SolarEdge Technologies Inc. et al v. Enphase Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
SolarEdge Technologies Inc. and SolarEdge Technologies Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Enphase Energy, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv04047 |
Filed: |
July 18, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Outside US |
Presiding Judge: |
Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1114 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 22, 2017 |
Filing
126
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 125 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SolarEdge Technologies Ltd., Enphase Energy, Inc., SolarEdge Technologies Inc. * The Friday, December 22, 2017 at 9:01 AM Compliance hearing is VACATED.* Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/22/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
|
September 7, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by SolarEdge Technologies Ltd., SolarEdge Technologies Inc. Joint filing by close of business on 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/7/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
46
SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2017. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/30/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/30/2017. Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2017. Opening Reports due by 9/25/2017. Rebuttal Reports due by 10/25/2017. Jury Selection set for 12/18/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 12/18/17 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor Oakland be fore Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive and Daubert Motions filed by 11/3/2017. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/20/2017.Dispositive and Daubert Motion Hearing set for Friday, 12/1/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakl and before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for THURSDAY, 11/9/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/11/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Setting Expedited Schedule for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Friday 8/4/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?