Davis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Davis
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05805
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byJimmy Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Received Document re: Waiver of the Service of Summons by Jimmy Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byJimmy Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?