Pedro et al v. Millennium Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nina Pedro and Roseline Lewis
Defendant: Millennium Products, Inc., George Thomas Dave and Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05253
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY; TRANSFERRING ACTION TO CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. To the extent Millennium seeks a stay of the above-titled action, the motion is denied. To the extent Millenniu m seeks a transfer of the above-titled action, the motion is granted, and the above-titled action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 20, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MARCIO W. VALLADARES PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 31, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF OPPOSITION AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
February 5, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 25, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF COMPLAINT AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. To facilitate the Court's review of the case, plaintiffs are directed to submit forthwith chambers copies of the Complaint, filed November 17, 2015, and the First Amended Complaint, filed December 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 4, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF JOHN A. YANCHUNIS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedro et al v. Millennium Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Thomas Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Pedro
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseline Lewis
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?