Anderson et al v. Dooley

Plaintiff: Bruce Anderson, John Wilson, Robert Austin and California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform
Defendant: Diana Dooley
Case Number: 3:2015cv05120
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE.(Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
January 25, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation to Change Hearing Date re 11 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 10, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 8 Stipulation Extending Time for Filing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Eva Krisztina Schueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilson
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Eva Krisztina Schueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Austin
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Eva Krisztina Schueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Eva Krisztina Schueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Dooley
Represented By: Hadara Rachel Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?