Boros v. Renton et al
Plaintiff: BRUCE BOROS
Defendant: Scott Garland, John H. Johnson, David C. Stump, Dennis Fenton, Hollings C. Renton, H. Ward Wolff, Portola Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ted Love, Jeffrey Bird and Laura Brege
Case Number: 3:2020cv03864
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bruce Boros (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bruce Boros. Service waived by All Defendants. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Bird, Laura Brege, Dennis Fenton, Scott Garland, John H. Johnson, Ted Love, Portola Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hollings C. Renton, David C. Stump, H. Ward Wolff. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by BRUCE BOROS PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS UNDER CIVIL L.R. 3-15 (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14568513.). Filed byBRUCE BOROS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boros v. Renton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollings C. Renton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ward Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portola Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE BOROS
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?