Trulove v. San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Jamal Rashid Trulove
Defendant: City & County San Francisco, Maureen D'Amico, Michael Androvich, Francis J. Hagen, Carla Lee, Kevin Noble, Shawn Phillips, Anthony Ravano, James Trail, James D. Aherne, Robert T McMillan, Michael E Johnson, Robert Daniele, Jennifer Jackson, Daniel Silver, Donna Meixner, John F Murphy, Michael F. Stasko and Stephen Tittel
Case Number: 3:2016cv00050
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2018 607 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION OF DEFENDANTS D'AMICO AND JOHNSON FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, FOR A NEW TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A REMITTITUR by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying 574 Motion for New Trial. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
April 19, 2018 550 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON VERDICT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/19/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 5, 2018 515 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT re Carla Lee Hurley. Order to Show Cause Hearing/and Evidentiary Hearing is set for Wednesday, 4/18/2018 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2018. Attorney Notice of Appearance and acknowledgment of service of summons filed by 4/9/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/5/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
March 11, 2018 446 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7 DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ADMITTING PORTIONS OF TRIAL TESTIMONY 436 AND RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO DESIGNATIONS OF LUALEMAGA DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2018)
March 7, 2018 439 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 DENYING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE TRAINUM AND FOR ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 435 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 3 AND 5. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 418 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 28, 2018 403 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND JUROR INVESTIGATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/28/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 169 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion ; granting 173 Motion ; granting 174 Motion. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 23, 2018 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL AT TRIAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 324 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 340 Administrative Motion to Fi le Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 365 Administrative Moti on to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 370 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 371 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 377 Administrat ive Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 175 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 176 Adm inistrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part [2 07] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and de nying in part 277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 307 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in par t and denying in part 308 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; grantin g in part and denying in part 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 22, 2018 385 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 RE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/22/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
January 25, 2018 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DEPOSITION re 288 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Orders of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
December 4, 2017 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON FABRICATION AND BRADY CLAIMS; SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/4/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
September 19, 2017 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND EXPERT MOTIONS; DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CLARIFY DEFENDANTS AND BASIS FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION CLAIM (COUNT TWO). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/19/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
April 27, 2017 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying in part and granting in part 120 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
February 9, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 106 Motion to Amend ; Plaintiff Trulove is required to E-FILE the amended document. Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
October 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
August 31, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/31/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 27, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 68 Motion for Leave to File a Response. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 17, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 54 Stipulation for Order Changing Time. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 35 Stipulation.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 3, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 11, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim Granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trulove v. San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Rashid Trulove
Represented By: Nick J. Brustin
Represented By: Kate LaGrande Chatfield
Represented By: Danielle Hamilton
Represented By: Anna Benvenutti Hoffmann
Represented By: Anna Benvenutti Hoffmann
Represented By: Alexander Bradfield Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County San Francisco
Represented By: Peter J. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Androvich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ravano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Trail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Aherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Daniele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Meixner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Stasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tittel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?