Bodri v. GoPro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bodri
Defendant: GoPro, Inc., Nicholas Woodman and Jack Lazar
Movant: Barry Lee Deem
Case Number: 3:2016cv00232
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Entering Final Judgment in Favor of Defendants filed by Camia Investment LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 5/19/2017 granting 110 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. (tnS) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 94 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re (89 in 3:16-cv-00232-JST) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Majesty Palms, LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 85 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Majesty Palms, LLP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE, IN PART, AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (32) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (32) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (36) Motion to Appoint Lea d Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (40) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (40) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (15) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases; d enying (16) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (21) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (26) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying (26) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-00232-JST; denying (14) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:16-cv-00338-JST; denying (17) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:16-cv-00598-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (22 in 3:16-cv-00598-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Continuing Case Management Conferences filed by GoPro, Inc., Nicholas D. Woodman, Anthon y J. Bates, Jack R. Lazar; (47 in 3:16-cv-00232-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Continuing Case Management Conferences filed by Jack Lazar, GoPro, Inc., Nicholas Woodma n; (19 in 3:16-cv-00338-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Continuing Case Management Conferences filed by Jack Lazar, GoPro, Inc., Nicholas Woodman; (11 in 3:16-cv-00845- JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Continuing Case Management Conferences filed by Jack Lazar, GoPro, Inc., Nicholas Woodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of referral for purpose of determining relationship. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodri v. GoPro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bodri
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoPro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Woodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Barry Lee Deem
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?