Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. West et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Patricia Elizabeth West and P & T West Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01455
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 6/18/2019. Deadline to amend/add parties: 7/19/2019. Close of Fact Discovery: 10/18/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019). Dispositive motions to be heard by 12/18/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2020 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 3/9/2020 08:00 AM, both before Judge William H. Orrick in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. FTR Time: 2:03-2:10. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by P & T West Holdings, LLC, Patricia Elizabeth West (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by P & T West Holdings, LLC, Patricia Elizabeth West.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. P & T West Holdings, LLC served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Patricia Elizabeth West served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brandt McCann (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byP & T West Holdings, LLC, Patricia Elizabeth West. (McCann, Trevor) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/15/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc... (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to P & T West Holdings, LLC, Patricia Elizabeth West. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13188117.). Filed byInnovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Elizabeth West
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & T West Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Trevor Brandt McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?