In Re Glumetza Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., City of Providence, H-E-B LP, BI-LO, LLC, Walgreen Co., Kroger Co., The, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc., Kinney Drugs, Kinney Drugs, Inc. and MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: Lupin Ltd., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Santarus, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. and PDL Biopharma, Inc.
Petitioner: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rite Aid Corporation, Hy-Vee, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Humana Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Interested Party: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05822
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
2 Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 526 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ) Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Partial Opposition to Defendants, Suns and Tevas Motion to Seal (ECF No. 513) filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 525 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/8/2021 before Judge William Alsup by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 524 STATEMENT of Recent Decision [N.D. CAL. L.R. 7-3(D)(2)] filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/08/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 521 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Purchasers Surreply in Opposition to Lupins Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Conditionally Sealed per ECF No. 405), #2 Exhibit A (Conditionally Sealed per ECF No. 405), #3 Exhibit B (Conditionally Sealed per ECF No. 405), #4 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #515 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #517 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings, #516 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #514 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #519 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, #518 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 519 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 126") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 127, #2 Exhibit 128, #3 Exhibit 129, #4 Exhibit 130, #5 Exhibit 131, #6 Exhibit 132, #7 Exhibit 133, #8 Exhibit 134, #9 Exhibit 135, #10 Exhibit 136, #11 Exhibit 137, #12 Exhibit 138, #13 Exhibit 139, #14 Exhibit 140, #15 Exhibit 141, #16 Exhibit 142, #17 Exhibit 143, #18 Exhibit 144, #19 Exhibit 145, #20 Exhibit 146, #21 Exhibit 147, #22 Exhibit 148, #23 Exhibit 149, #24 Exhibit 150, #25 Exhibit 151, #26 Exhibit 152, #27 Exhibit 153, #28 Exhibit 154, #29 Exhibit 155, #30 Exhibit 156, #31 Exhibit 157, #32 Exhibit 158, #33 Exhibit 159, #34 Exhibit 160)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 518 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 76") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90, #15 Exhibit 91, #16 Exhibit 92, #17 Exhibit 93, #18 Exhibit 94, #19 Exhibit 95, #20 Exhibit 96, #21 Exhibit 97, #22 Exhibit 98, #23 Exhibit 99, #24 Exhibit 100, #25 Exhibit 101, #26 Exhibit 103, #27 Exhibit 104, #28 Exhibit 105, #29 Exhibit 106, #30 Exhibit 107, #31 Exhibit 108, #32 Exhibit 109, #33 Exhibit 111, #34 Exhibit 112, #35 Exhibit 113, #36 Exhibit 114, #37 Exhibit 115, #38 Exhibit 116, #39 Exhibit 117, #40 Exhibit 118, #41 Exhibit 119, #42 Exhibit 120, #43 Exhibit 121, #44 Exhibit 122, #45 Exhibit 123, #46 Exhibit 124, #47 Exhibit 125)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 517 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 51") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 516 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 41") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 515 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 21") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit 31, #11 Exhibit 32, #12 Exhibit 33, #13 Exhibit 34, #14 Exhibit 35, #15 Exhibit 36, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 38, #18 Exhibit 39, #19 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 514 EXHIBITS re #513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings ("Exhibit 1") filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) #513 ) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert and Summary Judgment Filings filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Rush Declaration, #3 Schlessinger Declaration, #4 Gensburger Declaration, #5 Klein Declaration, #6 Savage Declaration, #7 Burkett Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 512 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bethanie Stein, #2 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #3 Exhibit 1 to Weiler Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Weiler Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Weiler Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Weiler Decl., #7 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 511 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph M. Vanek, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Public Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit A (Sealed), #5 PX 005)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 510 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE. The Motion Hearing as to #437 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom, #441 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Strombom Report, #461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power, #446 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger, #465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #443 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment - (sealed as per ECF 405), #436 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Tomas J. Philipson, #438 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants Expert Dr. Catherine Tucker, #435 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena, #464 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or to Decertify the Class against Assertio, #442 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz, #434 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman, #444 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire, set for 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Related documents(s) #437 , #441 , #461 , #446 , #465 , #443 , #466 , #436 , #438 , #435 , #464 , #442 , #434 , #444 ) ( This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 509 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. All e-filers should electronically notice a hearing date when filing motions in ECF. Motion Hearing as to #465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #464 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or to Decertify the Class against Assertio, #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment - (sealed as per ECF 405) set for 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #465 , #464 , #466 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 6, 2021 Filing 508 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. All e-filers should electronically notice a hearing date when filing motions in ECF. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup as to #437 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom, #441 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Strombom Report, #461 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power, #446 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger, #443 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, #436 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Tomas J. Philipson, #454 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Extend Humana Action Rule 56 Briefing Schedule , #438 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants Expert Dr. Catherine Tucker, #435 MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena, #442 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz, #434 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman, #444 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #437 , #441 , #461 , #446 , #443 , #436 , #454 , #438 , #435 , #442 , #434 , #444 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #505 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Helam Gebremariam. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #504 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Sharonmoyee Goswami. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 505 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15784482.) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Gebremariam, Helam) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 504 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 317.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/01/2021 filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Goswami, Sharonmoyee) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 503 Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen in Support of Purchasers' #502 Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3030, #2 Exhibit 006, #3 Exhibit 007)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 502 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Purchasers' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Purchasers' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power, #2 Exhibit 005, #3 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 501 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #500 Reply In Support Of Joint Motion For Summary Judgmen (Marriott, David) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2021 Filing 500 Reply In Support Of Joint Motion For Summary Judgment (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Marriott, David) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2021 Filing 499 Reply Brief in Further Support of Summary Judgment or to Decertify the Class Against Assertio (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2021 Filing 498 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (sealed as per ECF 405)filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meg Slachetka, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/29/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2021 Filing 497 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Marriott, David) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 496 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. The Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2021 is continued to 4/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 495 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by William Olson (Olson, William) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 494 Declaration of Lauren G. Barnes in Support of Purchasers Opposition to Lupins Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PX 0009, #2 PX 0010, #3 PX 0011, #4 PX 0012, #5 PX 0013, #6 PX 0016, #7 PX 0020, #8 PX 0040, #9 PX 0049, #10 PX 0065, #11 PX 0066, #12 PX 0078, #13 PX 1000, #14 PX 1001, #15 PX 1002)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conditionally Filed Under Seal (ECF No. 405) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Purchasers Opposition to Lupins Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 PX 1001A, #3 PX 1006, #4 PX 1008, #5 PX 1009, #6 PX 1015, #7 PX 1024, #8 PX 1025, #9 PX 1028, #10 PX 1035, #11 PX 1039, #12 PX 1049, #13 PX 1129, #14 PX 1142, #15 PX 1143, #16 PX 1144, #17 PX 1146, #18 PX 1153, #19 PX 1154, #20 PX 1155, #21 PX 1156, #22 PX 1191, #23 PX 1195, #24 PX 1197, #25 PX 1199, #26 PX 1231, #27 PX 1232, #28 PX 1233, #29 PX 1238, #30 PX 1245, #31 PX 1246, #32 PX 1255, #33 PX 1256, #34 PX 1264, #35 PX 1273, #36 PX 1289, #37 PX 1295, #38 PX 1297, #39 PX 1298, #40 PX 1301, #41 PX 2048, #42 PX 4001, #43 PX 4002, #44 PX 4009, #45 PX 4040, #46 PX 4070, #47 PX 4071, #48 PX 4080, #49 PX 4190, #50 PX 4220, #51 PX 4221, #52 PX 4250, #53 PX 4251, #54 PX 4310, #55 PX 4311, #56 PX 0001, #57 PX 0002, #58 PX 0003, #59 PX 0004, #60 PX 0005, #61 PX 0006, #62 PX 0007, #63 PX 0014, #64 PX 0015, #65 PX 0018, #66 PX 0019, #67 PX 0021, #68 PX 0022, #69 PX 0023, #70 PX 0024, #71 PX 0025, #72 PX 0026, #73 PX 0027, #74 PX 0032, #75 PX 0034, #76 PX 0035, #77 PX 0036, #78 PX 0036, #79 PX 0038, #80 PX 0039, #81 PX 0041, #82 PX 0042, #83 PX 0044, #84 PX 0045, #85 PX 0046, #86 PX 0048, #87 PX 0050, #88 PX 0051, #89 PX 0052, #90 PX 0053, #91 PX 0054, #92 PX 0055, #93 PX 0056, #94 PX 0057, #95 PX 0058, #96 PX 0059, #97 PX 0060, #98 PX 0061, #99 PX 0064, #100 PX 0067, #101 PX 0068, #102 PX 0069, #103 PX 0070, #104 PX 0071, #105 PX 0072, #106 PX 0073, #107 PX 0074, #108 PX 0075, #109 PX 0076, #110 PX 0079, #111 PX 0080, #112 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2021 Filing 492 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #461 Purchasers' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Stock in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Purchasers' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power, #2 Exhibit 1 - Jena Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Pajvani Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Starr Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - ANT01962801, #6 Exhibit 5 - ANT06000438, #7 Exhibit 6 - ANT05056443, #8 Exhibit 7 - ANT05045372, #9 Exhibit 8 - ANT05130953, #10 Exhibit 9 - Starr Rebuttal Report, #11 Exhibit 10 - Meah Deposition Transcript)(Stock, Eric) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2021 Filing 491 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Assertios Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration SEALED Declaration of Scott E.Perwin in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Assertios Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit SEALED Exs 1-15 of Declaration of Scott E.Perwin in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Assertios Motion for Summary Judgment)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #488 Joint Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire - (sealed as per ECF 405), #489 Joint Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz - (sealed as per ECF 405), #485 Joint Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger - (sealed as per ECF 405), #487 Joint Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler - (sealed as per ECF 405) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 489 Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Their #442 Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 488 Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Their #444 Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 487 Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of their #443 Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 486 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Purchasers' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Purchasers' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena, #2 Exhibit PX 4311, #3 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 485 Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of their #446 Joint Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 484 Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen in Support of Purchasers' Reply in Further Support of #440 -2 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 3029)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conditionally Filed Under Seal Pursuant to ECF No. 405 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Purchasers Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Opinions of Hopfenberg and Adelman, #2 Purchasers Reply in Further Support of the Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Tomas J. Philipson, #3 Purchasers Reply in Further Support of the Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom, #4 Purchasers Reply in Support of the Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Catherine Tucker, #5 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 482 REPLY in Support (re #441 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Strombom Report) filed by Humana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 481 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement conference held on 2/19/2021 via Zoom. Results: The parties shall email a joint status update to Judge Ryu by 3/5/2021 at DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov.FTR Time: Not Recorded For DPP Class: Lauren Barnes; Shana Scarlett; Joseph Vanek; and Steve ShadowenFor Assertio: Eric Stock; Victoria Weatherford; Daniel Peisert; and Sam Schlessinger (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 480 Defendant Lupin's Opposition to Purchasers' #436 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Lupin's Expert Dr. Tomas J. Philpson (Re-filed pursuant to Clerk's Request re: ECF No. 472) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meg Slachetka, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/22/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. re: #472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Lupin's Opposition to Purchasers' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Lupin's Expe rt Dr. Tomas J. Philpson filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Unable to open pdf. Please re-file in its entirety. If assistance is needed, please contact the ECF Help Desk at 866-638-7829. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 13, 2021 Filing 479 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #476 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Catherine Tucker, Ph.D (sealed as per ECF 405), #478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Opposition to Purchasers' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Defendants' Experts Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman (sealed as per ECF 405), #474 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Opposition to Purchasers' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom (sealed as per ECF 405), #475 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Opposition to Humana Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D. (sealed as per ECF 405) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/13/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 478 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Purchasers' #434 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Defendants' Experts Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Filing 477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Plaintiffs and Humana's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire and Jeffrey Leitzinger filed by BI-LO, LLC, Humana Inc., KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Version of Class Plaintiffs and Humana's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire and Jeffrey Leitzinger, #2 Declaration in Support of Class Plaintiffs and Humana's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Thomas McGuire and Jeffrey Leitzinger, #3 Exhibit 1009, #4 Exhibit 1015, #5 Exhibit 1154, #6 Exhibit 4071, #7 Exhibit 001, #8 Exhibit 002, #9 Exhibit 003, #10 Exhibit 004, #11 Exhibit 005, #12 Exhibit 006, #13 Exhibit 007, #14 Exhibit 008, #15 Exhibit 009, #16 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 476 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' #438 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Expert Catherine Tucker, Ph.D (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Filing 475 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Humana Inc.'s #441 Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D. (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Filing 474 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Purchasers' #437 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Filing 473 Defendants' Opposition to Purchasers' #435 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Defendants' Expert Dr. Anupam B. Jena filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Stock in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Purchasers' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Defendants' Expert Dr. Anupam B. Jena, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9 - Report)(Stock, Eric) (Filed on 2/12/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Filing 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Lupin's Opposition to Purchasers' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Lupin's Expert Dr. Tomas J. Philpson filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 of Meg Slachetka, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 471 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #446 Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger ) filed byHumana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B LP, Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz, #2 Declaration of Anna T. Neill, #3 Exhibit 1004, #4 Exhibit 1006, #5 Exhibit 1008, #6 Exhibit 1009, #7 Exhibit 1015, #8 Exhibit 1142, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 469 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Retailer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Retailer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, #2 Declaration of Barry L. Refsin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Refsin, Barry) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 468 Letter from Humana Inc. re Court Order at ECF No. 460. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 467 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment - (sealed as per ECF 405) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 465 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meg Slachetka, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Declaration of Dr. Sofia Mumtaz, #17 Declaration of Robert Hoffman, #18 Proposed Order)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 464 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or to Decertify the Class against Assertio filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Schoeneck, #2 Declaration of Eric J. Stock, #3 Exhibit 1 - Promotion Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Commercialization Agreement, #5 Exhibit 3 - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 4 - Purchase Agreement, #7 Exhibit 5 - Email, #8 Exhibit 6 - Email, #9 Exhibit 7 - Email, #10 Exhibit 8 - Email, #11 Exhibit 9 - Email, #12 Exhibit 10 - Email, #13 Exhibit 11 - Email, #14 Exhibit 12 - Email, #15 Exhibit 13 - Email, #16 Exhibit 14 - Email, #17 Exhibit 15 - Email, #18 Exhibit 16 - 10-Q Report, #19 Exhibit 17 - Email, #20 Exhibit 18 - Email, #21 Exhibit 19 - Email, #22 Exhibit 20 - Email, #23 Exhibit 21 - Email, #24 Exhibit 22 - Email, #25 Exhibit 23 - Email, #26 Exhibit 24 - Email, #27 Exhibit 25 - Email, #28 Exhibit 26 - Email, #29 Exhibit 27 - Email, #30 Exhibit 28 - Email, #31 Exhibit 29 - Telephone Conference Transcript, #32 Exhibit 30 - Email, #33 Exhibit 31 - Email, #34 Exhibit 32 - Email, #35 Exhibit 33 - Report Transcript, #36 Exhibit 34 - Report Transcript, #37 Exhibit 35 - Report Transcript, #38 Exhibit 36 - Report Transcript, #39 Exhibit 37 - Report Transcript, #40 Exhibit 38 - Report Transcript, #41 Exhibit 39 - Report Transcript, #42 Exhibit 40 - Deposition Transcript, #43 Exhibit 41 - Deposition Transcript, #44 Exhibit 42 - Deposition Transcript, #45 Exhibit 43 - Deposition Transcript, #46 Exhibit 44 - Deposition Transcript, #47 Exhibit 45 - Deposition Transcript, #48 Exhibit 46 - Agreement, #49 Exhibit 47 - Email, #50 Proposed Order)(Stock, Eric) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Version of Purchasers' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power, #2 Exhibit 1049, #3 Exhibit 1315, #4 Exhibit 1335, #5 Exhibit 3026, #6 Exhibit 4160, #7 Exhibit 4161, #8 Exhibit 4310, #9 Exhibit 001, #10 Exhibit 002, #11 Exhibit 003, #12 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 462 Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen in Support of Purchasers' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power filed byAlbertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 004)(Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 461 NOTICE by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Humana Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, In c. Purchasers' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Market Power (Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER DENYING #423 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 459 Transcript of AT&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 1-28-2021, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #456 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2021. (Related documents(s) #456 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 458 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #454 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Extend Humana Action Rule 56 Briefing Schedule ) Humana's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed byHumana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/28/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Humana Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Rabinovitz, Uriel) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/28/2021 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 455 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2021 by AT&T Conference line re #423 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint. The Court heard oral arguments and took the motion under submission. Total Time in Court: 23 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attys for Plaintiff Humana, Inc.: Matt Weiler / Uriel Rabinovitz.Attys for Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc.: Daniel Asimow / Matthew Fine. Atty for Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.: Eric Stock.Atty for Defendants Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.: Meg Slachetka. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 454 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Extend Humana Action Rule 56 Briefing Schedule filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Responses due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER GRANTING #452 STIPULATION RE PAGE LIMITS. