Young America's Foundation et al v. Napolitano et al
Plaintiff: Berkeley College Republicans and Young America's Foundation
Defendant: Janet Napolitano, Carol T. Christ, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Stephen C. Sutton, Nicholas B. Dirks, Alex Yao and Margot Bennett
Interested Party: United States of America, Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2017cv02255
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE CASE by Berkeley College Republicans, United States of America, Department of Justice, Young America's Foundation (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING ALL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AND JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING ALL DEADLINES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #73 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Second Amended Complaint due by 12/4/2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RESETTING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Second Amended Complaint is December 4, 2018; defendants' deadline to file a response is January 8, 2019. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to March 1, 2019; the parties shall file a Case Management Statement by February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #71 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 1/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RESETTING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Second Amended Complaint is October 31, 2018; defendants' deadline to file a response is December 4, 2018. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to January 18, 2019; the parties shall file a Case Management Statement by January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg for Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao of Withdrawal of Attorney Jeslyn A. Everitt (Everitt, Jeslyn) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Berkeley College Republicans. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 8/21/2018. Further facilitated discussions expected on August 28, 2018. (Not Reported)(Time: 5.0)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Harmeet Dhillon; Gregory Michael.Attorneys for Defendants: Bryan Heckenlively; Elizabeth Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2018)
June 14, 2018 ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Hearing/Deadlines as to #67 Order : Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2018. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION. Plaintiffs shall file any Second Amended Complaint no later than October 1, 2018. Defendants' deadline to respond thereto is November 2, 2018. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 24, 2018, to December 7, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/14/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 6/5/2018. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time: 3.5 hours)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Harmeet Dhillon; Gregory Michael.Attorney for Defendants: Bryan Heckenlively. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2018)
May 4, 2018 ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 Order : Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2018 10:30 AM. Amended Complaint due by 6/26/2018. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2018. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION. Plaintiff shall file any SAC no later than 6/26/18; defendant shall file response no later than 7/26/18; Case Management Conference is continued to 8/24/18. Signed by Judge Maxine M.Chesney on 05/04/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINE; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/25/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #60 Stipulation Continuing In Person Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference reset for 6/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #57 Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 59 Supplemental Brief re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byBerkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2018. Further Telephone Conference set for 4/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall use the same conference call dial-in number. In Person Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2018 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time: 30 minutes)Attorneys for Plaintiff: Harmeet Dhillon; Gregory Michael; Krista Baughman.Attorney for Defendants: Bryan Heckenlively. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2018)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/07/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/06/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 55 Request for Judicial Notice re #54 Supplemental Brief, in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byMargot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan H. Heckenlively, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 54 Supplemental Brief re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byMargot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 53 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Magistrate Judge Referral filed by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 3/2/2018) Modified on 3/6/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2018 Filing 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/18, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Vicki Eastvold, telephone number 218-355-8781. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (veS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2018 before Judge Maxine M. Chesney by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao, for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2018. re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas B. Dirks, Margot Bennett, Leroy M. Harris, Joseph D. Greenwell, Stephen C. Sutton, Janet Napolitano, Alex Yao, Carol T. Christ Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 6/1/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor.Total Time in Court: 3:46. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. Plaintiff Attorney: Harmeet Dhillon; Gregory Michael. Defendant Attorney: Bryan Heckenlively; Elizabeth Kim. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2018 before Judge Maxine M. Chesney by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation, for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE to re #44 Statement of Interest By U.S. Department of Justice by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF INTEREST BY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/05/2018. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 46 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To File Response to Statement of Interest by US DOJ filed by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. Responses due by 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration B. H. Heckenlively, #2 Response to Statement of Interest by US DOJ, #3 Proposed Order)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byMargot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 44 Statement of Interest by United States of America, Department of Justice. (Helfman, Tara) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/23/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Page Limits on Reply re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byBerkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Page Limits on Reply re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D. Greenwell, Leroy M. Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C. Sutton, Alex Yao. Responses due by 1/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan H. Heckenlively, #2 Proposed Order)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/18/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byBerkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
