Sharifi v. Elite Line Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mohammad Sharifi
Defendant: Elite Line Services, LLC, Ken Fowler and Patty Niekamp
Case Number: 3:2015cv03677
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 25, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/5/2016 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 TO EXTEND MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES AS AMENDED BY THE COURT. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2016. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/21/2016 Continued to 6/23/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 27, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/27/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
November 19, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation.Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
August 26, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/26/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharifi v. Elite Line Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Sharifi
Represented By: Yousef J. Totah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Line Services, LLC
Represented By: Alan M. Kaplan
Represented By: Asa William Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Fowler
Represented By: Alan M. Kaplan
Represented By: Asa William Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Niekamp
Represented By: Alan M. Kaplan
Represented By: Asa William Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?