Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Tineo et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Carla Fresia Leguia and Cesar Eduardo Tineo
Case Number: 3:2019cv06483
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Carla Fresia Leguia served on 11/3/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/15/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Cesar Eduardo Tineo served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/15/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Management Conference Order, #2 Exhibit Standing Order of All Judges of Northern District of California, #3 Exhibit Judge Edward M. Chen Civil Standing Order, #4 Exhibit Civil Standing Order on Discovery)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cesar Eduardo Tineo. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc... (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Carla Fresia Leguia, Cesar Eduardo Tineo. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13779624.). Filed byInnovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 10/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Tineo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Fresia Leguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Eduardo Tineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?