In re Clean Water Act Rulemaking
Plaintiff: Idaho Rivers United, California Trout, American Whitewater, American Rivers, State of North Carolina, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, Columbia Riverkeeper, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Orutsararmiut Native Council, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, District of Columbia, Suquamish Tribe, State of Michigan, State of Rhode Island, State of Maine, State Water Resources Control Board, State of New York, Sierra Club, State of New Jersey and State of California
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler and US Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor Defendant: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Petroleum Institute and National Hydropower Association
Intervenor: Montana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Arkansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Missouri, State of, Texas, State of, Wyoming, State of, West Virginia, State of, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Texas, State of Arkansas, State of Montana, State of West Virginia, State of Missouri and State of Wyoming
Case Number: 3:2020cv04636
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Bradley A. Benbrook NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR INTERVENOR STATE OF MONTANA (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #121 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas J. Bronni. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Vincent M. Wagner. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461923.) filed by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Bronni, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461873.) filed by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Wagner, Vincent) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ANSWER to Complaint byAmerican Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT STATE OF TEXAS; NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR INTERVENOR STATE OF MISSISSIPPI; NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE #115 PROPOSED TIMELINE FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD COMPLETION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/30/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION re #108 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen T. Hunker. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #110 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Krissy C. Nobile. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint byNational Hydropower Association. (Andrews, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen T. Hunker ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15216852.) filed by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hunker, Kathleen) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15216477.) filed by State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Nobile, Krissy) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint byAndrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. (Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE PRIVILEGE LOG. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER STAYING PRIVILEGE LOG DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency re #89 Case Management Scheduling Order (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Hannah E. Tokerud. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy Chang (Chang, Cindy) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Order of October 23, 2020 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) Response to Defendants' Brief Challenging Order Requiring Privilege Log filed byAmerican Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Columbia Riverkeeper. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY (re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Order of October 23, 2020 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) Response to Defendants' Brief Challenging Order Requiring Privilege Log filed byColumbia Riverkeeper, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Sierra Club, Suquamish Tribe. (Nasmith, Moneen) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY (re #95 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Order of October 23, 2020 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 ) States' Response to Defendants' Brief Challenging Order Requiring Privilege Log filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly T. Wood)(Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15159300.) filed by State of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Montana Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Tokerud, Hannah) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly T Wood (Wood, Kelly) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed byColumbia Riverkeeper, Sierra Club, Suquamish Tribe, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Orutsararmiut Native Council. (Nasmith, Moneen) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/22/20 before Judge William Alsup by state of california, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed byState of Oregon, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Maryland, State of Rhode Island, State of Colorado, state of california, District of Columbia, State Water Resources Control Board, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Minnesota, State of Connecticut, State of Washington, State of Michigan, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Maine, State of Illinois. (Gaur, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Order of October 23, 2020 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. Responses due by 11/5/2020. (Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency of Errata in #92 Motion for Protective Order (Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency re Delayed Filing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jim Curtin)(Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Order of October 23, 2020 filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. Responses due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration HILL, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration)(Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Transcript of AT&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 10-22-2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (90 in 3:20-cv-04636-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/22/20 before Judge William Alsup by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/22/2020. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/22/2020. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attorneys for Plaintiffs American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, and Idaho Rivers United: Andrew Hawley / Sangye Ince-Johnson.Attorneys for Plaintiff State of California: Adam Levitan / Tatiana Gaur.Attorneys for Plaintiff States: Washington (Kelly Wood / Cindy Chang), New York (Brian Lusignan), Colorado (Annette Quill / Carrie Noteboom), Connecticut (Jill Lacedonia), Illinois (Jason James), Maine (Jillian OBrien), Maryland (Stephen Goldstein for John Howard), Massachusetts (Matthew Ireland), Michigan (Jill Wenner), Minnesota (Peter Surdo), Nevada (Heidi Stern), New Jersey (Lisa Morelli), New Mexico (Phil Grantham), North Carolina (Taylor Crabtree), Oregon (Paul Garrahan), Rhode Island (Alison Hoffman), Vermont (Laura Murphy), Virginia (David Grandis), Wisconsin (Gabe Johnson-Karp), and the District of Columbia (Brian Caldwell).Attorneys for Plaintiffs Suquamish Tribe, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Columbia Riverkeeper, and Sierra Club: Kristen Boyles / Moneen Nasmith.Attorneys for Defendants Andrew Wheeler and EPA: Leslie Hill / Vanessa Waldref.Attorney for Intervenors America Petroleum Institute and Interstate Natural Gas Association of America: George Sibley.Attorneys for Intervenor States: Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Texas (Shawn Cowles), West Virginia, Wyoming, and Montana : Joseph St. John / Steven Duvernay. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The Motion Hearing re MOTION to Intervene filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America #56 and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency #59 set for 11/4/2020 is vacated. See #78 and #80 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAmerican Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Index to the Administrative Record)(Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Shawn E. Cowles. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byArkansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Texas, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION Joint to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAndrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. (Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15057502.) filed by Texas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cowles, Shawn) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #56 MOTION TO INTERVENE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ann Schlichting (Schlichting, Melissa) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAmerican Whitewater, American Rivers, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Sara See. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE SCHEDULING (RE #70 STIPULATION). SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14981127.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/24/2020 filed by West Virginia, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(See, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER (RE #60 ) RELATING CASE NO. C 20-06137. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY (re #56 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAmerican Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Sara See. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14981127.) filed by West Virginia, State of. (See, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Declaration of Andrew Hawley in Support of #60 MOTION to Relate Case filed byAmerican Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAmerican Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE #60 MOTION TO RELATE. Plaintiffs here shall please serve this order on plaintiffs in case No. C 20-06137 CRB and solicit their response by September 24 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/17/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #27 MOTION TO INTERVENE BY THE STATES OF LOUISIANA, MONTANA, ARKANSAS, MISSISSIPPI, MISSOURI, TEXAS, WEST VIRGINIA, AND WYOMING. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion Hearings re MOTION to Intervene filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America #56 and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency #59 are continued to 11/4/2020 at 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Counsel are reminded to follow the Local Rules and to set hearings in accordance with Judge Alsup's calendar when noticing motion hearings. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Relate Case filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/29/2020. Replies due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Statement of Non-Opposition re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed byAmerican Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by George P. Sibley III; granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Deidre G. Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Order re Duncan PHV)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/18/2020. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Rorick, #2 Declaration of Joan Dreskin, #3 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America identifying Other Affiliate American Petroleum Institute for American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Deidre G. Duncan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14906349.) filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice George P. Sibley III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14906331.) filed by American Petroleum Institute, Interstate Natural Gas Association of America. (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite Clare Ellis for Intervenors the American Petroleum Institute and the Interstate Natural Gas Association of America (Ellis, Marguerite) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (50) Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kristi Haskins Johnson in case 3:20-cv-04636-WHA; granting (70) Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kristi Haskins Johnson in case 3:20-cv-04869-WHA. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14898848.) filed by Mississippi, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Kristi) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 is continued to 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James C. Kaste. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896722.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/03/20 filed by Wyoming, State of. (Kaste, James) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Whitewater, American Rivers, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. US Environmental Protection Agency served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Whitewater, American Rivers, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. Andrew R. Wheeler served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by James C. Kaste. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896722.) filed by Wyoming, State of. (Kaste, James) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASE NO. C 20-04869 KAW. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Murrill. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joseph St. John. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Seidemann. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881402.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murrill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #28 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14880453.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #30 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881134.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/31/20 filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidemann, Ryan) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Relate Case ) Resp in California v Wheeler Pursuant to Order Dkt No 23 filed byAndrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency. (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Seidemann. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Murrill. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joseph St. John. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881134.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidemann, Ryan) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881042.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murrill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14880453.) filed by Louisiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. John, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arkansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Texas, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/11/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. St. John, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Exhibit No. 7, #7 Exhibit No. 8, #8 Exhibit No. 9, #9 Exhibit No. 10, #10 (Proposed) Answer, #11 Proposed Order)(Hacker, David) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker for State Intervenor-Defendants (Hacker, David) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook Proposed Intervenor State of Montana (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Benbrook Proposed Intervenors State of Louisiana, State of Arkansas, et al. (Benbrook, Bradley) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/18/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Relate Case filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sangye Ince-Johannsen.