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 452 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 451 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference (4 hours) set for 2/19/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference only between the DPP Class and Defendant Assertio only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting room. The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/21/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 450 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Planning call held on 1/21/2021 in advance of 2/19/2021 Zoom settlement conference. Results: By 2/5/2021, DPP class counsel shall certify in writing to Judge Ryu that their clients continue to vest full settlement authority in their attorneys as memorialized for the prior settlement proceeding with Lupin. By the same deadline, DPP class counsel shall provide a written demand with a copy to Judge Ryu at DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov.FTR Time: Not Recorded For DPP Class: Lauren Barnes; Joe Vanek; and Steve ShadowenFor Defendant Assertio: Eric Stock and Victoria Weatherford (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 449 NOTICE by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. of Debra Josephson's Withdrawal as Counsel (Josephson, Debra) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 448 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. re #446 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger" - sealed as per ECF 405), #443 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler" - sealed as per ECF 405), #447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger" - sealed as per ECF 405), #445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Joint Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, Edward Lentz, and Dr. Thomas McGuire" - sealed as per ECF 405), #442 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz" - sealed as per ECF 405), #444 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire" - sealed as per ECF 405) (Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 447 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger - (sealed as per ECF #405 ) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 446 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Rena Conti and Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger - (sealed as per ECF #405 ) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 445 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Joint Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler, Edward Lentz, and Dr. Thomas McGuire - (sealed as per ECF #405 ) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 444 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Thomas McGuire - (sealed as per ECF 405) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 443 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Keith Leffler - (sealed as per ECF #405 ) filed by Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 442 Defendants' Joint MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Lentz - (sealed as per ECF #405 ) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marriott, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 441 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Strombom Report by Humana Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Version of Purchasers Motion to Exclude Opinions of Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman, #2 Sealed Version of Purchasers Motion to Exclude the Proposed Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena, #3 Sealed Version of Purchasers Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Tomas J. Philipson, #4 Sealed Version of Purchasers Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom, #5 Sealed Version of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants Expert Dr. Catherine Tucker, #6 Exhibit 1016, #7 Exhibit 3000, #8 Exhibit 3002, #9 Exhibit 3003, #10 Exhibit 3004, #11 Exhibit 3005, #12 Exhibit 3014, #13 Exhibit 3020, #14 Exhibit 3021, #15 Exhibit 3024, #16 Exhibit 3026, #17 Exhibit 3027, #18 Exhibit 3034, #19 Exhibit 4070, #20 Exhibit 4223, #21 Exhibit 4310, #22 Exhibit 4340, #23 Exhibit 4341, #24 Exhibit D- sealed, #25 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 439 Declaration of Jessica R. MacAuley in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3015, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - redacted, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 438 Plaintiffs MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants Expert Dr. Catherine Tucker by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 437 Purchasers MOTON to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Bruce Strombom by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 436 Purchasers MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Tomas J. Philipson by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 435 Purchasers MOTION to Exclude the Proposed Opinions of Dr. Anupam B. Jena by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 434 Purchasers MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Harold P. Hopfenberg and Martin Adelman by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER: Judge Ryu will convene a settlement planning call between DPP class counsel and counsel for Defendant Assertio. The call will take place on 1/21/2021 10:15 AM Pacific Time in Oakland, - Telephonic Only and will last approximately 20-30 minutes. Counsel will receive the call-in information via email from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/12/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER HOLDING #425 MOTION TO SEAL IN ABEYANCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 431 REPLY (re #423 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint ) filed byHumana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 430 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement conference held on 1/5/2021 via Zoom between DPP Class and Lupin. Results: Matter did not settle. The parties are invited to contact Judge Ryu for further assistance.FTR Time: Not Recorded For DPP Class: Lauren Barnes; Shana Scarlett; Steve Shadowen; Joseph Vanek; and Sandy Grimm For Lupin Defendants: Leiv Blad; Jeffrey Blumenfeld; Meg Slachetka; and Allison Vissichelli (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 429 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #423 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint ) filed byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 428 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/03/2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #422 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2021. (Related documents(s) #422 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 427 Statement of Counsel to the Court Regarding Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Ferrara, #2 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 426 Statement re #397 Order Class Counsels Submission of a Unified List of Direct Glumetza Purchasers by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Administrative Assented-To Motion to File Under Seal filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 424 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #423 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint set for 1/28/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #423 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 423 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed SAC, #3 Exhibit 2 to Proposed SAC, #4 Exhibit 3 to Proposed SAC, #5 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #6 Exhibit 1 to Weiler Decl., #7 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/03/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER GRANTING #415 STIPULATED EXTENSION. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #417 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Uriel Rabinovitz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/5/2021 09:30 AM Pacific Time in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting room. The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/7/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 418 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Planning call held on 12/7/2020 in advance of 1/5/2021 settlement conference between DPP Class and Lupin Defendants, which will be held via Zoom commencing at 9:30 AM Pacific Time. Results: DPP Class shall provide a written demand by 12/14/2020 with a copy to Judge Ryu (DMRSettlement@cand.uscourts.gov). By 12/14/2020, class counsel shall provide Judge Ryu with a letter(s) signed by a qualified representative of each of the named plaintiff entities confirming that each entity has vested class counsel with full authority to enter into a settlement on its behalf. FTR Time: Not Recorded For DPP Class: Lauren Barnes; Shana Scarlett; Steve Shadowen; and Joseph VanekFor Lupin Defendants: Live Blad; Meg Slachetka; and Jeffrey Blumenfeld (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 417 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15282812.) filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rabinovitz, Uriel) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #373 MOTION TO DISMISS HUMANA COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 415 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Discovery Motions Deadline filed by Humana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Marriott (Marriott, David) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2020 by AT&T Conference line re #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6). The Court heard oral arguments and took the motion under submission.Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Atty for Plaintiffs Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, and Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. : Joseph Vanek Atty for Plaintiff Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., and H-E-B LP: Anna NeillAttys for Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc.: Daniel Asimow / Matthew Fine / Jennifer PattersonAtty for Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.: Eric StockAtty for Defendants Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.: Meg SlachetkaAtty for Movants CVS Pharamacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqrtrs. Corp., and Hy-Vee, Inc.: Anna NeillAttys for Movants Humana, Inc.: Matt Weiler / Peter St. Philip / Charles Kopel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 412 CLERK'S NOTICE. Counsel shall please dial-in to the Court's conference line at least ten minutes prior to the start of today's hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 411 NOTICE by Humana Inc. of Participation in Oral Argument by Junior Attorney (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #409 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Charles Z. Kopel. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 409 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254014.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/30/2020 filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kopel, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #406 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Charles Z. Kopel. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 407 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The Motion Hearing as to #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) set for 12/3/2020 at 08:00 AM will occur telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Related documents(s) #373 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 406 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15254014.) filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kopel, Charles) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING #403 STIPULATION RE MOTIONS TO SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 404 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to Plaintiffs and Defendant Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd. ONLY that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for a settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 12/7/2020 10:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 403 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal in Connection with Daubert and Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 402 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Intention for Junior Lawyer to Present Parts of Oral Argument in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Harrison Fine as Counsel for Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Fine, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #398 Stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 399 REPLY in Support (re #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 398 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Discovery Briefing Schedule for Disputes Between Defendants and Humana Inc. filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Humana Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER APPROVING #393 JOINT PROPOSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER GRANTING #394 STIPULATED EXTENSION. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 395 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byHumana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Humana's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 394 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension Of The Deadline To File Discovery Motions filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Humana Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 393 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BI-LO, LLC, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. Amendment to #392 Statement, Joint Proposal of All Parties regarding Compilation of a Unified List of Direct Glumetza Purchasers and Proposed Order. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 392 Statement re #377 Order Joint Proposal of all Plaintiffs and some Defendants regarding Compilation of a Unified List of Direct Glumetza Purchasers and Proposed Order by BI-LO, LLC, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #390 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 390 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15066755.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/15/2020 filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER APPROVING #382 PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #387 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 387 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Humana Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15066755.) filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 386 Transcript of AT&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 10-7-2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #384 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021. (Related documents(s) #384 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 385 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARINGS. Pursuant to the Court's Order at #383 , the following hearing dates are set: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2021 - 10/5/2021 at 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) Modified on 10/13/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2020 Filing 384 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 3 (GRANTING #372 AS MODIFIED). SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2020)
