Carmody et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Bryan Carmody and First Amendment Coalition
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2020cv04809
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition.. (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for violation of FOIA against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14706605.). Filed byBryan Carmody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmody et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Carmody
Represented By: Sherene Tagharobi
Represented By: David Edward Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Amendment Coalition
Represented By: Sherene Tagharobi
Represented By: David Edward Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?