McComas v. Rohnert Park et al

Plaintiff: Don McComas
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park and David Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2016cv02705
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Parties hereto, by their counsel, having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause be dismissed with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto s hall certify to this Court, with proof of service of a copy to opposing counsel, within ninety (90) days from the date of this order, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/14/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 3, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 33 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/03/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
September 28, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Quash. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding the subpoena and the possibility of entering into a stipulated protective order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
August 25, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/22/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McComas v. Rohnert Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don McComas
Represented By: Daniel B. Beck
Represented By: Evan Martyndale Livingstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park
Represented By: Raymond J. Fullerton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rodriguez
Represented By: Raymond J. Fullerton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?