Greer v. City of Hayward et al

Plaintiff: Joseph James Greer
Defendant: City of Hayward and Bay Area Rapid Transit
Case Number: 3:2015cv02307
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/05/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
January 17, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick re 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. BART's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Tougas's motion is granted with respect to the denial of medical care and denied in all other respects. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
October 11, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 STIPULATION to extend deadline for dispositive motion hearing to 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
July 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER To Continue Discovery Deadlines, Trial date, and corresponding dates. Discovery Cut-off: 9/30/2016. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 12/7/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2017 02:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/10/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
November 24, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
August 20, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/19/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. City of Hayward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hayward
Represented By: Michael Gregory Vigilia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph James Greer
Represented By: Stanley Craig Goff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?