October 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 382 NOTICE by BI-LO, LLC, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Submission of Further Revised Class Notice (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Walgreen Co., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 380 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING JURY TRIAL. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2021 at 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 through 10/29/2021 at 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/9/2020. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER FOR PROPOSAL. RESPONSE DUE OCTOBER 23 AT NOON. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/9/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/7/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/7/2020 before Judge William Alsup by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 374 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Walgreen Co., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/7/2020. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021. Matter to be referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Total Time in Court: 44 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attys for Plaintiffs Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, and Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. : Joseph Vanek / Lauren Barnes / Steve Shadowen Atty for Plaintiff KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.: Sarah DeLoach Atty for Plaintiffs Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., and H-E-B LP: Scott PerwinAttys for Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc.: Laura Shores / Daniel AsimowAtty for Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.: Eric Stock Attys for Defendants Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.: Jeffrey Blumenfeld / Leiv Blad / Meg SlachetkaAtty for Movants CVS Pharamacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqrtrs. Corp., and Hy-Vee, Inc.: Barry RefsinAttys for Movants Humana, Inc.: Matt Weiler / Jason Kim / Peter St. Philip / Uriel Rabinovitz (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 373 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/28/2020. Replies due by 11/11/2020. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 372 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposal Of All Parties Regarding New Trial Date And Pretrial Schedule Proposed Order Setting Case Deadlines filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 371 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 is advanced to 10/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 370 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING AND CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Motion Hearing re Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) is vacated. The Further Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 8:00 AM is continued to 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER DENYING #366 MOTION TO SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 368 Declaration of Jason Gensburger in Support of #366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint filed byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 367 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Submission of Revised Proposed Class Notice. (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Class Notice)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Sealed First Amended Complaint, #3 Redacted First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 of First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 2 of First Amended Complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 365 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TELEPHONIC HEARING. Pursuant to the Court's Order at #364 , a telephonic Further Case Management Conference is set for 10/8/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Motion Hearing noticed at #355 will also occur telephonically.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER RE REVISIONS TO PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE. REVISIONS DUE SEPTEMBER 23 AT NOON. FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 8 AT 8:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Class Notice -- Annotated)(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Francis Ram (Ram, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 361 RESPONSE Defendants' Joint Response Regarding Retailer Plaintiffs' Objection to Proposed Class Notice and the Court's Order Re Retailer Plaintiffs' Objection to Proposed Class Notice by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 360 REPLY (re #356 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator ) Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Response to Retailer Plaintiffs Objection to Proposed Class Notice and the Courts Order re Retailer Plaintiffs Objection to Proposed Class Notice filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER RE RETAILER PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #356 NOTICE filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 358 NOTICE by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co. re #357 Objection, #356 Notice (Other),, Retailer Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of their Objection to Question 6 of the DPP Classs Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 357 OBJECTIONS to re #356 Notice (Other),, Retailer Plaintiffs Objection to Question 6 of the DPP Classs Proposed Notice by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 356 JOINT NOTICE PROPOSAL and MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2020. Replies due by 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 355 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Humana Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 9/23/2020. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING #353 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 353 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit the Class Notice and Plan filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER GRANTING #351 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 351 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Schedule in Humana Action (Case No. 20-cv-5251) filed by Humana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #349 Stipulation. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 349 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #115 Order on Stipulation to Amend Protective Order filed by Humana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL #323 #246 #262 #294 . SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2020)
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS (RE #247 ). SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 346 Transcript of AT&T Telephonic Conference held on 8-6-2020, before Judge William H. alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #342 Transcript Order, #344 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020. (Related documents(s) #342 , #344 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER GRANTING #338 MOTION TO RELATE CASE NO. C 20-05251 DMR. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 344 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/06/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 343 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #338 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) Plaintiffs Response to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 342 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/06/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2020. re #247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc. Total Time in Court: 42 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #339 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jessica R. MacAuley. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 339 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jessica R. MacAuley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14776072.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 338 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Humana Inc.. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 337 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In re Suboxone (Buprenorphine Hydrochlorine and Naloxone) Antitrust Litigation filed byMeijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Recent decision In re Suboxone Antitrust Litigation)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 336 CLERK'S NOTICE - AUGUST 6, 2020 MOTION HEARING WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY.. Please allow adequate time to check-in with the courtroom deputy by connecting to the teleconference line 10 minutes prior to the scheduled start time. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 335 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In re Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust Litigation filed byMeijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Recent decision In re Zetia Antitrust Litigation)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING #333 STIPULATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 333 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Depositions of Professor Thomas G. McGuire filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 332 Letter from Leiv Blad to Judge Alsup re: confirmation of service of Administrative Motion to Seal to Wholesalers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 331 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. Amendment to #247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 247-3). (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER RE #323 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/22/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER DENYING #324 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DISCOVERY ORDER #305 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/22/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER GRANTING #327 STIPULATED PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF #323 . SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 327 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Resolving, in Part, Defendants Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.'s Motion of Rule 72 Appeal from the Magistrate Judge's June 29, 2020 Order on Joint Discovery Letter Briefs filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Adam P. Merrill.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 325 Proposed Order re #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Granting Defendant Lupin's Rule 72 Appeal from the Magistrate Judge's June 29, 2020 Order on Joint Discovery Letter Briefs (ECF No. 305) by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 324 NOTICE by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal of Motion of Rule 72 Appeal from the Magistrate Judge's June 29, 2020 Order on Joint Discovery Letter Briefs (ECF No. 305) (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Lupin's Brief ISO Rule 72 Appeal, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 322 Letter from the Purchasers and defendant Bausch Health Companies, Inc. regarding resolution of disputes concerning Bauschs Supplemental Privilege Log. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 321 Declaration of Jason Gensburger in Support of #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Brief filed byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #294 ) (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leiv Blad in Support of Lupin's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G)(Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 7/6/2020) Modified on 7/7/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2020 Filing 318 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #312 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Professor Thomas G. McGuire (ECF 293-3) and Portions of the Reply Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF 293) ) filed byBI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Brunell, Richard) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying as moot #287 Discovery Letter Brief based on the parties' representation that the disputes have now been resolved (see Ltr. Br. of July 6, 2020 (dkt. 313) at 1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #315 Stipulation. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 315 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation resolving motion to compel regarding purchasers document request no. 33 to Lupin filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 314 Letter from the Purchasers and defendant Lupin regarding the resolution of discovery disputes. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 313 Letter from the Purchasers and defendant Bausch Regarding resolution of disputes concerning Bauschs Revised Privilege Log. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 312 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Professor Thomas G. McGuire (ECF 293-3) and Portions of the Reply Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF 293) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 311 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Purchasers unopposed emergency motion to refer disputes concerning Bauschs supplemental privilege log to Magistrate Judge Illman filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2020. Replies due by 7/23/2020. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 310 ERRATA re #293 Reply to Opposition/Response by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - REDACTED)(Brunell, Richard) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 309 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14638754.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merrill, Adam) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 308 Declaration of ZACHARY COHEN in Support of #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Brief filed bySun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #294 ) (Romm, Leah) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #303 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robert D. Cheifetz.