Cox v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: David Cox
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03808
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Opposition filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/17/2020. Replies due by 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Sachs, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 FCA US LLC ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Deadlines as to #13 First MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing reset for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION to Remand Case back to San Mateo Superior Court filed by David Cox. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/3/2020. Replies due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Troy R. Candiotti ISO MTN for Remand, #3 Proposed Order)(Barry, David) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #11 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION, AND STIPULATION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Punitive Damages JOINT STIPULATION filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Punitive Damages filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/1/2020. Replies due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hanson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FCA US LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/1/2020. Replies due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hanson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/17/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-01935. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14562861). Filed byFCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court POS of Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration of Erin Hanson ISO Ntc of Removal, #7 Declaration of James Sheridan ISO Ntc of Removal)(Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: Georges A. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cox
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?