O'Diah v. Benton et al
Plaintiff: Aror-Ark O'Diah
Defendant: Hewlet-Packard, LT Wheels, John Koskinen, Elmhurst Hospital Center, United Parcel Service, Megan J. Brennan, Kings County Hospital Center, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Hench, Trevor Neil McFadden, Queens Hospital Center, Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Education, Hertz Corporation Rent A Car, HP, Thomas Eddomgs, Western Union, Inspector General for the United States Postal Service, Anthony J. Annucci, Meir Moza, William Duane Benton, Sandra J. Feuerstein, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Catherine O'Hagan Wolf, Staples Corporation, Hereford Insurance Company, Koller Lee, Liberty Mutal Insurance Company, Kent A. Jordan, Dennis Jacobs, State of Pennsylvania, Beckman Coulter Inc, Ronald Lee Gilman, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Nassau County, Richard Brown, Staples Store #0065, Sears Roebuck and Company, Port Authoirty of New York and New Jersey, Stephen Bilkis, Arthur Cooperman, Kenneth Lipper, Michael A. Fedorko, Jerry Olik Mark, Usman Pasha, Lee Koller, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Acting Commissioner Anthony J. Annucci, Judge Trevor Neil McFadden, Judge Dennis Jacobs, Chase Bank, Judge Ronald Lee Gilman, Commissioner Kenneth Lipper, Judge William Duane Benton, JP Morgan Chase Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc., Judge Kent A. Jordan, Staples, United States Postal Service, Acting Director and Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, United States Department of State, Financial Protection Bureau, Nathan Hench, Judge Arthur Cooperman, Thomas Eddings, Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, Director Koller Lee and Judge Randall Eng
Case Number: 3:2019cv01854
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Aror-Ark O'Diah. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 Renewed Notice of Motion to Reopen and Vacate Order Adopting Magistrate Dismissal Report and Recommendation of Transfer of Single Claim to Other Venue Issued As filed filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah, Aror-Ark O'Diah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #13 MOTION to Vacate: A motion hearing will not be held on #13 MOTION to Vacate. The motion will be submitted on the papers. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/14/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/14/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aror-Ark O'Diah re #23 Waiver of Service Executed,, #22 Reply to Opposition/Response (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. Service waived by Stephen Bilkis waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Arthur Cooperman waiver sent on 4/13/2019, answer due 6/12/2019; Randall Eng waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; JP Morgan Chase & Co. waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Sears Roebuck and Company waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Staples Store #0065 waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Nathan Hench waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Lee Koller waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order, ) filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order, ) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed byJP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 returned as undeliverable re 12 Certificate of Service, #10 Order, #11 Judgment. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 19-01854 9th Circuit for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah, #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Aror-Ark O'Diah. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aror-Ark O'Diah re #13 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order,, #14 Notice of Appeal (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. Appeal of Judgment #11 , Order, #10 (IFP Request was previously granted with the Court). (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order, filed byAror-Ark O'Diah. (Related document(s) #13 ) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. Appeal of Judgment #11 , Order, #10 (IFP Request was previously granted with the Court). (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order, filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. Responses due by 5/31/2019. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order, #11 Judgment: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/16/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF AROR-ARK O'DIAH. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/14/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS [re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/14/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE(S): C-19-1854 KAW and C-19-0816 WHA.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aror-Ark O'Diah re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aror-Ark O'Diah. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/23/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Aror-Ark A. O'Diah. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 01:30 PM at Ronald Dellums Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2019: #1 Standing Order) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Annucci, Beckman Coulter Inc, William Duane Benton, Stephen Bilkis, Megan J. Brennan, Richard Brown, Arthur Cooperman, Thomas Eddomgs, Elmhurst Hospital Center, Michael A. Fedorko, Sandra J. Feuerstein, Ronald Lee Gilman, Hench, Hereford Insurance Company, Hertz Corporation Rent A Car, Hewlet-Packard, Inspector General for the United States Postal Service, Internal Revenue Service, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Dennis Jacobs, Kent A. Jordan, Kings County Hospital Center, John Koskinen, LT Wheels, Koller Lee, Liberty Mutal Insurance Company, Kenneth Lipper, Jerry Olik Mark, Trevor Neil McFadden, Meir Moza, Nassau County, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Usman Pasha, Port Authoirty of New York and New Jersey, Queens Hospital Center, Sears Roebuck and Company, Staples Corporation, Staples Store #0065, State of Pennsylvania, United Parcel Service, United States Department of Education, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Western Union, Catherine O'Hagan Wolf. Filed by Aror-Ark O'Diah. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attached Exihit "B", #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Diah v. Benton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlet-Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Wheels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmhurst Hospital Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Hospital Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Neil McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queens Hospital Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation Rent A Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eddomgs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector General for the United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meir Moza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Duane Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra J. Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine O'Hagan Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hereford Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koller Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckman Coulter Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lee Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Store #0065
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authoirty of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bilkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Cooperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Fedorko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Olik Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usman Pasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Trevor Neil McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Dennis Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ronald Lee Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Kenneth Lipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge William Duane Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Corporation
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Kent A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director and Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State, Financial Protection Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Hench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Arthur Cooperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Koller Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Randall Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aror-Ark O'Diah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?