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying #288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part #285 Discovery Letter Brief; denying #286 Discovery Letter Brief; deferring ruling on #287 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 304 Declaration of Natalie Rush in Support of #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Brief filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Related document(s) #294 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 303 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14632313.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Cheifetz, Robert) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #300 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Leesa Nicole Haspel.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Lauren Michelle Kole.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 300 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Leesa Nicole Haspel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14623141.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/25/2020 filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Haspel, Leesa) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 299 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Michelle Kole ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14623287.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/25/2020 filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Kole, Lauren) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICAITON by Judge William Alsup denying #296 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Lauren Michelle Kole.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #295 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Leesa Nicole Haspel.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 296 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Michelle Kole ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14623287.) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Kole, Lauren) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 295 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Leesa Nicole Haspel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14623141.) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Haspel, Leesa) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Brief filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren G. Barnes in support of administrative motion to file under seal, #2 Reply Memorandum in support of direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification, #3 Declaration of Matthew C. Weiner, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 3 continued, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 48, #47 Exhibit 52, #48 Exhibit 53, #49 Exhibit 54, #50 Exhibit 55, #51 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 293 REPLY Memorandum in Support (re #247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Weiner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/24/2020) Modified on 6/25/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing reset to 8/6/2020 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING #291 STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION #247 TO AUGUST 6 AT 8:00 A.M. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 291 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #289 Stipulation. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 289 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Manufacturing and Supply of Glumetza and Its Authorized Generic by Bausch filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Hy-Vee, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 288 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A-G to the Joint Discovery Letter with defendant Lupin filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren G. Barnes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 287 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Purchasers' and defendant Bausch's Joint Letter Brief to Judge Illman filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 286 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd., McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmeriSourceBergen Drug Company's Joint Letter Brief to Judge Illman filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 285 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Purchasers' and defendant Lupin's Joint Letter Brief to Judge Illman filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #279 Stipulation.(glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 283 Amended Answer to #202 Amended Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/12/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2020 Filing 282 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint in Hy-Vee Inc. v. Bausch Health Companies, et al., (No. 3:20-cv-1198-WHA). Relates to Dkt. Entries 275 and 276 by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 281 Amended Answer to #203 First Amended Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/12/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2020 Filing 280 Amended Answer to #226 First Amended Consolidate Class Action Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/12/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2020 Filing 279 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order and Joint Stipulation concerning discovery briefing schedule for disputes among the parties filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #277 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Meg Slachetka.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 277 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14560036.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certifiicate of Good Standing)(Slachetka, Meg) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING #275 STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 275 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File [Proposed] First Amended Answers filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- [Proposed] First Amended Answer to the Purchaser's First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- [Proposed] First Amended Answer to Walgreen's Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- [Proposed] First Amended Answer to CVS's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D- [Proposed] First Amended Answer to Hy-Vee's Complaint, #5 Stipulation Regarding Leave to Amend Answers, #6 Proposed Order)(Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 6/8/2020) Modified on 6/10/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2020 Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 6/5/2020. Attorneys participating were: Kristen Johnson, David Nalven, John Bjork, Jessica MacAuley, Rochella Davis, Joe Vanek, Anna Neill, Lauren Ravkind, and Barry Refgin. Daniel Asimow, Jennifer Patterson, Leiv Blad, Eric Stock and Zarema Jaramillo. FTR AT&T Teleconference Recording Time: 11:06-11:31. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 273 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Appearances shall be made by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #270 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Allison Vissichelli. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER GRANTING #268 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 270 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14531757.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certifiicate of Good Standing)(Vissichelli, Allison) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 269 Letter from Lauren G. Barnes to Magistrate Judge Illman regarding purchasers' request for a teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph M. Vanek)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 268 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Purchasers Emergency Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Discovery Motions filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 267 Declaration of Brian Savage in Support of #262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Portions of the Declaration of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D., and Exhibits 1-3, 5, 7-11, and 15-19 t, #263 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Pursuant to Northern District Local Rule 79-5(E) filed byTeva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #262 , #263 ) (Boock, Todd) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 266 Declaration of Zachary Cohen in Support of #262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Portions of the Declaration of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D., and Exhibits 1-3, 5, 7-11, and 15-19 t o the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Related document(s) #262 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. Of Notice To Counsel That Information Designated By Third-Parties As Confidential Has Been Filed Under Seal (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Documents Submitted Under Seal (Dkt 262) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 263 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs ) filed byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Declaration of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D.)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Portions of the Declaration of Bruce Strombom, Ph.D., and Exhibits 1-3, 5, 7-11, and 15-19 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Ross, #2 Declaration of Natalie Rush, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Opp to Mtn for Class Certification, #5 Unredacted Version of Opp to Mtn for Class Certification, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Asimow Decl, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Asimow Decl, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Asimow Decl, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Asimow Decl, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Asimow Decl, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Asimow Decl, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Asimow Decl, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Asimow Decl, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Asimow Decl, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15 to Asimow Decl, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16 to Asimow Decl, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17 to Asimow Decl, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18 to Asimow Decl, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19 to Asimow Decl, #20 Redacted Version of Decl of Bruce Strombom, PhD, #21 Unredacted Version of Decl of Bruce Strombom, PhD)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE Joint Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by City of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge William Alsup finding as moot #258 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #259 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Rudy F. Gonzales, Jr. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 259 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433524.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/04/2020 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gonzales, Rudy) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Illegible PDF attached. Please submit documents appropriately, without coffee stains, and of comparable page size for legibility. [err201] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #258 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433524.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/4/2020 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 258 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433524.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/4/2020 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Gonzales, Rudy) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #251 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Rudy F. Gonzales Jr. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING #253 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 255 Declaration of Jason Gensburger in Support of #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Brief filed byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #246 ) (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 254 Declaration of Natalie Rush in Support of #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Brief filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Related document(s) #246 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 253 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ECF No. 247-3 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Application is not signed and dated by applicant. [err201] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #251 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433524.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #250 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Tina J. Miranda. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 251 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433524.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Gonzales, Rudy) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 250 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14433482.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Miranda, Tina) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #245 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jeffrey Blumenfeld. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #244 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Zarema Jaramillo. