01/25/2018 filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Nissei Electronic Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing- Massachusetts)(O'Grady, Margaret) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2051 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2018. Total Time in Court: 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2050 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/25/18 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2049 Declaration of Robert Kidwell in Support of #2042 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 7 and 8 to Joint Letter Regarding the End Date for Defendants' Document Production, and Plaintiffs' Compromise Proposal filed byAVX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #2042 ) (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2048 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #2054 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on January 25, 2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CSR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (14 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (12 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (15 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (13 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) Modified on 2/2/2018 (wv, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2018 Filing 2047 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 25, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Satoshi Okubo, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (McTernan, Andrew) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 2046 REPLY (re #1997 MOTION for Leave to File Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 2045 Discovery Letter Brief re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Motions to Compel re: RFP No. 33 and Interrogatory No. 35 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2044 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Reply Letter Brief in Response to Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel re RFP 33 and ROG 35 re #2038 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35, #1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators, #2039 Letter Brief, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetrius X. Lambrinos ISO Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion for Leave to File Reply Letter Brief and Exhibit A (Proposed Reply Letter Brief), #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion for Leave to File Reply Letter)(Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2043 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2042 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 7 and 8 to Joint Letter Regarding the End Date for Defendants' Document Production, and Plaintiffs' Compromise Proposal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetrius Lambrinos in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2041 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding the End Date for Defendants' Document Production, and Plaintiffs' Compromise Proposal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 8 Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2040 Order by Judge James Donato granting #2033 Stipulation Dismissing Claims by Flextronics International USA, Inc. against Soshin Electric Co., Ltd. and Soshin Electronics of America, Inc. with Prejudice. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2039 Letter Brief re #1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35, #1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Related document(s) #1954 , #1943 ) (Bial, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2038 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35, #1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators ) filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2037 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew McTernan in re non-party Satoshi Okubo (McTernan, Andrew) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2036 Declaration of Chris Megaw in Support of #2034 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #2034 ) (Megaw, Christopher) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2035 Declaration of Bonnie Lau in Support of #2034 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, For Leave to Amend Complaint filed byMatsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #2034 ) (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2034 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1997 MOTION for Leave to File Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byElna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., KEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Shizuki Electric Co., Ltd, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2033 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Soshin Electric Co., Ltd. and Soshin Electronics of America, Inc. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2032 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by United States of America, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 2031 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam John Zapala re: Removal of Joyce Chang (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 2030 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamarah P. Prevost (Prevost, Tamarah) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 2029 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/11/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2018 Transcript Order, #2014 Transcript Order, #2022 Transcript Order, #2017 Transcript Order, #2021 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (Related documents(s) #2018 , #2014 , #2022 , #2017 , #2021 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 2028 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Schuten Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Braun, Robert) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 2027 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/09/2017 before Judge James Donato by Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Megaw, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2026 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing, Discovery Hearing and Status Conference held on 1/11/2018. Total Time in Court: 1:36. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2025 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by HOLY STONE POLYTECH CO. LTD., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2024 Order by Judge James Donato granting #2005 Stipulation re Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Avnet's Amended Complaint. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2023 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 11, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bona, Jarod) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2018 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2017 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 11, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Slater, Allyson) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2016 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 11, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2014 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2013 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2012 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2011 Discovery Letter Brief re ECF No. 1993 Seeking to Compel Deposition Testimony of Per Olof Loof filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2010 Letter Attaching Letter to the Court from the Korea Fair Trade Commission re Dkt. No. 1943 Discovery Letter Brief re RFP 33, Dkt. No. 1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Interrogatory 35, & Dkt. No. 1968 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2009 Order by Judge James Donato granting IPPs' #1844 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2008 ORDER. As an informal agenda for the hearing on January 11, 2018, the Court plans to discuss with the parties: (1) the FTAIA partial summary judgment motion as to Flextronics (Dkt. No. #1661 ); (2) pending discovery dispute letters, Dkt. Nos. #1977 & #2004 , #1986 , and #1993 ); and (3) MDL organization and scheduling. