Streed et al v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al.,

Plaintiff: Edwin Streed, Margaret Streed, Shirley Miller, Phyllis Bennett, Sandra Bivens, William Murphy, Charles Rhodes, Vicki Reed, Elizabeth Clark, Noah Medford, Richard Reed, Arthur Olstad, Joseph Huddock, Cathy Smith, Ray J. Hubler, Karen Medford, Janice Susan Slusser, Larry Slusser, Maire Hubler, Edward L. Bivens, Helen Calvin, Shirley Hart, Ernestine Salvo, Kathleen Olstad, Jerome Cobb, Robert Smith, Sandra Rhodes, Robert Perkins, Bonnie Murphy and James Calvin
Defendant: EON Labs, Inc., Upsher-Smith Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., McKesson Corporation, BARR Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Mayne Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02609
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 18, 2017 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for September 1, 2017, is continued to September 29, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 14, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. The August 18, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 18, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion to remand is continued to August 18, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
July 12, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-3825-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/12/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 11, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Nicole M. Battisti is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 6, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Douglas B. Maddock, Jr. is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/06/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 23, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The August 4, 2017 hearing on defendant McKesson Corporation's motion to dismiss is vacated and will be reset, if appropriate, following the Court's determination as to subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Edward K. Wood, Jr. is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
May 26, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing hearing as to 25 MOTION to Sever to 8/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Portions of Motions to Dismiss that concern issues other than personal jurisdiction w ill also be heard on August 9, 2017. Motion to remand and the portions of Motions to Dismiss that concern the issue of personal jurisdiction will be heard on July 19, 2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streed et al v Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Streed
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Streed
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Miller
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Bennett
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bivens
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Murphy
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rhodes
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Reed
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Clark
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Medford
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reed
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Olstad
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Huddock
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray J. Hubler
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Medford
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Susan Slusser
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Slusser
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maire Hubler
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. Bivens
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Calvin
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Hart
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Salvo
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Olstad
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Cobb
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rhodes
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Perkins
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Murphy
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Calvin
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EON Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upsher-Smith Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: G. Gregg Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah K Frederick
Represented By: Glenn Stuart Kerner
Represented By: April Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanette Eva Thurber Barzelay
Represented By: George J. Gigounas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Cantrell
Represented By: Thomas Michael Frieder
Represented By: Joanna Lee Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Represented By: Tom Prountzos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARR Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah K Frederick
Represented By: Glenn Stuart Kerner
Represented By: April Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto Manuel Alonso Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto Manuel Alonso Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayne Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Represented By: Ellen Lynn Darling
Represented By: Andrew Shaun Gahan
Represented By: Daniel J. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?