Gary Arabian v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Gary Arabian
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc, New Century Volkswagen, Solazyme, Inc. and Amyris, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv06128
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (11 in 3:16-cv-00359-CRB) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Amyris Inc, (12 in 3:16-cv-00769-CRB),(16 in 3:16-cv-00357-CRB);(14 in 3:16-cv-00884-CRB),(23 in 3:16-cv-00369-CRB) (1504 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB). Attorney Laurie Carr Mims terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (15 in 3:16-cv-00884-CRB) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Solazyme, Inc., (1503 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Solazyme, Inc.. Attorney Matthew H. Marmolejo; John Nadolenco; Neil Michael Soltman; Andrew Z. Edelstein terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 17, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (18 in 3:16-cv-00357-CRB), (14 in 3:16-cv-00769-CRB), (25 in 3:16-cv-00369-CRB), (13 in 3:16-cv-00359-CRB), (22 in 3:15-cv-06128-CRB), (16 in 3:16-cv-00884-CRB), (1502 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB). Andrew Zachary Edelstein terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Arabian v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Arabian
Represented By: Kris Demirjian
Represented By: Leonard S. Sands
Represented By: Daniel Z Srourian
Represented By: Heleni Eugenia Suydam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Edelstein
Represented By: Matthew Henry Marmolejo
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Neil Michael Soltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Volkswagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solazyme, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amyris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?