Gonzales et al v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Norbeto Alarcon, Everardo Villa, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Raul Romero, Julio Hernandez, Raymond Ulmer, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Sergio Rocha, Craig Bowlan, Carlos Serpas, Artur Kosinski and Sting Funez
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. and Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02689
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Sting Funez, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Artur Kosinski, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa Re: Consent Filings (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) filed by Plaintiffs against Charter Communications, LLC. Filed byMichael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Sergio Rocha, Michael Gonzales, Everardo Villa, Raul Romero, Craig Bowlan, Norbeto Alarcon, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Dennis Harmon, Alberto Arena, Julio Hernandez, Felipe Becerra, Sting Funez, Artur Kosinski. (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation. Answer due 6/22/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint to June 22, 2020 filed by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (Stecker, Abigail) (Filed on 6/1/2020) Modified on 6/4/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa for Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa for Defendant Charter Communications, LLC (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Michael Ralston Re: Consent Filing (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa Re: Consent Filings (Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Norbeto Alarcon, Alberto Arena, Felipe Becerra, Craig Bowlan, Ronald Flores, Michael Gonzales, Dennis Harmon, Julio Hernandez, Gerald Llorence, Michael Ralston, Ricardo Ramos, Sergio Rocha, Raul Romero, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Everardo Villa.. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/ 2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Strauss, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY against Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14387111.). Filed byMichael Ralston, Ronald Flores, Sergio Rocha, Michael Gonzales, Everardo Villa, Raul Romero, Craig Bowlan, Norbeto Alarcon, Gerald Llorence, Ricardo Ramos, Carlos Serpas, Raymond Ulmer, Dennis Harmon, Alberto Arena, Julio Hernandez, Felipe Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karakalos, Aris) (Filed on 4/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ralston
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Flores
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbeto Alarcon
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo Villa
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Llorence
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ramos
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Romero
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Hernandez
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Ulmer
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Arena
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Becerra
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Harmon
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Rocha
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Bowlan
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Serpas
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Represented By: Michael Anthony Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artur Kosinski
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sting Funez
Represented By: Aris Edmund Karakalos, Karak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Stecker Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Abigail Stecker Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?