Magee v. U.S. District Court for Northern District of California

Defendant: U.S. District Court for Northern District of California
Petitioner: Ruchell Cinque Magee
Case Number: 3:2018cv07112
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: PSLC MWD
1 Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 6 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Re #4 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 8, 2019 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: Sent by U.S MAIL certified copies of #4 Order, #1 Petition, #3 Clerk's Notice(s), Civil Docket to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in San Francisco, California. Re #4 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #1 Court's Return Envelope) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
November 30, 2018 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 1/7/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2018 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/31/2018. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus ( Filing fee $400 ). Filed byRuchell Cinque Magee. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee v. U.S. District Court for Northern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. District Court for Northern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruchell Cinque Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?