Savea v. YRC Worldwide Inc.
Plaintiff: Vaiula Savea
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc. and YRC Worldwide Inc. doing business as YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Case Number: 3:2019cv06116
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vaiula Savea. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/18/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by YRC Worldwide Inc... (Gonzalez, Anahi) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YRC Worldwide Inc. for Notice of Notice of Removal (9/27/19) and Notice of Orders (10/3/19) (Gonzalez, Anahi) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint byYRC Worldwide Inc.. (Mills, Jason) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed t o review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by YRC Worldwide Inc. of Interested Parties (Mills, Jason) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by YRC Worldwide Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roadway LLC, Other Affiliate YRC INC. dba YRC FREIGHT for YRC Worldwide Inc.. (Mills, Jason) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 19CIV04822. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13740612). Filed byYRC Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jason S. Mills)(Mills, Jason) (Filed on 9/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savea v. YRC Worldwide Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Represented By: Anahi Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc. doing business as YRC Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Represented By: Anahi Gonzalez
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaiula Savea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?