Robertson v. Muniz

Plaintiff: La'Sane Lee Robertson
Defendant: W. L. Muniz
Case Number: 3:2016cv01889
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/21/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 12, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/12/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
June 21, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION;INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Sane Lee Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?