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Peter M.K. Frost.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14683698.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/13/20 filed by American Rivers. (Frost, Peter) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14683603.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/13/2020 filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Ince-Johannsen, Sangye) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge William Alsup denying #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sangye Ince-Johannsen.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge William Alsup denying #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Peter M.K. Frost.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. All pending motions will be taken off calendar and must be renoticed by the moving party for a new hearing date on a Thursday at 08:00 AM. The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the renotice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 73. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Waldref Ruth Vanessa (Vanessa, Waldref) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency.. (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United.. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew R. Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14683698.) filed by American Rivers. (Frost, Peter) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14683603.) filed by American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United. (Ince-Johannsen, Sangye) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14682402.). Filed byIdaho Rivers United, American Rivers, California Trout, American Whitewater. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawley, Andrew) (Filed on 7/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Clean Water Act Rulemaking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Represented By: Waldref Ruth Vanessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Represented By: Waldref Ruth Vanessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Rivers United
Represented By: Andrew McAleer Hawley
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Daniel James Cordalis
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Trout
Represented By: Andrew McAleer Hawley
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Daniel James Cordalis
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Whitewater
Represented By: Andrew McAleer Hawley
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Daniel James Cordalis
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Rivers
Represented By: Andrew McAleer Hawley
Represented By: Sangye Ince-Johannsen
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Represented By: Daniel James Cordalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Represented By: Taylor H Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter N. Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: John B. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Represented By: Andrew McAleer Hawley
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Gussie Lord,
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Represented By: Nathan Matthews
Represented By: Thomas Scott Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Jill Lacedonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: William G Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Laura B. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Cindy Chang
Represented By: Kelly T Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orutsararmiut Native Council
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Gussie Lord,
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Represented By: Nathan Matthews
Represented By: Thomas Scott Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: David Cardwell Grandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Carrie Noteboom
Represented By: Annette Quill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Jason Elliott James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Matthew Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Gussie Lord,
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Represented By: Nathan Matthews
Represented By: Thomas Scott Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Brian R Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suquamish Tribe
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Gussie Lord,
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Represented By: Nathan Matthews
Represented By: Thomas Scott Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Gillian Wener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Alison B Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Jillian Renee O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Water Resources Control Board
Represented By: Tatiana Koleva Gaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Brian M. Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Gussie Lord,
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Represented By: Nathan Matthews
Represented By: Thomas Scott Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lisa Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Tatiana Koleva Gaur
Represented By: Bryant B. Cannon
Represented By: Adam Leonard Levitan
Represented By: Catherine Mitchell Wieman
Represented By: Lani Maria Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America
Represented By: Marguerite Clare Ellis
Represented By: Deidre G Duncan
Represented By: George P. Sibley, III
Represented By: Deidre G. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Marguerite Clare Ellis
Represented By: Deidre G Duncan
Represented By: George P. Sibley, III
Represented By: Deidre G. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Hydropower Association
Represented By: Charles R Sensiba
Represented By: Andrea West Wortzel
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Represented By: Sean T H Dutton
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Louisiana, State of
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Elizabeth Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Missouri, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Texas, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: James Kaste
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Elizabeth Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Mississippi
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Kristi H. Johnson
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Krissy C. Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Texas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Shawn Eric Cowles
Represented By: Kathleen T. Hunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Moneen S. Nasmith
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Montana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Melissa Ann Schlichting
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Tokerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of West Virginia
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Lindsay Sarah See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Missouri
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Wyoming
Represented By: James Kaste
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?