Pangea Legal Services v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Pangea Legal Services
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Field Office Directo David Jennings and Mark Morgan
Case Number: 3:2019cv04027
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Pangea Legal Services (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case unsealed.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/23/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Defendants David Jennings, Kevin McAleenan & Mark Morgan. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for the Executive Committee on 7/15/2019. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE #5 TRO APPLICATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/13/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 13, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by David Jennings, Kevin McAleenan, Mark Morgan. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Salceda (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Patricia Sun (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Freeman (Freeman, William) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie M Lee (Lee, Mollie) (Filed on 7/13/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Pangea Legal Services re #5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Amended [Proposed] Order. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. To the fullest extent practicable, plaintiff is directed to serve the named defendants with the complaint and TRO papers by midnight tonight. Plaintiff is further directed to advise the defendants that the Court will accept a response to the TRO if filed by 12 p.m. California time on July 13, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/12/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pangea Legal Services.. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for a Writ Of Habeas Corpus against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13515575). Filed by Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangea Legal Services v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo David Jennings
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Morgan
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pangea Legal Services
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Mollie M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?