Contour IP Holding, LLC v. GoPro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Contour IP Holding, LLC
Defendant: GoPro, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04738
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER ON MOTION FOR AN ACCOUNTING OR ONGOING ROYALTY by Judge William H. Orrick denying 514 Motion without prejudice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick re: 472 Administrative Motion, 473 Motion to Strike, 474 Motion in Limine, 475 Motion in Limine, 490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and 495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY, AND MOTIONS TO SEAL (redacted of confidential information) by Judge William H. Orrick. Contour shall provide GoPro with any supplemental report on or by September 18, 2020, and GoPro may depose Ugone for no more than three hours within 20 days of service of the report. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES CONCERNING GOPRO'S INVALIDITY REPORT AND CONTOUR'S EXPERT REPORTS by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 347 , 351 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER ON THE SCOPE OF IPR ESTOPPEL AND ON GOPRO'S 313 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING 262 MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting 273 STIPULATION to Extend GoPro, Inc.'s Time to File Reply as to 262 MOTION to Stay. Reply due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/18/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION; GRANTING IN PART 232 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER DENYING 188 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. GoPro shall file an answer within 20 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contour IP Holding, LLC v. GoPro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contour IP Holding, LLC
Represented By: Ian Barnett Brooks
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Represented By: Michael David Hemes
Represented By: Nicole Marie Jantzi
Represented By: John R. Keville
Represented By: Matthew R. McCullough
Represented By: Paul M. Schoenhard
Represented By: Erin Corinne Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoPro, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Karineh Khachatourian
Represented By: Daniel T. McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?