Abu Maisa, Inc. v. Flint Mobile, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Abu Maisa, Inc.
Defendant: Flint Mobile, Inc, Google, Inc., Intuit, Inc., Paypal, Inc., Square, Inc. and Stripe, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv06338
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 53 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
October 25, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Mediation Deadline filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
August 29, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Case Management And Mediation Deadlines filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
June 16, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER POSTPONING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING filed by Intuit, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 19, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
March 16, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 8, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE re 19 Order Reassigning Case. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/16. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abu Maisa, Inc. v. Flint Mobile, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abu Maisa, Inc.
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Mobile, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?