Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Shimabukuro
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Carlos Shimabukuro and Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro
Case Number: 3:2019cv02787
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro (Martin, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro.. (Martin, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCarlos Enrique Shimabukuro. (Martin, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR; PLEASE DISREGARD SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 13 FOR CORRECTION*** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge Note: Previous clerk's notice was not dated.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE DISREGARD. NOT DATED. SEE NEXT ENTRY CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc... (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendant Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The Court will not issue blank summons. Please re-file completed forms in its entirety. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13370432.). Filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Shimabukuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Shimabukuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Enrique Shimabukuro
Represented By: Kevin Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?