Choudhry v. Regents of the University of California et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Professor Sujit Choudhry is the former Dean of Berkeley Law. He alleged that Defendants The Regents of the University of California and Janet Napolitano violated his due process rights by seeking to impose a second disciplinary process for the same conduct covered by an earlier settlement agreement between the parties. Plaintiff also alleged that defendants violated his right to equal protection by treating him, an Indian of South Asian descent, less favorably than other faculty who have committed actual predatory conduct.

Plaintiff: Sujit Choudhry
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, Janet Napolitano, Nicholas B. Dirks, Carol Christ, Janet Broughton and Benjamin E. Hermalin
Case Number: 3:2016cv05281
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 12 Summons Issued as to Janet Broughton, Carol Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Benjamin E. Hermalin, Janet Napolitano, Regents of the University of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 19, 2016 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven N. Herman. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 19, 2016 10 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William W. Taylor, III. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 19, 2016 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10779108.) filed by Sujit Choudhry. (Herman, Steven) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 16, 2016 8 Proposed Summons. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 7 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10778028.) filed by Sujit Choudhry. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Taylor, William) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 6 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD*** Proposed Summons. (Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/21/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 5 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Caroline Judge Mehta. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 1 Complaint Part 2 Proposed Summons, filed by Sujit Choudhry Proposed Summons is Incomplete Missing Defendant(s) Information for Service (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/16/16. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2016: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 3 Featured Case MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Caroline Judge Mehta ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10774880.) filed by Sujit Choudhry. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mehta, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2016 2 Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10771602.). Filed bySujit Choudhry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2Proposed Summons)(Dupree, Jamie) (Filed on 9/15/2016) Modified on 9/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choudhry v. Regents of the University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sujit Choudhry
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Steven N Herman
Represented By: Caroline Judge Mehta
Represented By: William W Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas B. Dirks
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Christ
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Broughton
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin E. Hermalin
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Sara Nadine Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?