San Joaquin Community Hospital et al v. Figueroa et al
Plaintiff: White Memorial Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River, Sonora Community Hospital, Inc., Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Hanford Community Hospital, St Helena Hospital, Feather River Hospital, Hanford Community Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Hanford, Feather River Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Feather River, St Helena Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health St. Helena, San Joaquin Community Hospital a California nonprofit reiigious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Bakersfield, Ukiah Adventist Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Ukiah, White Memorial Medical Center a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health White Memorial, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Simi Valley, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Lodi Memorial, Sonora Community Hospital, Inc. a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Sonora and Glendale Adventist Medical Center a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Glendale
Defendant: Raul Ramirez, Richard Figueroa, Bruce Lim and California Department of Health Care Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv01301
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/24/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference: Notice is given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Feather River Hospital, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, Inc., St Helena Hospital, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, White Memorial Medical Center.. (Do, Long) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Feather River Hospital, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, Inc., St Helena Hospital, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, White Memorial Medical Center San Joaquin Community Hospital, et al Corporate Disclosure Statement (Do, Long) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 4/1/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Court finds that this case is related to 20-cv-00212-SK and 20-cv-01771-LB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/18/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Health Care Services, Richard Figueroa, Bruce Lim, Raul Ramirez Re #3 Scheduling Order, Standing Orders And Related Documents Served In Compliance Regarding Court's Order of February 25, 2020 (Tsai, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/27/2020) Modified on 2/28/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CPF-19-516626. (Filing Fee $400; 0971-14201744). Filed by Richard Figueroa, Raul Ramirez, California Department of Health Care Services, Bruce Lim. (Attachments: #1 Copy of First Amended Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate attached - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tsai, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/24/2020) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Joaquin Community Hospital et al v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Ramirez
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Figueroa
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Lim
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendale Adventist Medical Center
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Joaquin Community Hospital
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ukiah Adventist Hospital
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonora Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc.
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanford Community Hospital
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Helena Hospital
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feather River Hospital
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanford Community Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Hanford
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feather River Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Feather River
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Helena Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health St. Helena
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Joaquin Community Hospital a California nonprofit reiigious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Bakersfield
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ukiah Adventist Hospital a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Ukiah
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Memorial Medical Center a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health White Memorial
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Simi Valley
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc. a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Lodi Memorial
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonora Community Hospital, Inc. a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Sonora
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendale Adventist Medical Center a Califonria nonprofit religious corporation doing business as Adventist Health Glendale
Represented By: Felicia Y Sze
Represented By: Long Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?