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 247 MOTION to Certify Class for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/27/2020. Replies due by 6/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Public Redacted Version), #2 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/29/2020) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 5/4/2020 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/5/2020) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2020 Filing 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Class Certification Brief filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Guth Barnes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 245 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14422645.) Filing fee previously paid on 004/29/2020 filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certifiicate of Good Standing)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 244 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14422576.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/29/2020 filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certifiicate of Good Standing)(Jaramillo, Zarema) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #241 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jeffrey Blumenfeld. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #240 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Zarema Jaramillo. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 241 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14422645.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 240 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14422576.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Jaramillo, Zarema) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 239 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Leiv Hamilton Blad and Notice of Appearance (Blad, Leiv) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 238 Letter from Kristen A. Johnson regarding Resolution of the Purchasers First Request for Discovery Relief Concerning Bausch. (Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 237 Letter from Brendan J. Coffman to The Honorable Robert M. Illman respectfully informing the Court that the parties have resolved the pending dispute raised in RMMS's motion to modify the subpoena served by Plaintiffs on RMMS on February 20, 2020 (Dkt. No. 228). (Coffman, Brendan) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 236 ANSWER to #226 First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2020 Filing 235 ANSWER to #226 First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2020 Filing 234 ANSWER to #226 First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2020 Filing 233 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2020. Parties are instructed to meet and confer and file joint letter briefs regarding 227 & 228, by Friday, April 24, 2020. FTR Time: AT&T Conference. Plaintiff Attorneys: Kristen Johnson, David Nalven, John Bjork, Barry Refsin, and Lauren Ravkin all by phone. Defendant Attorneys: Daniel Asimow, Jennifer Patterson, Brendan Coffman, and Eric Stock all by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 232 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING: Motion Hearing re #212 Joint MOTION to Dismiss previously set for 4/23/2020 08:00 AM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 231 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 230 NOTICE by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc. re #228 Letter, Purchasers' Notice Regarding Response to Lupin's Motion to Quash or Modify RMMS Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/10/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 228 Letter from Brendan J. Coffman to The Honorable William H. Alsup respectfully requesting the Court modify a February 20, 2020 subpoena served by Plaintiffs on non-party Rakoczy Molino Mazzochi & Siwik LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Coffman, Brendan) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 227 Letter from Kristen A. Johnson re Purchasers First Request for Discovery Relief Concerning Bausch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 226 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byMeijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., BI-LO, LLC. (Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING #209 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND GRANTING #224 MOTION TO WITHDRAW #210 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 224 MOTION to Withdraw #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Proposed Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Responses due by 4/22/2020. Replies due by 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Foster, Adam) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 222 Statement of Non-Opposition Regarding Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (Docket 209) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines (pursuant to #195 Order) as to #212 Joint MOTION to Dismiss MSP's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6). Responses due by 4/9/2020. Replies due by 4/16/2020. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 221 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Relates to Walgreen (No. 3:19-cv-7843-WHA) byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 220 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Relates to Hy-Vee (No. 3:20-cv-1198-WHA) byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 219 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Relates to CVS & Rite Aid (No. 3:19-cv-8155-WHA) byLupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 218 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Relates to Hy-Vee (No. 3:20-cv-1198-WHA) byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 217 Defendants' ANSWER to #202 Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co. et al. and Demand for Jury Trial by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2020 Filing 216 Defendants' ANSWER to #203 Amended Complaint of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al. and Demand for Jury Trial by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2020 Filing 215 Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - relates to Hy-Vee (No. 3:20-cv-1198-WHA) byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 214 Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint - relates to CVS & RITE AID (No. 3:19-cv-8155-WHA) byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 213 Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint - relates to Walgreen (No. 3:19-cv-7843-WHA) byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 212 Joint MOTION to Dismiss MSP's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/16/2020. Replies due by 4/23/2020. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 211 RESPONSE (re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Proposed Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/31/2020) Modified on 4/1/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2020 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Proposed Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 209 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #207 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard Alan Arnold. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 207 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard Alan Arnold ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14310457.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/25/2020 filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for RAA)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #205 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard Alan Arnold. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 205 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard Alan Arnold ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14310457.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/24/2020 filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for RAA)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 AMENDMENT TO #188 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/24/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 203 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/23/2020) Modified on 3/23/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2020 Filing 202 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byKroger Co., The, Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B LP. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Adam Michael Foster for Plaintiffs MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; MSPA Claims 1, LLC; and Series PMPI (Foster, Adam) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Foster for Plaintiffs MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; MSPA Claims 1, LLC; and Series PMPI (Foster, Adam) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING #197 STIPULATED PLEADING SCHEDULE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING #196 STIPULATED PLEADING SCHEDULE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Retailer Amended Complaints and Answers filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 196 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Answers to DPP Complaint filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER RE #190 RELATING CASE NO. C 20-01587 JSC. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING #191 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Defendants' three page opposition is due MARCH 19 at NOON. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING #186 STIPULATED HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Injunctive Relief filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Retailer Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Injunctive Relief)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 190 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2020. (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING #185 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE #76 #79 #80 #98 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance by Cindy Y. Hong (Hong, Cindy) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of [Proposed] HIPAA Qualified Protective Order filed by City of Providence, Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration of Zachary Cohen in Support of Motion to File Under Seal)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 184 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/20/20, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #179 Transcript Order, #180 Transcript Order, #177 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2020. (Related documents(s) #179 , #180 , #177 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER RELATING CASES RE #176 #178 . Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 182 Refund Status re #175 Application for Refund, Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/20/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/20/2020 before Judge William Alsup by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 178 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/20/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bank, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 176 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 181 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re #76 MOTION to Dismiss, #79 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, #80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, #98 MOTION to Dismiss held on 2/20/2020. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue written order. (Total Time in Court: 1 hour 30 minutes.) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Scott Perwin, Eric Bloom, Stephen Teti, Joseph Vanek, AJ de Bartolomeo, Matthew Perez, Whitney Street, Gregory Asciolla, Sarah DeLoach, Jorge Mestre, Thomas Sobol, Kristen Johnson, Rochella Davis. Defendant Attorney: Jeffrey Bank, Thu Vu Hoang, Daniel Asimow, Laura Shores, Andrew Hannemann, Cindy Hong, Victoria Weatherford, Eric Stock. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 175 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14086484 by Albertsons Companies, Inc., BI-LO, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, H-E-B LP, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Kroger Co., The, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Brunell, Richard) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER RE ISSUES TO ADDRESS AT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/18/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #172 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Rochella T. Davis. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 172 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rochella T. Davis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14188440.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Johnson, Kristen) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Cindy Hong. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney David S. Nalven. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Intention for Junior Lawyer to Present Parts of Oral Argument in Support of Defendants' Joint Motions to Dismiss Retailer and EPP Complaints (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14170144.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/12/2020 filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Hong, Cindy) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc. re #165 Complaint, Notice of Filing Error and Request for Withdrawal of Document (DeLoach, Sarah) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 166 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David S. Nalven ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14165188.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 165 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** COMPLAINT against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byKPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (DeLoach, Sarah) (Filed on 2/11/2020) Modified on 2/12/2020 (tlh, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2020 Filing 164 COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byCity of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 163 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byRite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 162 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Filed byKroger Co., The, Walgreen Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B LP. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER TO FILE ALL COMPLAINTS UNDER LEAD CAPTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/10/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING #159 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE PRIVILEGE LOGS. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Extension of Deadline to Serve Privilege Log to February 18, 2020 Between Bausch Defendants and All Plaintiffs filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #156 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brett Cebulash. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #155 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Barry Taus. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 156 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brett Cebulash ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14133483.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/3/2020 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Cebulash, Brett) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 155 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Barry Taus ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14133015.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/03/2020 filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Taus, Barry) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Domenico Minerva. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #150 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brett Cebulash. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Barry Taus. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Domenico Minerva ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14134694.) filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Minerva, Domenico) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 150 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brett Cebulash ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14133483.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Cebulash, Brett) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 149 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Barry Taus ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14133015.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Taus, Barry) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 148 REPLY in Support (re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/3/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Filing 147 REPLY in Support (re #79 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated DPP Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 146 REPLY (re #80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated EPP Complaint for Lack of Standing Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6)) filed byBausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF in Support (re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Complaints) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #136 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Monica L. Kiley. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #135 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eric L. Bloom. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #134 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Chelsea M. Nichols. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #133 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Caitlin V. McHugh. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Barry L. Refsin. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #131 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Alexander J. Egervary. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #130 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Lauren C. Ravkind. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Scott E. Perwin. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 136 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Monica L. Kiley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073722.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Eric L. Bloom ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073716.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Chelsea M. Nichols ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073707.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Caitlin V. McHugh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073677.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Barry L. Refsin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073665.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Alexander J. Egervary ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073624.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/15/2020 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Carol Ravkind ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14070438.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/14/2020 filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing for Lauren Carol Ravkind)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Scott E. Perwin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14070393.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/14/2020 filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Eliot Perwin)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #110 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #108 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 119 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Complaints ) Retailer Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed byAlbertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., H-E-B LP, Kroger Co., The, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Walgreen Co.. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 118 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated EPP Complaint for Lack of Standing Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #76 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCity of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Perez)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 117 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated DPP Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #76 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byBI-LO, LLC, City of Providence, KPH Healthcare Services, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of PDL BioPharma, Inc. by City of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING #113 STIPULATED PROTECTED AND ESI ORDERS (WITH CONDITIONS). Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 20, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14086492.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Brunell, Richard) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
January 15, 2020 The January 16, 2020, 9:00 a.m. meet-and-confer and 10:00 a.m. discovery dispute hearing are VACATED upon parties' notice of resolution. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation re Entry of [Proposed] Protective Order and [Proposed] ESI Order and Requesting Cancellation of Conference Scheduled for January 16, 2020 filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order, #2 [Proposed] ESI Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Monica L. Kiley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073722) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric L. Bloom (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073716.) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chelsea M. Nichols (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073707.) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caitlin V. McHugh (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073677) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barry L. Refsin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073665.) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander J. Egervary (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14073624) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Lauren Carol Ravkind (Filing fee $ 310 previously paid (see document #104 , receipt number 0971-14070438) filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/14/2020) Modified on 1/15/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Scott E. Perwin) (Filing fee $ 310 previously paid (see document #103 ), receipt number 0971-14070393) filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/14/2020) Modified on 1/15/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14070438.) filed by Walgreen Co.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14070393.) filed by Walgreen Co.. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER RE DISCOVERY HEARING #99 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Kristen A. Johnson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kristen Johnson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14054871.) filed by BI-LO, LLC, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.. (Johnson Parker, Kristen) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re (96 in 3:19-cv-05822-WHA) Letter filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, City of Providence, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund]. One-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room at 9:00AM on 1/16/2020. Discovery Hearing set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/9/2020. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Complaints filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 97 Letter from Brendan J. Coffman re Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Coffman, Brendan) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 96 Letter from Whitney E. Street re Proposed Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING #82 MOTION TO STAY AND DENYING #83 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Matthew J. Perez. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brian R. Morrison. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Matthew J. Perez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14034547.) filed by Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Perez, Matthew) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #89 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14030475.) filed by KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Morrison, Brian) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., PDL Biopharma, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Walgreen Co., Kroger Co., The, Albertsons Companies, INc., H-E-B LP, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. and Rite Aid Corporation . (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/30/2019) Modified on 12/31/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Nisha Natver Patel (Patel, Nisha) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 29, 2019 Filing 87 REPLY (re #83 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to expedite hearing re #82 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to PDL BioPharma, Inc. ) filed by PDL Biopharma, Inc.. (Gordon, George) (Filed on 12/29/2019) Modified on 12/30/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2019 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to PDL BioPharma, Inc., #83 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to expedite hearing re #82 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to PDL BioPharma, Inc. ) filed byCity of Providence, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitney E. Street, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jennifer B. Patterson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer B. Patterson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14010669.) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Patterson, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 83 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to expedite hearing re #82 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to PDL BioPharma, Inc. filed by PDL Biopharma, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gordon, George) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to PDL BioPharma, Inc. filed by PDL Biopharma, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gordon, George) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss End Payor Plaintiffs' Claims against PDL BioPharma, Inc. filed by PDL Biopharma, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gordon, George) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated EPP Complaint for Lack of Standing Under Rule 12(b)(1) and Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated DPP Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 78 Statement in Support of Defendants' [Proposed] ESI Order by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ESI ORDER)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Daniel A. Shmikler. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 75 Letter from A.J. de Bartolomeo re Proposed Plaintiffs ESI Protocol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed ESI Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - Example of Emails Produced, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Search)(De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Correction of Docket No. #73 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14003003.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/20/2019 filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Shmikler, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2019 Filing 73 *** DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. SEE #74 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14003003.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Shmikler, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #69 MOTION TO RELATE CASE NO. C 19-08155 KAW. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 2. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/19/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL IN BOTH DIRECT PURCHASER AND END PAYOR CLASSES. Signed by Judge Alsup.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 69 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. Responses due by 12/23/2019. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1; #72 in No. 3:19-cv-05426-WHA; #65 in No. 3:19-cv-05822-WHA; 63 in No. 3:19-cv-05831-WHA; #57 in No. 3:19-cv-06138-WHA; #55 in No. 3:19-cv-06156-WHA; #66 in No. 3:19-cv-06839-WHA; #9 in No. 3:19-cv-07843-WHA. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 67 Statement in Support of Defendants' [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 66 Statement in Support of Proposed Scheduling Order by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Scheduling)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Entry of Amended Proposed Case Management Order No. 1 filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Luptin Ltd., Bausch Health Companies Inc. and Assertio Theraputics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Case Management No. 1)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Filing 64 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/5/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporterr Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (64 in 3:19-cv-05426-WHA) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2019. New proposed scheduling order and proposed order of consolidation due by 12/12/2019. Discovery begins, effective today, 12/5/2019. Court to issue written order re: appointment of interim counsel. (Total Time in Court: 55 minutes.) Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: A.J. de Bartolomeo (FWK Holdings, LLC & KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.), Steve Shadowen (FWK Holdings, LLC & BI-LO, LLC et al); Joseph Vanek, Lauren Barnes (Meijer, Inc. & Meijer Distribution, Inc.); Whitney Street (City of Providence); Gregory Asciolla (UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund); Sarah DeLoach (KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.). Defendant Attorney: Laura Shores, Daniel Asimow; Eric Stock, Victoria Weatherford (Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.); Jeffrey Bank, Brendan Coffman, Thu Hoang (Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. & Lupin Ltd.); George Gordon (PDL Biopharma, Inc.). Movant Attorney: Anna Neill (Walgreen Co.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. REGARDING [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Responses due by 12/17/2019. Replies due by 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Direct-Purchaser Class Counsel, #2 Declaration Lauren Guth Barnes Declaration In Support of Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Direct-Purchaser Class Counsel, #3 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Laura S. Shores. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Laura S. Shores ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13938550.) filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Shores, Laura) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eric J. Stock. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, a subsidiary of BlackRock, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Stock ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13934036.) filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Santarus, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2019 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meijer, Inc. for Meijer Distribution, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byMeijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jeffrey C. Bank. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Bank ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13913576.) filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bank, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Ltd.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Other Affiliate Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Ltd.. (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Entry of Proposed Case Management Order No. 1 filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Santarus, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lipin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Ltd and Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Case Management No. 1)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Saul P. Morgenstern on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Morgenstern, Saul) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Asimow on Behalf of Defendants Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Santarus, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Lynn Devine (Devine, Wendy) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/19/2019 11:00 AM is rescheduled to 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/29/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE that case C-19-5822-WHA is NOT related to case C-09-5587-PJH. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. of Filing Regarding Administrative Motions to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc. Notice of Filing of Plaintiffs' Joint Response to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. OF FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 *** DISREGARD. SEE #32 FOR CORRECTED FILING. *** NOTICE by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. OF FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaints [Civil Local Rule 6-1(a)] filed by Bausch Health Companies Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Thomas M. Sobol. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lauren Guth Barnes. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13800645.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Sobol, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13800595.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc... (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Santarus, Inc. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Bausch Health Companies Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eamon P. Kelly representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alberto Rodriguez representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.Attorney John P. Bjork representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.Attorney David P. Germaine representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph M. Vanek representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13749719.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13749691.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Alberto) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13749668.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Bjork, John) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13749644.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Germaine, David) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13749614.) filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Vanek, Joseph) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13714513.). Filed byMeijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Glumetza Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Brendan Jasper Coffman
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Represented By: Leiv Hamilton Blad
Represented By: Zarema Arutyunova Jaramillo
Represented By: Meg T. Slachetka
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Companies Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Represented By: Jennifer Bridget Patterson
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Fine
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Brendan Jasper Coffman
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Represented By: Leiv Hamilton Blad
Represented By: Zarema Arutyunova Jaramillo
Represented By: Meg T. Slachetka
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Represented By: Jennifer Bridget Patterson
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Fine
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Represented By: Jennifer Bridget Patterson
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Fine
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santarus, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Saul P. Morgenstern
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Represented By: Jennifer Bridget Patterson
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Fine
Represented By: David R. Marriott
Represented By: Sharonmoyee Goswami
Represented By: Helam Gebremariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Devine
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kole
Represented By: Leesa Nicole Haspel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDL Biopharma, Inc.
Represented By: George G. Gordon
Represented By: James Carl Otteson
Represented By: Thomas James Miller
Represented By: Nisha Natver Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez
Represented By: John Paul Bjork
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: David Paul Germaine
Represented By: Eamon Padraic Kelly
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Represented By: Brett H Cebulash
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Rochella T. Davis
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Shmikler
Represented By: Barry Steven Taus
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley,
Represented By: Robert David Cheifetz
Represented By: Adam P Merrill
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez
Represented By: John Paul Bjork
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: David Paul Germaine
Represented By: Eamon Padraic Kelly
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Represented By: Brett H Cebulash
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Rochella T. Davis
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Shmikler
Represented By: Barry Steven Taus
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley,
Represented By: Robert David Cheifetz
Represented By: Adam P Merrill
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPH Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Sharp Halbert
Represented By: Stephanie Egner Smith
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Michael Roberts
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Represented By: Debra G Josephson
Represented By: Brian R Morrison
Represented By: William Olson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Providence
Represented By: Stephen J. Teti
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-E-B LP
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Richard Alan Arnold
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI-LO, LLC
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Brett H Cebulash
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Rochella T. Davis
Represented By: Barry Steven Taus
Represented By: Rudy F. Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley,
Represented By: Tina Joann Miranda
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Lauren C. Ravkind
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Richard Alan Arnold
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kroger Co., The
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Richard Alan Arnold
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Domenico Minerva
Represented By: Matthew Perez
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Ethan H. Kaminsky
Represented By: Robin van der Meulen
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Richard Alan Arnold
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Domenico Minerva
Represented By: Matthew Perez
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Ethan H. Kaminsky
Represented By: Robin van der Meulen
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winn-Dixie Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Brett H Cebulash
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: David S. Nalven
Represented By: Rochella T. Davis
Represented By: Barry Steven Taus
Represented By: Rudy F. Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica R. MacAuley,
Represented By: Tina Joann Miranda
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Drugs
Represented By: Karen Sharp Halbert
Represented By: Stephanie Egner Smith
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Michael Roberts
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Represented By: Debra G Josephson
Represented By: Brian R Morrison
Represented By: William Olson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinney Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Sharp Halbert
Represented By: Stephanie Egner Smith
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Michael Roberts
Represented By: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Sarah E. DeLoach
Represented By: Debra G Josephson
Represented By: Brian R Morrison
Represented By: William Olson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: David Lee DaPonte
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton,
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Jorge Alejandro Mestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Chelsea M. Nichols
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Chelsea M. Nichols
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Monica L. Kiley
Represented By: Chelsea M. Nichols
Represented By: Alexander J. Egervary
Represented By: Caitlin V. McHugh
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: Eric L Bloom
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Barry L. Refsin
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Humana Inc.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Peter St. Phillip
Represented By: Uriel Rabinovitz
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Mark Francis Ram
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Andrew Boock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Leah Romm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?