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/10/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2007 Letter Brief re 1968 Order, filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1968 ) (Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2006 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Digi-Key Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Judith A. Zahid, #2 Proposed Order)(Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2005 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2004 Discovery Letter Brief in response to 1977 Discovery Letter Brief re DPPs' Motion to Compel Production of Panasonic Compliance Documents filed by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2003 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam John Zapala Re: Withdrawal of Steven N. Williams (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2002 Letter Brief RE Supplemental Authority RE FTAIA Summary Judgment Motion as to Flextronics filed byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2001 Letter from Phase II FTAIA Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 )(Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2000 REPLY (re #1984 Amended MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Discovery Stay CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1981 ) In Support of United States' Amended Motion for Limited Discovery Stay of Civil Depositions filed byUnited States of America. (Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1999 Letter Brief re 1968 Order, filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1968 ) (Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 ORDER. In light of the transition of this matter to an MDL, and the outstanding FTAIA motion, the Court defers consideration of #1681 the IPPs' certification motion pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1997 MOTION for Leave to File Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #3 Declaration of James G. Dallal in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1996 Discovery Letter Brief re Withdrawal of #1979 Letter Brief re Sanyo Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Scheduling filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 Order by Judge James Donato granting #1994 Stipulation re Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint. The deadline for Stipulating Defendants to respond to Avnet's Amended Complaint is extended to February 5, 2018. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 1994 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Avnet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 1993 Letter Brief Re Motion for Protective Order filed byKEMET Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation. (Polidora, Roxane) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 29, 2017 Filing 1992 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1981 MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Discovery Stay ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 29, 2017 Filing 1991 NOTICE of Appearance by V Chai Oliver Prentice Amended (Prentice, V) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1990 NOTICE of Appearance by V Chai Oliver Prentice (Prentice, V) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1989 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval re: Defendants Hitachi Chemical and Soshin filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/4/2018. Replies due by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph R. Saveri ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit Ex A to Saveri Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex B to Saveri Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex C to Saveri Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex D to Saveri Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex E to Saveri Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex F to Saveri Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex G to Saveri Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex H to Saveri Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex I to Saveri Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex J to Saveri Decl., #12 Declaration Kendall S. Zylstra, #13 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1988 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion For an Extension of The Deadline to Identify Deponents From January, 12 2018 to February 2, 2018 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1987 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd., Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, Nissei Electronic Co. LTD., Nitsuko Electronics Corporation, Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., Shizuki Electric Co., Inc., Soshin Electric Co., Ltd., Soshin Electronics of America Inc., Taitsu America, Inc., Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd., United Chemi-con Corporation. Filed byAvnet, Inc.. (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1986 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Relating to Internal Investigations and Disciplinary Activities filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 1985 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph R. Saveri - Joseph Saveri Law Firm (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 1984 Amended MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Discovery Stay CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1981 filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/29/2017. Replies due by 1/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikal J. Condon, #2 Proposed Order)(Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1983 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTERS. For DPPs' newly-filed letters, Dkt. Nos. #1977 & #1979 , the Court calls for responses from Panasonic and Sanyo, respectively, by January 5, 2018. For the letters relating to a further video deposition of Satoshi Okubo, Dkt. Nos. 1885, 1886, 1903, 1947, 1967, 1969, 1970, 1971, 1974 & 1975, the Court will take that issue up at the hearing on the government's #1981 motion to stay on January 25, 2018, at 10 a.m. The Court will also take up the letters relating to the 30(b)(6) deposition for NCC, Dkt. Nos. 1976 & 1978, at the January 25, 2018 hearing. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1982 ORDER. The Court continues the upcoming hearing on IPPs' #1681 class certification motion and defendants' #1661 partial summary judgment motion as to Flextronics to January 11, 2018, at 10 a.m. The Court will also hold a status conference at that time and will discuss with the parties coordination and case management issues in light of the new MDL. The parties need not file a status conference statement in advance of the conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1981 MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Discovery Stay. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 1981 MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Discovery Stay filed by United States of America. Responses due by 12/29/2017. Replies due by 1/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikal J. Condon, #2 Proposed Order)(Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 1980 NOTICE by Quathimatine Holdings, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 1979 Discovery Letter Brief re Sanyo Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Scheduling filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 1978 Discovery Letter Brief re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel NCC to Produce a Corporate Designee for a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition on Its Collusive Activities, and Response to NCC Letter Seeking Stay of This Deposition filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 1977 Discovery Letter Brief re DPPs' Motion to Compel Production of Panasonic Compliance Documents filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 1976 Discovery Letter Brief Requesting to Stay a Deposition filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A)(Bial, Joseph) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 1975 Supplemental Brief Supplemental Reply in Support of Motion for Leave filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 1974 Letter from Mikal J. Condon . (Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 1973 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd., Shinyei Corporation of America, Inc., Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Maddox, Claire) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 1972 Letter Brief re 1968 Order, filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) 1968 ) (Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1971 RESPONSE to re #1947 Supplemental Brief by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Mueller, Thomas) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1970 Brief (Certain Defendants' Brief Opposing Ruling On Adverse Inference Jury Instructions As To Alleged Co-Conspirators) filed byRohm Co., Ltd., Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1969 RESPONSE to re #1947 Supplemental Brief by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bial, Joseph) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1968 ORDER. The request in Dkt. No. 1962 for an additional 60 days to respond to discovery is granted. Defendants are urged to get the production done as soon as possible and not wait for the full 60 days to pass before acting. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1967 RESPONSE to re #1947 Supplemental Brief - Non-Party Deponent Satoshi Okubo's Supplemental Opposition to Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Satoshi Okubo in Custody by Satoshi Okubo. (Neuman, Ariel) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1966 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 1965 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 24, 2017 Filing 1964 REPLY (re #1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35, #1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators ) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Request for Additional Time to Respond (ECF No. 1962) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1963 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1962 Letter Brief re #1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35, #1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #1954 , #1943 ) (Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1961 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1960 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Holy Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., Holy Stone Holdings Co. Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1959 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1958 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1957 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 16, 2017 before Judge James Donato by Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1956 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1955 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Slater, Allyson) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1954 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 35 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1953 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1952 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1951 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2017. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Debbie Pas. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 ORDER re #1945 Discovery Letter Brief re Rule 30(b)(6) Notice Concerning ELNA's Collusive Conduct, and #1946 Discovery Letter Brief Re: Topics 1 and 2 of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6). The parties are advised that the Court will take up this discovery dispute at the hearing on November 16, 2017, at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/15/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1949 ORDER re #1943 Discovery Letter Brief re RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators. The defendants identified in plaintiffs' letter are directed to file a response by November 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 1948 Letter from Thomas Mueller Regarding Agreement of the Parties that no Responsive Briefing is Necessary (Joint). (Mueller, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 1947 Supplemental Brief re #1885 Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1885 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 1946 Discovery Letter Brief Re: Topics 1 and 2 of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Elna America Inc., Elna Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mueller, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 1945 Discovery Letter Briefre Rule 30(b)(6) Notice Concerning ELNA's Collusive Conduct filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 1944 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Japan Trustee Services Bank, Ltd. for Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 1943 Discovery Letter Briefre RFP 33 and Production of Non-Ordinary Documents Provided to Foreign Regulators filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1942 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1939 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shalia Marie Sakona. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 1941 EXHIBITS re #1939 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11843869.) Certificate of Good Standing filed byThe AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Related document(s) #1939 ) (Sakona, Shalia) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 1940 REPLY (re #1887 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 1939 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11843869.) filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Sakona, Shalia) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 Order by Judge James Donato granting IPPs' #1649 Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1937 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT OKAYA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1936 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT NITSUKO ELECTRONICS COPRORATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1935 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS TOKIN CORP. AND TOKIN AMERICA, INC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 Order by Judge James Donato granting IPPs' #1704 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements with Defendants NEC TOKIN, Nitsuko, and Okaya and Approving the Plan of Allocation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1933 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Havstad, Megan) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1932 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1908 Motion to Relate Case. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1931 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 26, 2017 before Judge James Donato by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1930 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by AVX Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Nadel, Evan) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1929 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Panasonic Corporation, SANYO Electric Co., Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1928 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Weiss, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1927 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Martinez, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 1926 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2017. ; ***Motions terminated: #1826 MOTION to Dismiss AASI BENEFICIARIES' TRUST'S COMPLAINT filed by Shizuki Electric Co., Inc..; denying #1826 Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on #1885 Discovery Letter Brief; deferring ruling on #1886 Discovery Letter BriefTotal Time in Court: 17 Minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1925 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1919 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018. (Related documents(s) #1919 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1906 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jerry Goldsmith. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1923 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-con Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Sega, Eric) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1922 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Flextronics International USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1921 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1920 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Okaya Electric America Inc., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Prescott, Darrell) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1919 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd., Hitachi Chemical Company America, Ltd., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1918 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge James Donato by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1917 Order by Judge James Donato granting #1916 Request for Non-Party Satoshi Okubo's Counsel to Appear by Telephone at October 26, 2017 Hearing. The Court grants the request. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1916 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at October 26, 2017 Hearing filed by Satoshi Okubo. (Neuman, Ariel) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1915 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1887 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byThe AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1914 ORDER. The Court intends to take up the Okubo deposition and case schedule issues at the October 26, 2017 hearing. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/25/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1913 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Zahid for The AASI Beneficiaries' Trust, By and Through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee (Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 1912 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 10, 2017 before Judge James Donato by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1911 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2017 before Judge James Donato by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1910 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Japana Trustee Services Bank, Ltd. for Nippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1909 NOTICE of Appearance by Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos (Lambrinos, Demetrius) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1908 MOTION to Relate Case Nippon Chemi-Con filed by United States of America. (Carlberg, Christopher) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1907 Letter from Certain Defendants Re Case Schedule . (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1906 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11809392.) filed by The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Goldsmith, Jerry) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1905 Letter from Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs regarding United States' Status Report. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1904 Letter from Mikal J. Condon United States' Status Report 10/18/2017. (Condon, Mikal) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1903 Letter Brief filed bySatoshi Okubo. (Neuman, Ariel) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 1902 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/17, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1891 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Related documents(s) #1891 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1901 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fujitsu Ltd. (Friedman, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2017)