Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority v. Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Defendant: Scott Garland, Mardi C. Dier, John H. Johnson, David C. Stump, Dennis Fenton, Hollings C. Renton, H. Ward Wolff, Jeffrey W. Bird, Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Laura Brege and Sheldon Koenig
Case Number: 3:2020cv01501
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (30) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (30) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; finding as moot (30) Motion to Consolidate Cases; finding as moot (36) Motion to Consolidate Cases; finding as moot (36) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting in part and denying in part (47) Stipulation; finding as moot (22) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:20-cv-00367-VC. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES 3:20-cv-00367-VC Hayden v. Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al.; 20-cv-00949-EMCMcCutcheon v. Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al.; 3:20-cv-01501-WHA Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority v. Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/24/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority [Notice of Publication] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of pendency of SEPTA Action, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of pendency of Hayden Action)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey W. Bird, Laura Brege, Mardi C. Dier, Dennis Fenton, Scott Garland, John H. Johnson, Sheldon Koenig, Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hollings C. Renton, David C. Stump, H. Ward Wolff. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 3/20/2020. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2020 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Jeffrey W. Bird, Laura Brege, Mardi C. Dier, Dennis Fenton, Scott Garland, John H. Johnson, Sheldon Koenig, Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hollings C. Renton, David C. Stump, H. Ward Wolff ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14230132.). Filed bySoutheastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority v. Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardi C. Dier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollings C. Renton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ward Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?