Scott et al v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Andre Scott, Ken Fassler and Elijah Maxwell-Wilson
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06869
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE AND RESETTING CMC. Further Case Management Conference reset for 9/14/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. CMC Statement due by 9/7/2017.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 24, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 35 Discovery Letter Brief.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
May 26, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiff Fassler's FLSA Claim and Preserving Comcast's Right to Move to Compel Claims to Arbitration filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
February 21, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 - Third Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Pending Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Andre Scott and Elijah Maxwell-Wilson's Claims Under the Fair Labor Standard filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott et al v. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Scott
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Fassler
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Maxwell-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?