December 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Opposition due by 1/12/2018. Reply due by 1/26/2018. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 39 Proposed Order re #38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/22/2017. Replies due by 12/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice or for Application of the Incorporation by Reference Doctrine, #2 Declaration of Bryan Heckenlively and Exhs 1-10)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/08/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 36 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION with STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS filed by Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. Responses due by 12/7/2017. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 16, 2017 Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. The docket text has been modified to show the date served. Re: #34 Summons Returned Executed filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2017 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. All Defendants served on 11/15/17, answer due 12/6/17. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 11/15/2017) Modified on 11/16/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2017 Electronic filing error. Please file the Proposed Summons as a separate entry in future filings. Re:[32-22] Proposed Summons filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2017 Filing 33 First Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Margot Bennett, Carol T. Christ, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2017 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao, Carol T Christ. Filed byBerkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Summons First Amended Summons)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #31 Order,, Terminate Motions, First Amended Complaint due by 11/10/2017. Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2018. Dispositive Motion due by 12/8/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/30/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/27/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Briefing Deadlines, Motion Hearing, and Case Management Conference filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/29/2017 before Judge Maxine M. Chesney by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 28 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/29/17, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #26 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018. (Related documents(s) #26 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Motions terminated: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/02/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/29/2017 before Judge Maxine M. Chesney by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2017. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Nicholas B. Dirks, Margot Bennett, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Joseph D Greenwell, Alex Yao, Stephen C Sutton Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 1/19/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 41 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Harmeet Dhillon; Gregory Michael. Defendant Attorney: Bryan Heckenlively; Jeslyn Everitt; Elizabeth Kim. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 24 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Young America's Foundation, Berkeley College Republicans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bradley Devlin, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Declaration of Naweed Tahmas, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 9/6/2017) Modified on 9/7/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs shall file the sur-reply in the form attached to the administrative motion no later than September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to file sur-reply, or alternatively, to strike reply evidence re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byMargot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to file sur-reply, or alternatively, to strike reply evidence re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. Responses due by 9/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Baughman, Krista) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 20 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byMargot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M Reynoso, #2 Declaration E Topp)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byBerkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Harmeet K. Dhillon In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Harmeet K. Dhillon, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Harmeet K. Dhillon, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Harmeet K. Dhillon)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 10/27/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Opposition due by 8/11/2017. Reply due by 8/25/2017. Motion Hearing reset to 9/29/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. All Defendants served on 4/27/17. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 6/30/2017) Modified on 7/5/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss no later than August 11, 2017, and defendants shall file their reply no later than August 25, 2017. Due to the Court's schedule: (1) the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is continued to September 29, 2017; and (2) the Initial Case Management Conference is continued to October 27, 2017, and all related deadlines are continued in accordance therewith. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/30/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #15 Order, Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 9/29/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Resetting Briefing Schedule, and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for July 28, 2017, is hereby continued to September 29, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byMargot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/12/2017. Replies due by 7/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Bryan H. Heckenlively, #3 Declaration of Andrew Goldblatt)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION To Set Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Complaint On June 28, 2017 filed by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Berkeley College Republicans (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan H. Heckenlively (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Joseph D Greenwell, Leroy M Harris, Janet Napolitano, Stephen C Sutton, Alex Yao. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/25/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation.. (Michael, Gregory) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/8/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive, Declaratory, and Monetary Relief; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11335230.). Filed by Berkeley College Republicans, Young America's Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Proposed Summons)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Modified on 4/26/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young America's Foundation et al v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America, Department of Justice
Represented By: Tara Helfman
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol T. Christ
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Greenwell
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy M. Harris
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas B. Dirks
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Yao
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margot Bennett
Represented By: Jeslyn A. Everitt
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkeley College Republicans
Represented By: Krista Lee Baughman
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Krista L Baughman
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young America's Foundation
Represented By: Krista Lee Baughman
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Krista L Baughman
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?